Florida 2023 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1405 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/03/2023

                       
 
HB 1405  	2023 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb1405-00 
Page 1 of 6 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
A bill to be entitled 1 
An act relating to biosolids; amending s. 403.0673, 2 
F.S.; authorizing the Department of Environmental 3 
Protection, subject to appropriation, to provide 4 
grants for certain wastewater conversion projects; 5 
providing for prioritization of the projects; amending 6 
s. 403.0855, F.S.; prohibiting the authorization of 7 
land application site permits for Class B biosolids 8 
within subwatersheds with certain impaired waterbodies 9 
unless applicants can demonstrate that such biosolids 10 
meet certain requirements; requiring land application 11 
site permits for Class B biosolids within 12 
subwatersheds with certain impaired waterbodies to 13 
meet certain requirements by specified dates; 14 
requiring the department to annually publish certain 15 
maps by a specified date; amending s. 403.1835, F.S.; 16 
requiring the department to reserve a certain 17 
percentage of water pollution control financial 18 
assistance for certain wastewater conversion projects; 19 
providing an effective date. 20 
 21 
Be It Enacted by the Legislature of the State of Florida: 22 
 23 
 Section 1.  Section 403.0673, Florida Statutes, is amended, 24 
to read: 25     
 
HB 1405  	2023 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb1405-00 
Page 2 of 6 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
 403.0673  Wastewater grant program. —A wastewater grant 26 
program is established within the Department of Environmental 27 
Protection. 28 
 (1)(a) Subject to the appropriation of funds by the 29 
Legislature, the department may provide grants for the following 30 
projects within a basin management action plan, an alternative 31 
restoration plan adopted by final order, or a rural area of 32 
opportunity under s. 288.0656 which will individually or 33 
collectively reduce excess nutrient pollution: 34 
 1.(a) Projects to retrofit onsite sewage treatment and 35 
disposal systems to upgrade such systems to enhanced nutrient -36 
reducing onsite sewage treatment and disposal systems. 37 
 2.(b) Projects to construct, upgrade, or expand facilities 38 
to provide advanced waste treatment, as defined in s. 39 
403.086(4). 40 
 3.(c) Projects to connect onsite sewage treatment and 41 
disposal systems to central sewer fa cilities. 42 
 (b)(2) In allocating such funds, Priority must be given to 43 
projects that subsidize the connection of onsite sewage 44 
treatment and disposal systems to wastewater treatment 45 
facilities. 46 
 1. First priority must be given to subsidize the 47 
connection of onsite sewage treatment and disposal systems to 48 
existing infrastructure. 49 
 2. Second priority must be given to any expansion of a 50     
 
HB 1405  	2023 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb1405-00 
Page 3 of 6 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
collection or transmission system that promotes efficiency by 51 
planning the installation of wastewater transmission faciliti es 52 
to be constructed concurrently with other construction projects 53 
occurring within or along a transportation facility right -of-54 
way. 55 
 3. Third priority must be given to all other connections 56 
of onsite sewage treatment and disposal systems to wastewater 57 
treatment facilities. 58 
 (c) The department shall consider the estimated reduction 59 
in nutrient load per project; project readiness; the cost -60 
effectiveness of the project; the overall environmental benefit 61 
of a project; the location of a project; the availabil ity of 62 
local matching funds; and projected water savings or quantity 63 
improvements associated with a project. 64 
 (2)  Subject to the appropriation, the department may 65 
provide grants for projects that convert wastewater residuals 66 
into Class A or Class AA bioso lids. Projects must be prioritized 67 
by the cost-effectiveness and overall environmental benefit of 68 
the project. 69 
 (3)  Each grant for a project described in paragraoh (1)(a) 70 
subsection (1) must require a minimum of a 50 -percent local 71 
match of funds. However, the department may, at its discretion, 72 
waive, in whole or in part, this consideration of the local 73 
contribution for proposed projects within an area designated as 74 
a rural area of opport unity under s. 288.0656. 75     
 
HB 1405  	2023 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb1405-00 
Page 4 of 6 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
 (4)  The department shall coordinate with each water 76 
management district, as necessary, to identify grant recipients 77 
in each district. 78 
 (5)  Beginning January 1, 2021, and each January 1 79 
thereafter, the department shall submit a r eport regarding the 80 
projects funded pursuant to this section to the Governor, the 81 
President of the Senate, and the Speaker of the House of 82 
Representatives. 83 
 Section 2.  Subsection (7) is added to section 403.0855, 84 
Florida Statutes, to read: 85 
 403.0855  Biosolids management.— 86 
 (7)(a)  The department may not authorize land application 87 
site permits for Class B biosolids within the subwatershed of a 88 
waterbody that is designated as impaired for nitrogen or 89 
phosphorus or within any upstream subwatershed hydrolog ically 90 
connected to a waterbody that is designated as impaired for 91 
nitrogen or phosphorus unless the applicant can affirmatively 92 
demonstrate that the phosphorus and nitrogen in the biosolids 93 
will not increase nutrient loadings in the impaired 94 
subwatershed. The demonstration must be based on achieving a net 95 
balance between nutrient imports relative to exports on the 96 
permitted application site. Exports may only include nutrients 97 
removed from the subwatershed through products generated on the 98 
permitted application site. 99 
 (b)  New or renewed land application site permits for Class 100     
 
HB 1405  	2023 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb1405-00 
Page 5 of 6 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
B biosolids within the subwatershed of a waterbody designated as 101 
impaired for nitrogen or phosphorus or within any upstream 102 
subwatershed hydrologically connected to a waterbody that is 103 
designated as impaired for nitrogen or phosphorus that are 104 
issued after July 1, 2023, must meet the demonstration 105 
requirements in paragraph (a) by July 1, 2024. 106 
 (c)  All land application site permits for Class B 107 
biosolids within the subwatershed of a wat erbody designated as 108 
impaired for nitrogen or phosphorus or within any upstream 109 
subwatershed hydrologically connected to a waterbody that is 110 
designated as impaired for nitrogen or phosphorus must meet the 111 
demonstration requirements in paragraph (a) by July 1, 2025. 112 
 (d)  Beginning August 1, 2023, and each August 1 113 
thereafter, the department shall publish maps designating the 114 
subwatersheds of impaired waterbodies subject to this 115 
subsection. 116 
 Section 3.  Paragraph (e) is added to subsection (3) of 117 
section 403.1835, Florida Statutes, to read: 118 
 403.1835  Water pollution control financial assistance. — 119 
 (3)  The department may provide financial assistance 120 
through any program authorized under 33 U.S.C. s. 1383, as 121 
amended, including, but not limited to, making gr ants and loans, 122 
providing loan guarantees, purchasing loan insurance or other 123 
credit enhancements, and buying or refinancing local debt. This 124 
financial assistance must be administered in accordance with 125     
 
HB 1405  	2023 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb1405-00 
Page 6 of 6 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
this section and applicable federal authorities. 126 
 (e) The department shall administer financial assistance 127 
so that at least 15 percent of the funding made available each 128 
year under this section is reserved for projects that convert 129 
wastewater residuals to Class A or Class AA biosolids during the 130 
year it is reserved. 131 
 Section 4.  This act shall take effect July 1, 2023. 132