Florida 2023 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1615 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 03/22/2023

                    This docum ent does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill sponsor or House of Representatives. 
STORAGE NAME: h1615a.CRG 
DATE: 3/22/2023 
 
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES STAFF ANALYSIS  
 
BILL #: HB 1615    Grants for Nonprofit Organization Safety 
SPONSOR(S): Fine 
TIED BILLS:   IDEN./SIM. BILLS: SB 1480 
 
REFERENCE 	ACTION ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR or 
BUDGET/POLICY CHIEF 
1) Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & 
Government Operations Subcommittee 
14 Y, 0 N Wagoner Miller 
2) Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations 
Subcommittee 
   
3) State Affairs Committee    
SUMMARY ANALYSIS 
The Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) coordinates several grant programs. Funds are 
available for pre- and post-emergency or disaster related projects.  FEMA grants support recovery initiatives, 
research, and many other programs. Grants are the principal mechanism used by FEMA to award federal 
funding to state, local, tribal, territorial, certain private nonprofits, individuals, and institutions of higher learning. 
One major category for FEMA grant funding is Preparedness Grants. The Nonprofit Security Grant Program 
(NSGP) is administered under Preparedness Grants. These grants support nonprofits and provide funds for 
security infrastructure. 
 
The bill will create a Florida based NSGP administered by the Florida Division of Emergency Management 
(FDEM). The grant program will mirror the guidelines established in in the federal NSGP and funding will be 
subject to appropriations. The bill provides rulemaking authority to FDEM to create the program outlined in the 
bill.  
 
   STORAGE NAME: h1615a.CRG 	PAGE: 2 
DATE: 3/22/2023 
  
FULL ANALYSIS 
I.  SUBSTANTIVE ANALYSIS 
 
A. EFFECT OF PROPOSED CHANGES: 
Present Situation 
 
Non-Profit Security Grant Program Administered by FEMA 
 
As the nationwide organization responsible for federal emergency preparation and response, the 
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) has tremendous capacity to coordinate resources 
within the federal government.
1
 FEMA coordinates several grant programs. Funds are made available 
for pre- and post-emergency or disaster related projects.
2
  Grants are the principal funding mechanism 
used by FEMA to award federal funding to state, local, tribal, territorial, certain private nonprofits, 
individuals, and institutions of higher learning.
3
 FEMA grants support recovery initiatives, research, and 
security infrastructure development, among other programs.  
 
There are four major categories for FEMA grant funding: 
 
 Preparedness Grants; 
 Hazard Mitigation Assistance Grants;  
 Resilience Grants; and 
 Emergency Food and Shelter Programs. 
 
 
The Non-Profit Security Grant Program (NSGP) is one of the grants administered under FEMA 
Preparedness Grants. These grants support first responders to ensure their coordination to protect 
against, respond to, and recover from issues of terrorism and other emergencies.
4
 The NSGP provides 
funding support for target hardening and physical security enhancements to nonprofit organizations that 
are at high risk of terrorist attack.
5
 The intent of NSPGs is to promote preparedness activities among 
state and local governments and agencies, emphasizing coordination with public and private 
community representatives.
6
  
 
The NSGP is one of three grant programs supporting the comprehensive measures authorized by 
Congress enabling the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) and FEMA to help strengthen the 
nation’s communities against extremist attacks.
7
  
 
Funding allocated under NSGP is broken down by two categories: Urban Area (UA) and State (NSGP-
S). Funds allocated to UA are awarded to nonprofit organizations located within one of the Urban Area 
Security initiative (UASI) designated high-risk urban areas. NSGP-S funding is for nonprofit 
organizations located outside of the high-risk urban areas.  
 
