Florida 2024 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0501 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 11/29/2023

                    This docum ent does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill sponsor or House of Representatives. 
STORAGE NAME: h0501.PEW 
DATE: 11/29/2023 
 
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES STAFF ANALYSIS  
 
BILL #: HB 501    Renaming of Tallahassee Community College 
SPONSOR(S): Shoaf 
TIED BILLS:    IDEN./SIM. BILLS:  SB 522 
 
REFERENCE 	ACTION ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR or 
BUDGET/POLICY CHIEF 
1) Postsecondary Education & Workforce 
Subcommittee 
 	Kiner Kiner 
2) Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee    
3) Education & Employment Committee   
SUMMARY ANALYSIS 
The bill changes the name of ‘Tallahassee Community College’ to ‘Tallahassee State College’. Tallahassee 
Community College has met the criteria for seeking a name change from the Legislature. 
 
There may be costs associated with the name change, such as those related to signage, publication, 
documentation, advertising, and other related items. These costs are estimated at approximately $500,000, will 
be absorbed by the institution and expended over two fiscal years.  
 
The bill is effective July 1, 2024.   STORAGE NAME: h0501.PEW 	PAGE: 2 
DATE: 11/29/2023 
  
FULL ANALYSIS 
I.  SUBSTANTIVE ANALYSIS 
 
A. EFFECT OF PROPOSED CHANGES: 
Present Situation 
 
Florida College System 
 
The Florida Constitution provides for a single state college system comprised of all public community 
and state colleges in the state.
1
 This system is known as the Florida College System and is comprised 
of 28 institutions. The purpose of the Florida College System is to maximize open access for students, 
respond to community needs for postsecondary academic education and career degree education. 
Each Florida College System institution is governed by a local board of trustees.
2
 
 
Tallahassee Community College 
 
Tallahassee Community College (TCC) opened in 1966 as ‘Tallahassee Junior College’.
3
 In 1970, the 
college’s name was changed to Tallahassee Community College to better reflect its community 
orientation and involvement.
4
 TCC is accredited by the Southern Association of Colleges and Schools 
Commission on Colleges (SACS) to award associate’s and baccalaureate degrees.
5
 TCC offers 
baccalaureate degrees in the following programs: nursing; business administration; elementary 
education; and exceptional student education. 
 
Florida College System Institution Name Change 
 
With the approval of its board of trustees, a Florida College System institution may change the 
institution’s name and use the designation ‘college’ or ‘state college’ if it has been authorized to grant 
baccalaureate degrees and has been accredited as a baccalaureate-degree-granting institution by an 
accrediting agency or association recognized by the United States Department of Education.
6
 
 
With the approval of its board of trustees, a Florida College System institution that either has not been 
authorized to grant baccalaureate degrees or has not been accredited as a baccalaureate-degree-
granting institution by an accrediting agency or association recognized by the United States 
Department of Education may request approval from the State Board of Education (SBE) to change the 
institution’s name and use the designation ‘college’.
7
 The SBE may approve the request if the Florida 
College System institution enters into an agreement with the SBE to do the following: 
 
 Maintain as its primary mission responsibility for responding to community needs for postsecondary 
academic education and career degree education. 
 Maintain an open-door admissions policy for associate-level degree programs and workforce 
education programs. 
 Continue to provide outreach to underserved populations. 
 Continue to provide remedial education. 
 Comply with all provisions of the statewide articulation agreement that relate to 2-year and 4-year 
public degree-granting institutions as adopted by the SBE. 
                                                
1
 FLA. CONST., Art. IX, s. 8(a). 
2
 FLA. CONST., Art. IX, ss. 8(a), (b). 
3
 See memorandum on ‘Renaming of Tallahassee Community College,’ District Board of Trustees meeting on November 14, 2023, 
available here. (last visited November 27, 2023).  
4
 Id. 
5
 Southern Association of Colleges and Schools, Commission on Colleges, Tallahassee Community College, 
https://sacscoc.org/institutions/?institution_name=Tallahassee+COmmunity+COllege&results_per_page=25&curpage=1&institution=
0011N00001h9EGAQA2. (last visited November 28, 2023). 
6
 S. 1001.60(2)(b)1., F.S. 
7
 S. 1001.60(2)(b)2., F.S.  STORAGE NAME: h0501.PEW 	PAGE: 3 
DATE: 11/29/2023 
  
 
A Florida College System institution whose board of trustees approves a name change must seek 
statutory codification of such name change during the next regular legislative session. 
 
