Florida 2023 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0478 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 03/27/2023

                    The Florida Senate 
BILL ANALYSIS AND FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT 
(This document is based on the provisions contained in the legislation as of the latest date listed below.) 
Prepared By: The Professional Staff of the Committee on Appropriations  
 
BILL: CS/SB 478 
INTRODUCER:  Appropriations Committee on Education Committee and Senator Perry 
SUBJECT:  Early Childhood Music Education Incentive Program 
DATE: March 27, 2023 
 
 ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR  REFERENCE  	ACTION 
1. Brick Bouck ED Favorable 
2. Gray Elwell AED  Fav/CS 
3. Gray Sadberry AP Pre-meeting 
 
Please see Section IX. for Additional Information: 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE - Substantial Changes 
 
I. Summary: 
CS/SB 478 converts the Early Childhood Music Education Incentive Pilot Program into a 
permanent program administered by the Department of Education. 
 
The bill has no impact on state revenues or expenditures. The program is contingent upon 
legislative appropriation.  
 
This bill takes effect upon becoming a law. 
II. Present Situation: 
The Legislature established the Early Childhood Music Education Incentive Pilot Program (pilot 
program) in 2017 to assist certain school districts in implementing comprehensive music 
education programs in kindergarten through grade 2, beginning with the 2017-2018 school year.
1
 
 
For a school district to be eligible for participation in the pilot program, the district school 
superintendent must certify to the Commissioner of Education (commissioner) that specified 
elementary schools within the district have established a comprehensive music education 
program that: 
 Includes all students enrolled at the school in kindergarten through second grade; 
                                                
1
 Chapter 2017-116, Laws of Fla. 
REVISED:   BILL: CS/SB 478   	Page 2 
 
 Is staffed by certified music educators; 
 Provides music instruction for at least 30 consecutive minutes two days a week; 
 Complies with class size requirements under the law; and 
 Complies with the Department of Education’s standards for early childhood music education 
programs for students in kindergarten through second grade. 
 
The commissioner must select school districts for participation in the pilot program, subject to 
legislative appropriation, based on the school district’s proximity to the University of Florida and 
needs-based criteria established by the State Board of Education. Selected school districts must 
annually receive $150 per full-time equivalent student in kindergarten through second grade who 
is enrolled in a comprehensive music education program.
 
 
 
The University of Florida’s College of Education is required to collaborate with Florida 
International University’s School of Music to evaluate the effectiveness of the pilot program. 
Upon completion, the results of the evaluation must be shared with the Florida Center for 
Partnerships in Arts-Integrated Teaching. The State Board of Education is authorized to adopt 
rules to administer the pilot program.
2
 
 
The Legislature appropriated $400,000 for the pilot program in each of the fiscal years from 
2020 through 2023.
3
  For the 2021-2022 school year, 10 schools from the Alachua, Marion, and 
Miami-Dade school districts were selected to participate in the program and served 
approximately 2,000 students in kindergarten through second grade.
4
 
 
The pilot program is scheduled to expire on June 30, 2023.
5
 
III. Effect of Proposed Changes: 
The bill converts the Early Childhood Music Education Incentive Pilot Program into a permanent 
program. The bill shifts from the Commissioner of Education to the Department of Education the 
responsibility for administering the program. The bill replaces the requirement for the program 
administrator to select school districts to participate in the program with the requirement to 
approve school districts to participate in the program. 
 
The bill removes the responsibilities assigned to the University of Florida and Florida 
International University and removes proximity to the University of Florida as a factor in 
eligibility to participate in the program. 
 
Transitioning the pilot to a permanent program may increase the number of school districts that 
implement a comprehensive music education programs for students in kindergarten through 
second grade. 
 
The bill takes effect upon becoming a law. 
                                                
2
 Section 1003.481, F.S. 
3
 Ch. 2020-111, s. 2, Specific Appropriation 114, Laws of Fla.; Ch. 2021-36, s. 2, Specific Appropriation 110, Laws of Fla.; 
and Ch. 2022-156, s. 2, Specific Appropriation 104, Laws of Fla. 
4
 Email, Office of Senator Keith Perry (Feb. 27, 2023), with attachments (on file with Senate Education). 
5
 Section 1003.481(6), F.S.  BILL: CS/SB 478   	Page 3 
 
IV. Constitutional Issues: 
A. Municipality/County Mandates Restrictions: 
None. 
B. Public Records/Open Meetings Issues: 
None. 
C. Trust Funds Restrictions: 
None. 
D. State Tax or Fee Increases: 
None. 
E. Other Constitutional Issues: 
None. 
V. Fiscal Impact Statement: 
A. Tax/Fee Issues: 
None. 
B. Private Sector Impact: 
None. 
C. Government Sector Impact: 
The bill has no impact on state revenues or expenditures. The program is contingent upon 
legislative appropriation. 
VI. Technical Deficiencies: 
None. 
VII. Related Issues: 
None. 
VIII. Statutes Affected: 
This bill substantially amends section 1003.481 of the Florida Statutes.  BILL: CS/SB 478   	Page 4 
 
IX. Additional Information: 
A. Committee Substitute – Statement of Substantial Changes:  
(Summarizing differences between the Committee Substitute and the prior version of the bill.) 
CS by Appropriations Committee on Education on March 14, 2023: 
The committee substitute revises the bill to state the Early Childhood Music Incentive 
Program is subject to appropriations provided in the General Appropriations Act. 
B. Amendments: 
None. 
This Senate Bill Analysis does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill’s introducer or the Florida Senate.