Florida 2023 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0444 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 04/04/2023

                    The Florida Senate 
BILL ANALYSIS AND FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT 
(This document is based on the provisions contained in the legislation as of the latest date listed below.) 
Prepared By: The Professional Staff of the Committee on Education PreK-12 
 
BILL: SB 444 
INTRODUCER:  Senator Ingoglia 
SUBJECT:  District School Board Elections 
DATE: April 3, 2023 
 
 ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR  REFERENCE  	ACTION 
1. Biehl Roberts EE Favorable 
2. Sagues Bouck ED Favorable 
3.     RC  
 
I. Summary: 
SB 444 revises the residency requirement for school board candidates. Current law requires a 
candidate for school board to be a resident of the district school board member residence area in 
which he or she seeks election at the time he or she qualifies to run for the office. This bill 
changes the time at which the residency requirement must be met to the time at which an elected 
school board member assumes office. 
 
The bill takes effect July 1, 2023. 
II. Present Situation: 
Many elected offices require that the public officials holding them live within a specified district 
or area. Unless otherwise provided for constitutionally, legislatively, or judicially, any residency 
requirement for an elected office must be met at the time of assuming office.
1
 Some offices with 
specified residency requirements are below. 
 
Office 	Point at Which Residency Requirement 
Must be Met 
City commissioner 	At time of assuming office, unless otherwise 
provided by city charter or ordinance
2
 
                                                
1
 Florida Division of Elections, Guidelines for Determining When Residency Qualifications for Elected Office Must be Met 
(2018), available at https://soe.dos.state.fl.us/pdf/DE%20Guide%200008%20-
%20Guidelines%20for%20Determining%20When%20Residency%20Qualifications....pdf. 
2
 See Nichols v. State, 177 So.2d 467 (Fla. 1965); Marina v. Leahy, 578 So.2d 382; and Division of Elections, Advisory 
Opinions by Year (94-04 and 92-10), https://www.dos.myflorida.com/elections/laws-rules/advisory-opinions/advisory-
opinions-by-year/ (last visited March 27, 2023). 
REVISED:   BILL: SB 444   	Page 2 
 
Congressional member (U.S. Senator or 
U.S. Representative) 
At time of election
3
 
County commissioner 	At time of election
4
 
Constitutional county officers (clerk of 
court, supervisor of elections, property tax 
appraiser, sheriff) 
At time of assuming office
5
 
Governor, Lieutenant Governor, or Cabinet 
member 
At time of election
6
 
Judge 	At time of assuming office
7
 
State legislators 	At time of election
8
 
School board members 	At time of qualifying
9
 
School superintendent 	At time of assuming office
10
 
 
For the purpose of electing district school board members, each district must be divided into at 
least five district school board member residence areas.
11
 A district may also have 7 district 
school board members, with 5 residence areas and two members elected at large, contingent 
upon district school board resolution approved by voters in the district.
12
  
 
Each candidate for district school board member must, at the time she or he qualifies, be a 
resident of the district school board member residence area from which the candidate seeks 
election. Each candidate who qualifies to have her or his name placed on the ballot is listed 
according to the district school board member residence area in which she or he resides. The 
candidate from each district school board member residence area who receives the highest 
number of votes in the general election is elected to the district school board.
13
 
                                                
3
 U.S. CONST. art. 1, ss. 2 and 3. 
4
 See State v. Grassi, 532 So.2d 1055 (Fla. 1988); FLA. CONST. art. VII, s. 1(e) (Amended 1998), Division of Elections, 
Advisory Opinions by Year (94-04 and 92-10), https://www.dos.myflorida.com/elections/laws-rules/advisory-
opinions/advisory-opinions-by-year/ (last visited March 27, 2023), and Office of Attorney General, Attorney General 
Opinion 74-293, http://myfloridalegal.com/ago.nsf/Opinions/BA862ABB5A8981B3852566B3005C4A25 (last visited Mar. 
27, 2023). 
5
 See Division of Elections, Advisory Opinions by Year (90-30, 94-04 and 92-10), 
https://www.dos.myflorida.com/elections/laws-rules/advisory-opinions/advisory-opinions-by-year/ (last visited Mar. 27, 
2023) 
6
 FLA. CONST. art. IV, s. 5, (Amended 1998).  
7
 See FLA. CONST. art. V, s. 8 (Amended 1998), and Division of Elections, Advisory Opinions by Year (78-31 and 94-04), 
https://www.dos.myflorida.com/elections/laws-rules/advisory-opinions/advisory-opinions-by-year/ (last visited Mar. 27, 
2023. 
8
 See Ruiz v. Farias, 43 So.3d 124 (Fla. 3DCA 2010). 
9
 See ss. 1001.34 and 1001.361, F.S.; and Division of Elections opinions 82-02 and 94-04. 
10
 See Division of Elections, Advisory Opinions by Year (94-04), https://www.dos.myflorida.com/elections/laws-
rules/advisory-opinions/advisory-opinions-by-year/ (last visited Mar. 27, 2023). 
11
 Section 1001.36(1), F.S. 
12
 Sections 1001.36(1) and 1001.34(2), F.S. 
13
 Section 1001.361, F.S.  BILL: SB 444   	Page 3 
 
III. Effect of Proposed Changes: 
The bill brings the residency requirement for school board members more in line with those for 
other offices by providing that a school board member must meet the residency requirement at 
the time he or she assumes office. 
 
The bill takes effect July 1, 2023. 
IV. Constitutional Issues: 
A. Municipality/County Mandates Restrictions: 
None. 
B. Public Records/Open Meetings Issues: 
None. 
C. Trust Funds Restrictions: 
None. 
D. State Tax or Fee Increases: 
None. 
E. Other Constitutional Issues: 
None. 
V. Fiscal Impact Statement: 
A. Tax/Fee Issues: 
None. 
B. Private Sector Impact: 
None. 
C. Government Sector Impact: 
None. 
VI. Technical Deficiencies: 
None.  BILL: SB 444   	Page 4 
 
VII. Related Issues: 
None. 
VIII. Statutes Affected: 
This bill substantially amends section 1001.361, Florida Statutes.   
IX. Additional Information: 
A. Committee Substitute – Statement of Changes: 
(Summarizing differences between the Committee Substitute and the prior version of the bill.) 
None. 
B. Amendments: 
None. 
This Senate Bill Analysis does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill’s introducer or the Florida Senate.