The designated State Administrative Agency (SAA) is the only entity eligible to apply for NSGP funds. 
The SAA applies to FEMA on behalf of eligible nonprofit organizations.
8
 Eligible organizations must be 
located within one of the designated high-risk urban areas listed by FEMA.  The three areas listed in 
                                                
1
 FEMA, About Us: FEMA, www.fema.gov/about (last visited March 13, 2023).  
2
 FEMA, FEMA Grants, www.fema.gov/grants (last visited March 13, 2023). 
3
 Id. 
4
 FEMA, Preparedness Grants, www.fema.gov/grants/preparedness (last visited March 13, 2023). 
5
 FEMA, Nonprofit Security Grant Program, www.fema.gov/grants/nonprofit-security (last visited March 13, 2023). 
6
 Id. 
7
 FEMA, FY 2023 Nonprofit Security Grant Program Fact Sheet, Feb. 27, 2023. 
www.fema.gov/grants/preparedness/nonprofit-security (last visited March 13, 2023).  
8
 Id.  STORAGE NAME: h1615a.CRG 	PAGE: 3 
DATE: 3/22/2023 
  
Florida are Tampa, Orlando, Miami/Ft. Lauderdale.
9
 The SAA in Florida is the Florida Department of 
Emergency Management (FDEM).  
 
Florida Department of Emergency Management 
 
In its role as SAA for the NSGP, FDEM regularly publishes an application guide for organizations to 
use. This guide provides important program information, including key dates, award information, 
funding maximum amounts, restrictions, and permitted activities for use of funds.
10
 The application 
guide highlights “priority areas” for the specific year.
11
 The application guide also provides details 
regarding which select items are allowable from the Authorized Equipment List.
12
 
 
FDEM receives completed applications and submits them to DHS and FEMA. FDEM may work with 
applicants to ensure their submission is completed properly and timely, but cannot change return dates 
or provide awards.
13
 
 
Effect of Proposed Changes 
 
The bill creates a state of Florida Nonprofit Security Grant Program modeled after the federal NSGP. 
Florida nonprofit organizations that are at high risk of violent attacks or hate crimes may apply for 
grants from the funds appropriated by the Legislature to the program. Grants may be used to increase 
safety and security, for the purchase and installation of security infrastructure, perimeter lighting and 
fencing, door hardening, security camera systems, hiring security personnel, training for security 
personnel and staff, and shatter resistant glass for windows. Minimum award amounts will be $10,000 
and the maximum award per application is $150,000. FDEM is permitted use up to 3% for the 
administration of the program.  
 
FDEM is permitted to adopt rules to administer this program. The statute created, s. 252.3712, F.S., 
expires on January 1, 2028, unless reenacted by the Legislature.  
 
B. SECTION DIRECTORY: 
Section 1 creates s. 252.3712, F.S. the Nonprofit Security Grant Program. 
 
Section 2 provides for an effective date of July 1, 2023.  
 
II.  FISCAL ANALYSIS & ECONOMIC IMPACT STATEMENT 
 
A. FISCAL IMPACT ON STATE GOVERNMENT: 
 
1. Revenues: 
None.  
 
2. Expenditures: 
None. 
 
B. FISCAL IMPACT ON LOCAL GOVERNMENTS: 
 
1. Revenues: 
                                                
9
 FEMA, Department of Homeland Security Notice of Funding Opportunity FY 2022 NSGP, Feb. 27, 2023. 
www.fema.gov/grants/preparedness/nonprofit-security (last visited March 14, 2023). 
10
 FDEM, Nonprofit Security Grant Program FY 2023 Application Guide, March 2023, 
www.floridadisaster.org/preparedness/external/grants (last visited March 14, 2023).  
11
 Id. at 5-6. 
12
 Id. at 10. 
13
 Id. at 3.  STORAGE NAME: h1615a.CRG 	PAGE: 4 
DATE: 3/22/2023 
  
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
None. 
 
C. DIRECT ECONOMIC IMPACT ON PRIVATE SECTOR: 
The bill may expand opportunities for private nonprofit entities to increase security at their locations.  
 
D. FISCAL COMMENTS: 
None. 
 
III.  COMMENTS 
 
A. CONSTITUTIONAL ISSUES: 
 
1. Applicability of Municipality/County Mandates Provision: 
 
Not Applicable. This bill does not appear to require counties or municipalities to spend funds or take 
action requiring the expenditures of funds; reduce the authority that counties or municipalities have 
to raise revenues in the aggregate; or reduce the percentage of state tax shared with counties or 
municipalities. 
 
 2. Other: 
None. 
 
B. RULE-MAKING AUTHORITY: 
The bill provides additional rulemaking authority for the Department of Emergency Management to 
implement the new statutory requirements. 
 
C. DRAFTING ISSUES OR OTHER COMMENTS: 
None.  
IV.  AMENDMENTS/COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE CHANGES