Florida 2024 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0271 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 01/08/2024

                    This docum ent does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill sponsor or House of Representatives. 
STORAGE NAME: h0271.LFS 
DATE: 1/8/2024 
 
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES STAFF ANALYSIS  
 
BILL #: HB 271    Motor Vehicle Parking on Private Property 
SPONSOR(S): Lopez, V. and others 
TIED BILLS:   IDEN./SIM. BILLS: SB 388 
 
REFERENCE 	ACTION ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR or 
BUDGET/POLICY CHIEF 
1) Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special 
Districts Subcommittee 
 	Mwakyanjala Darden 
2) State Affairs Committee    
SUMMARY ANALYSIS 
Current law authorizes the owner or operator of private property used as a motor vehicle parking facility to 
establish rules and rates that govern private persons parking at the facility. These rates may include parking 
charges for violating the rules of the property owner or operator. Any rules or rates must be posted and clearly 
visible to those parking at the facility. Invoices for parking charges must contain specified information to show 
the charges are not being levied by a governmental entity. Counties and municipalities are prohibited from 
enacting an ordinance or regulation restricting or prohibiting the right of a private property owner or operator to 
establish such rules and rates. Any ordinance or regulation that violates the prohibition is null and void. 
 
The bill: 
 Requires the rules and rates for parking facilities to be posted in a manner that is legible and clearly 
visible when entering and exiting the area used for parking;  
 Requires any invoice for parking charges to be mailed within 48 hours of the violation; 
 Prohibits the owners or operators of a privately-owned parking facility from assessing a late fee for at 
least 30 days after the invoice’s postmarked date of mailing; 
 Requires all invoices issued by the owner or operator to include an appeal process adjudicated by a 
neutral third-party to be available to any party believing to have received the invoice in error; 
 Establishes a 10-minute grace period in which owners and operators of privately-owned parking 
facilities may not charge vehicle operators that enter the parking facility, provided the vehicle does not 
park; and 
 Prohibits an owner or operator from allowing payment using a mobile payment application unless the 
application sends notice to the application’s user when the parking session has expired or if the vehicle 
exits the facility without paying. 
  
The bill clarifies that the prohibition on counties and municipalities enacting ordinances or regulations 
restricting in any manner the parking rates charged by property owners and operators of privately-owned 
parking facilities includes parking charges for violating the rules of the property owner or operator. 
 
The bill does not appear to have a fiscal impact on state or local governments. 
   STORAGE NAME: h0271.LFS 	PAGE: 2 
DATE: 1/8/2024 
  
FULL ANALYSIS 
I.  SUBSTANTIVE ANALYSIS 
 
A. EFFECT OF PROPOSED CHANGES: 
Present Situation 
 
In 2019, the City of Miami passed an emergency ordinance banning the operators of a privately-owned 
parking facility in the city from issuing citations for violations of facility rules, claiming that such citations 
caused confusion for the recipients who sometimes thought the citations were city-issued and could 
lead to civil or criminal penalties.
1
 In 2021, the City of Miami amended the ordinance to authorize the 
issuance of private parking citations if they are not called a “violation, citation, or ticket” and include a 
notice informing the recipient that “[t]his invoice is privately issued, is not issued by a governmental 
authority, and is not subject to civil or criminal penalties.”
2
 That same year, Broward County enacted an 
ordinance making it “unlawful for any person, including a parking facility operator or agent, to issue a 
private ticket to a motor vehicle or to the owner of any such vehicle.”
3
 
 
In 2022, the Legislature enacted s. 715.071, F.S., which expressly authorizes the owner or operator of 
private property used as a motor vehicle parking facility to establish rules and rates that govern private 
persons parking at the facility.
4
 As part of establishing rules and rates, property owners or operators 
may also set parking charges for violating the parking facility’s rules. Any rules and rates must be 
posted and clearly visible to persons parking motor vehicles on the property. If the owner or operator of 
the property issues an invoice for any parking charges, that invoice must include the following 
statement in uppercase type: 
 
THIS INVOICE IS PRIVATELY ISSUED, IS NOT ISSUED BY A GOVERNMENTAL 
AUTHORITY, AND IS NOT SUBJECT TO CRIMINAL PENALTIES. 
 
