Florida 2023 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0096 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 03/17/2023

                    The Florida Senate 
BILL ANALYSIS AND FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT 
(This document is based on the provisions contained in the legislation as of the latest date listed below.) 
Prepared By: The Professional Staff of the Committee on Transportation  
 
BILL: SB 96 
INTRODUCER:  Senator DiCeglie 
SUBJECT:  Transportation Facility Designations/Deputy Sheriff Michael Hartwick Memorial 
Highway 
DATE: March 17, 2023 
 
 ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR  REFERENCE  	ACTION 
1. Price Vickers TR Pre-meeting 
2.     ATD   
3.     FP  
 
I. Summary: 
SB 96 designates the portion of I-275 between mile markers 30 and 31 in Pinellas County as 
“Deputy Sheriff Michael Hartwick Memorial Highway” and directs the Florida Department of 
Transportation (FDOT) to erect suitable markers. 
 
The estimated cost to the FDOT to install the designation markers required under the bill is 
$1,480. See the “Fiscal Impact Statement” below for details. 
 
The bill takes effect July 1, 2023. 
II. Present Situation: 
Section 334.071, F.S., provides that legislative designations of transportation facilities are for 
honorary or memorial purposes or to distinguish a particular facility. Such designations are not to 
be construed as requiring any action by local governments or private parties regarding the 
changing of any street signs, mailing addresses, or 911 emergency telephone number system 
listings, unless the legislation specifically provides for such changes.
1
 
 
When the Legislature establishes road or bridge designations, the FDOT is required to place 
markers only at the termini specified for each highway segment or bridge designated by the law 
creating the designation and to erect any other markers it deems appropriate for the 
transportation facility.
2
 
 
                                                
1
 Section 334.071(1), F.S.  
2
 Section 334.071(2), F.S. 
REVISED:   BILL: SB 96   	Page 2 
 
The FDOT may not erect the markers for honorary road or bridge designations unless the 
affected city or county commission enacts a resolution supporting the designation. When the 
designated road or bridge segment is located in more than one city or county, each affected local 
government must pass resolutions supporting the designations before the installation of the 
markers.
3
 
 
Deputy Sheriff Michael Hartwick 
On September 22, 2022, Pinellas County Deputy Sheriff Michael Hartwick succumbed to 
injuries he received while working an overnight traffic-directing assignment in a construction 
zone at I-275 and Ulmerton Road, near the Howard Frankland Bridge. Deputy Hartwick was 
outside his cruiser when he was struck by a front-end loader hauling concrete barriers. Deputy 
Hartwick served with the Pinellas County Sheriff’s Office for 19 years. He was 51 and was 
survived by his two sons and his mother.
4
 
III. Effect of Proposed Changes: 
The bill creates an undesignated section of Florida law designating the portion of I-275 between 
mile markers 30 and 31 in Pinellas County as “Deputy Sheriff Michael Hartwick Memorial 
Highway” and directs the Florida Department of Transportation (FDOT) to erect suitable 
markers. 
 
The bill takes effect July 1, 2023. 
IV. Constitutional Issues: 
A. Municipality/County Mandates Restrictions: 
None. 
B. Public Records/Open Meetings Issues: 
None. 
C. Trust Funds Restrictions: 
None. 
D. State Tax or Fee Increases: 
None. 
                                                
3
 Section 334.071(3), F.S. 
4
 See Officer Down Memorial Page, Deputy Sheriff Michael Hartwick, available at Deputy Sheriff Michael Hartwick, 
Pinellas County Sheriff's Office, Florida (odmp.org), and Fox News, Florida deputy killed by illegal immigrant in hit-and-
run before fleeing scene, sheriff says, available at Florida deputy killed by illegal immigrant in hit-and-run before fleeing 
scene, sheriff says | Fox News (last visited January 10, 2023).  BILL: SB 96   	Page 3 
 
E. Other Constitutional Issues: 
None identified. 
V. Fiscal Impact Statement: 
A. Tax/Fee Issues: 
None. 
B. Private Sector Impact: 
None. 
C. Government Sector Impact: 
The estimated cost to erect the designation markers required under this bill is $1,480, 
based on the assumption that a minimum of two markers are required at a cost to the 
FDOT of no less than $740 each. The estimate includes labor, materials, manufacturing, 
and installation. The FDOT is expected to absorb the estimated cost within existing 
resources. 
VI. Technical Deficiencies: 
None. 
VII. Related Issues: 
None. 
VIII. Statutes Affected: 
This bill creates an undesignated section of Florida law.  
IX. Additional Information: 
A. Committee Substitute – Statement of Changes: 
(Summarizing differences between the Committee Substitute and the prior version of the bill.) 
None. 
B. Amendments: 
None. 
This Senate Bill Analysis does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill’s introducer or the Florida Senate.