Tallahassee Community College Name Change 
 
In June 2023, TCC convened a task force to begin the process of seeking a name change and rebrand 
for the institution.
8
 The task force included internal representatives from each division of the College, a 
staff council, members of the Faculty Senate, Alumni and Friends Association, and Student 
Government Association.
9
 Through a competitive bidding process, the task force also hired a 
consulting firm to assist the process by
10
: 
 
 Providing a report that evaluates TCC’s current brand through research, surveys, and focus groups. 
 Developing and testing a new name and logo, if applicable, that keeps with TCC’s mission and 
vision, reflects the already-defined brand position, and helps to improve its position and strength in 
the market. 
 Developing primary logo variations and additional branding for departments and initiatives. 
 Providing a rebrand communications strategy and implementation plan for execution by the task 
force. 
 
As a result of the research conducted and report provided by the consulting firm, the task force 
provided recommendations to the president of TCC, who evaluated them and provided his 
recommendation to the TCC Board of Trustees.
11
 On November 14, 2023, the TCC Board of Trustees 
approved the president’s recommendation to change TCC’s name to ‘Tallahassee State College’.  
 
As TCC is accredited by SACS as a baccalaureate-degree-granting institution and the Board of 
Trustees has approved the name change, TCC has met the statutory criteria to seek a name change 
from the Legislature.  
 
There may be costs associated with the name change, such as those related to signage, publication, 
documentation, advertising, and other related items. These costs are estimated at approximately 
$500,000, will be absorbed by the institution and expended over two fiscal years.  
 
B. SECTION DIRECTORY: 
Section 1. Changes the name of ‘Tallahassee Community College’ to ‘Tallahassee State College’. 
Section 2. Provides an effective date. 
II.  FISCAL ANALYSIS & ECONOMIC IMPACT STATEMENT 
 
A. FISCAL IMPACT ON STATE GOVERNMENT: 
 
1. Revenues: 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
None. 
 
B. FISCAL IMPACT ON LOCAL GOVERNMENTS: 
1. Revenues: 
See fiscal comments. 
                                                
8
 See memorandum on ‘Renaming of Tallahassee Community College,’ District Board of Trustees meeting on November 14, 2023, 
available here. (last visited November 27, 2023).  
9
 Id. 
10
 Id. 
11
 Id.  STORAGE NAME: h0501.PEW 	PAGE: 4 
DATE: 11/29/2023 
  
 
2. Expenditures: 
See fiscal comments.  
 
C. DIRECT ECONOMIC IMPACT ON PRIVATE SECTOR: 
See fiscal comments. 
 
D. FISCAL COMMENTS: 
There may be costs associated with the name change, such as those related to signage, publication, 
documentation, advertising, and other related items. These costs are estimated at approximately 
$500,000, will be absorbed by the institution and expended over two fiscal years. 
 
The name change and rebrand may have an indeterminate positive fiscal impact as it may lead to an 
increase in enrollment, particularly in its baccalaureate programs.  
III.  COMMENTS 
 
A. CONSTITUTIONAL ISSUES: 
 
 1. Applicability of Municipality/County Mandates Provision: 
Not applicable. 
 
 2. Other: 
None. 
 
B. RULE-MAKING AUTHORITY: 
None. 
 
C. DRAFTING ISSUES OR OTHER COMMENTS: 
None. 
IV.  AMENDMENTS/COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE CHANGES