Counties and municipalities are prohibited from enacting an ordinance or regulation restricting or 
prohibiting the right of a private property owner or operator to establish rules and rates.
5
 Any ordinance 
or regulation that violates this prohibition is null and void. 
 
Effect of Proposed Changes 
 
The bill requires the owner or operator of a privately-owned parking facility to post the rules and rates in 
a manner than is legible and clearly visible upon entering and exiting the area used for parking. 
 
The bill provides that any invoice for parking charges must be mailed within 48 hours of the violation. 
The owner or operator may not assess a late fee for at least 30 days after the postmarked date of the 
invoice and the invoice must include a method to appeal for a party who believes they have received 
the invoice in error. The bill requires the appeal must be heard by a neutral third-party adjudicator with 
the authority to review and make a determination on the validity of the appeal. 
 
The bill clarifies that the prohibition on counties and municipalities enacting ordinances or regulations 
restricting the parking rates charged by property owners and operators of privately-owned property for 
motor vehicle parking includes parking charges for violating the rules of the property owner or 
operator. 
 
The bill establishes a 10-minute grace period in which owners and operators of privately-owned 
parking facilities may not charge vehicle operators that enter the private property, if the vehicle does 
not park during the grace period. 
 
                                                
1
 City of Miami, Fla. Ord. No. 13840 (enacted May 23, 2019); S. 25-292, City of Miami, Fla. Code of Ordinances.  
2
 City of Miami, Fla. Ord. No. 13990 (enacted April 22, 2021); S. 25-292, City of Miami, Fla. Code of Ordinances.  
3
 Broward County, Fla. Ord. No. 2021-43 (enacted Sept. 21, 2021); S. 20-164.2, Broward County, Fla. Code of Ordinances.  
4
 S. 715.075(1), F.S. 
5
 S. 715.075(2), F.S.  STORAGE NAME: h0271.LFS 	PAGE: 3 
DATE: 1/8/2024 
  
The bill prohibits an owner or operator of a privately-owned parking facility from using a mobile 
payment application unless the application sends a notice to the application’s user when the parking 
session has expired or if the vehicle leaves the premises without paying. 
 
B. SECTION DIRECTORY: 
Section 1: Amends s. 715.075, F.S., relating to the use of private property for motor vehicle   
 parking. 
 
Section 2: Provides an effective date of July 1, 2024. 
 
II.  FISCAL ANALYSIS & ECONOMIC IMPACT STATEMENT 
 
A. FISCAL IMPACT ON STATE GOVERNMENT: 
 
1. Revenues: 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
None. 
 
B. FISCAL IMPACT ON LOCAL GOVERNMENTS: 
 
1. Revenues: 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
None. 
 
C. DIRECT ECONOMIC IMPACT ON PRIVATE SECTOR: 
The requirement to have invoices be mailed within 48 hours, a 30-day waiting period before assessing 
late fees, and the 10-minute grace period may reduce the revenue of the owners and operators of 
privately-owned parking facilities. 
 
D. FISCAL COMMENTS: 
None. 
 
III.  COMMENTS 
 
A. CONSTITUTIONAL ISSUES: 
 
 1. Applicability of Municipality/County Mandates Provision: 
Not applicable. This bill does not appear to require counties or municipalities to spend funds or take 
action requiring the expenditures of funds; reduce the authority that counties or municipalities have 
to raise revenues in the aggregate; or reduce the percentage of state tax shared with counties or 
municipalities. 
 
 2. Other: 
None. 
 
B. RULE-MAKING AUTHORITY: 
The bill neither provides authority for nor requires rulemaking by executive branch agencies.  STORAGE NAME: h0271.LFS 	PAGE: 4 
DATE: 1/8/2024 
  
 
C. DRAFTING ISSUES OR OTHER COMMENTS: 
None. 
 
IV.  AMENDMENTS/COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE CHANGES 
Not applicable.