This document does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill sponsor or House of Representatives. STORAGE NAME: DATE: HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES STAFF FINAL BILL ANALYSIS BILL #: HB 501 Renaming of Tallahassee Community College SPONSOR(S): Shoaf and others TIED BILLS: None. IDEN./SIM. BILLS: SB 522 FINAL HOUSE FLOOR ACTION: 114 Y’s 0 N’s GOVERNOR’S ACTION: Approved SUMMARY ANALYSIS HB 501 passed the House on March 5, 2024, as SB 522. The bill changes the name of ‘Tallahassee Community College’ to ‘Tallahassee State College’. Tallahassee Community College has met the criteria for seeking a name change from the Legislature. There may be costs associated with the name change, such as those related to signage, publication, documentation, advertising, and other related items. These costs, estimated at approximately $500,000, will be absorbed by the institution and expended over two fiscal years. The bill was approved by the Governor on March 27, 2024, ch. 2024-43, L.O.F., and will become effective on July 1, 2024. STORAGE NAME: PAGE: 2 DATE: I. SUBSTANTIVE INFORMATION A. EFFECT OF CHANGES: Present Situation Florida College System The Florida Constitution provides for a single state college system comprised of all public community and state colleges in the state. 1 This system is known as the Florida College System and is comprised of 28 institutions. The purpose of the Florida College System is to maximize open access for students, respond to community needs for postsecondary academic education and career degree education. Each Florida College System institution is governed by a local board of trustees. 2 Tallahassee Community College Tallahassee Community College (TCC) opened in 1966 as ‘Tallahassee Junior College’. 3 In 1970, the college’s name was changed to Tallahassee Community College to better reflect its community orientation and involvement. 4 TCC is accredited by the Southern Association of Colleges and Schools Commission on Colleges (SACS) to award associate’s and baccalaureate degrees. 5 TCC offers baccalaureate degrees in the following programs: nursing; business administration; elementary education; and exceptional student education. Florida College System Institution Name Change With the approval of its board of trustees, a Florida College System institution may change the institution’s name and use the designation ‘college’ or ‘state college’ if it has been authorized to grant baccalaureate degrees and has been accredited as a baccalaureate-degree-granting institution by an accrediting agency or association recognized by the United States Department of Education. 6 With the approval of its board of trustees, a Florida College System institution that either has not been authorized to grant baccalaureate degrees or has not been accredited as a baccalaureate-degree- granting institution by an accrediting agency or association recognized by the United States Department of Education may request approval from the State Board of Education (SBE) to change the institution’s name and use the designation ‘college’. 7 The SBE may approve the request if the Florida College System institution enters into an agreement with the SBE to do the following: Maintain as its primary mission responsibility for responding to community needs for postsecondary academic education and career degree education. Maintain an open-door admissions policy for associate-level degree programs and workforce education programs. Continue to provide outreach to underserved populations. Continue to provide remedial education. 1 FLA. CONST., Art. IX, s. 8(b). 2 FLA. CONST., Art. IX, ss. 8(a), (b). 3 See memorandum on ‘Renaming of Tallahassee Community College,’ District Board of Trustees meeting on November 14, 2023, https://www.tcc.fl.edu/media/divisions/board-of-trustees-documents/2023/november/District-Board-of-Trustees-Packet-Document.pdf (last visited March 6, 2024). 4 Id. 5 Southern Association of Colleges and Schools, Commission on Colleges, Tallahassee Community College, https://sacscoc.org/institutions/?institution_name=Tallahassee+COmmunity+COllege&results_per_page=25&curpage=1&institution= 0011N00001h9EGAQA2. (last visited March 6, 2024). 6 S. 1001.60(2)(b)1., F.S. 7 S. 1001.60(2)(b)2., F.S. STORAGE NAME: PAGE: 3 DATE: Comply with all provisions of the statewide articulation agreement that relate to 2-year and 4- year public degree-granting institutions as adopted by the SBE. A Florida College System institution whose board of trustees approves a name change must seek statutory codification of such name change during the next regular legislative session. Tallahassee Community College Name Change In June 2023, TCC convened a task force to begin the process of seeking a name change and rebrand for the institution. 8 The task force included internal representatives from each division of the College, a staff council, members of the Faculty Senate, Alumni and Friends Association, and Student Government Association. 9 Through a competitive bidding process, the task force also hired a consulting firm to assist the process by 10 : Providing a report that evaluates TCC’s current brand through research, surveys, and focus groups. Developing and testing a new name and logo, if applicable, that keeps with TCC’s mission and vision, reflects the already-defined brand position, and helps to improve its position and strength in the market. Developing primary logo variations and additional branding for departments and initiatives. Providing a rebrand communications strategy and implementation plan for execution by the task force. As a result of the research conducted and report provided by the consulting firm, the task force provided recommendations to the president of TCC, who evaluated them and provided his recommendation to the TCC Board of Trustees. 11 On November 14, 2023, the TCC Board of Trustees approved the president’s recommendation to change TCC’s name to ‘Tallahassee State College’. Effect of the Bill The bill changes the name of ‘Tallahassee Community College’ to ‘Tallahassee State College’. Tallahassee Community College has met the criteria for seeking a name change from the Legislature. As TCC is accredited by SACS as a baccalaureate-degree-granting institution and the Board of Trustees has approved the name change, TCC has met the statutory criteria to seek a name change from the Legislature. There may be costs associated with the name change, such as those related to signage, publication, documentation, advertising, and other related items. These costs, estimated at approximately $500,000, will be absorbed by the institution and expended over two fiscal years. 12 II. FISCAL ANALYSIS & ECONOMIC IMPACT STATEMENT A. FISCAL IMPACT ON STATE GOVERNMENT: 1. Revenues: 8 See memorandum on ‘Renaming of Tallahassee Community College,’ District Board of Trustees meeting on November 14, 2023, https://www.tcc.fl.edu/media/divisions/board-of-trustees-documents/2023/november/District-Board-of-Trustees-Packet-Document.pdf (last visited March 6, 2024). 9 Id. 10 Id. 11 Id. 12 Id. STORAGE NAME: PAGE: 4 DATE: None. 2. Expenditures: See fiscal comments. B. FISCAL IMPACT ON LOCAL GOVERNMENTS: 1. Revenues: See fiscal comments. 2. Expenditures: See fiscal comments. C. DIRECT ECONOMIC IMPACT ON PRIVATE SECTOR: See fiscal comments. D. FISCAL COMMENTS: There may be costs associated with the name change, such as those related to signage, publication, documentation, advertising, and other related items. These costs are estimated at approximately $500,000, will be absorbed by the institution and expended over two fiscal years. 13 The name change and rebrand may have an indeterminate positive fiscal impact as it may lead to an increase in enrollment, particularly in its baccalaureate programs. 13 See memorandum on ‘Renaming of Tallahassee Community College,’ District Board of Trustees meeting on November 14, 2023, https://www.tcc.fl.edu/media/divisions/board-of-trustees-documents/2023/november/District-Board-of-Trustees-Packet-Document.pdf (last visited March 6, 2024).