Florida 2024 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0475 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 02/08/2024

                       
 
CS/CS/HB 475  	2024 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb0475-02-c2 
Page 1 of 3 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
A bill to be entitled 1 
An act relating to a temporary sales tax exemption for 2 
items related to electric transportation; defining the 3 
terms "electric bicycle," "electric scooter," and 4 
"protective clothing and equipment"; providing a sales 5 
tax exemption during specified periods on the retail 6 
sale of certain electric bicycles, electric scooters, 7 
and protective clothing and equipment; providing 8 
applicability; authorizing the Department of Revenue 9 
to adopt emergency rules; providing that such rules 10 
are effective for a certain period and may be renewed 11 
in specified circumstances; providing an effective 12 
date. 13 
  14 
Be It Enacted by the Legislature of the State of Florida: 15 
 16 
 Section 1.  Electric bicycles, electric scooters, and 17 
protective clothing and equipment; sales tax holiday. — 18 
 (1)  For the purposes of this section, the term: 19 
 (a)  "Electric bicycle" has the same meaning as in s. 20 
316.003, Florida Statutes. 21 
 (b)  "Electric scooter" means a vehicle having two or fewer 22 
wheels, with or without a seat or saddle for the use of the 23 
rider, which is equipped to be propelled by an electric motor 24 
and which weighs less than 75 pounds, is less than 2 feet wide, 25     
 
CS/CS/HB 475  	2024 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb0475-02-c2 
Page 2 of 3 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
and is designed for a maximum speed of l ess than 35 miles per 26 
hour. 27 
 (c)  "Protective clothing and equipment" means apparel 28 
designed and intended for use during the operation of an 29 
electric bicycle or electric scooter which incorporates padding 30 
to protect from or mitigate injury. 31 
 (2)  The tax levied under chapter 212, Florida Statutes, 32 
may not be collected during the period from August 1, 2024, 33 
through September 14, 2024, and November 1, 2024, through 34 
December 15, 2024, on the retail sale of: 35 
 (a)  An electric bicycle with a sales price of $1,75 0 or 36 
less. 37 
 (b)  An electric scooter with a sales price of $500 or 38 
less. 39 
 (c)  The following protective clothing and equipment: 40 
 1.  A helmet with a sales price of $150 or less. 41 
 2.  Knee pads with a sales price of $50 or less. 42 
 3.  Elbow pads with a sales price of $50 or less. 43 
 (3)  The tax exemptions provided in this section do not 44 
apply to sales within a theme park or entertainment complex as 45 
defined in s. 509.013(9), Florida Statutes, within a public 46 
lodging establishment as defined in s. 509.013(4), Florida 47 
Statutes, or within an airport as defined in s. 330.27, Florida 48 
Statutes. 49 
 (4)  The lease or rental of an electric bicycle, an 50     
 
CS/CS/HB 475  	2024 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb0475-02-c2 
Page 3 of 3 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
electric scooter, or protective clothing and equipment does not 51 
qualify as an exempt retail sale under this exemption. 52 
 (5)  The Department of Revenue is authorized, and all 53 
conditions are deemed met, to adopt emergency rules pursuant to 54 
s. 120.54(4), Florida Statutes, for the purpose of implementing 55 
this section. Notwithstanding any other law to the contrary, 56 
emergency rules adopted under this section are effective for the 57 
length of the exemption period and may be renewed during the 58 
pendency of procedures to adopt permanent rules addressing the 59 
subject of the emergency rules. 60 
 Section 2.  This act shall take effect upon becoming a law. 61