Florida 2024 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0765 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 02/07/2024

                    This docum ent does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill sponsor or House of Representatives. 
STORAGE NAME: h0765b.APC 
DATE: 2/7/2024 
 
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES STAFF ANALYSIS  
 
BILL #: HB 765    Leave of Absence to Officials and Employees 
SPONSOR(S): Daley 
TIED BILLS:   IDEN./SIM. BILLS: SB 818 
 
REFERENCE 	ACTION ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR or 
BUDGET/POLICY CHIEF 
1) Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special 
Districts Subcommittee 
16 Y, 0 N Burgess Darden 
2) Appropriations Committee  	Perez Pridgeon 
3) State Affairs Committee    
SUMMARY ANALYSIS 
The provisions of the federal Uniformed Services Employment and Reemployment Rights Act (USERRA) apply 
to the state. USERRA provides employment protections to servicemembers who have to leave employment to 
perform military service. USERRA requires compliance of private and public employers, including at the state 
and local level. 
 
Current law provides a paid leave of absence for state officials and employees, as well as the officials and 
employees of counties, municipalities, and other political subdivisions of the state, for participation in training or 
active military service.  
 
A public official or employee who is a servicemember of the National Guard or a reserve component of the 
United States Armed Forces is eligible to receive full public pay, regardless of any other compensation from 
the military or other source, for the first 30 days of a leave of absence to perform active military service. 
Beyond the first 30 days, an employer may supplement military pay to bring the total salary of the employee to 
the amount earned before the start of active military duty. During the time that a public employee is in active 
military service, the employer must continue to provide state-issued health insurance and other employee 
benefits.  
 
The bill revises a requirement that a public employer provide an employee or official who is a servicemember a 
full paid leave of absence for the first 30 days of active military service. The bill limits application of the paid 
leave of absence to a servicemember who is activated under federal military service that is 90 consecutive 
days or more. 
 
The bill may have a positive fiscal impact on state and local governments. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
FULL ANALYSIS  STORAGE NAME: h0765b.APC 	PAGE: 2 
DATE: 2/7/2024 
  
I.  SUBSTANTIVE ANALYSIS 
 
A. EFFECT OF PROPOSED CHANGES: 
 
Present Situation 
 
Uniformed Services Employment and Reemployment Rights Act (USERRA)
1
 
 
The provisions of the federal USERRA apply to the state.
2
 USERRA provides employment protections 
to servicemembers who have to leave employment to perform military service. 
 
USERRA areas of coverage apply to: 
 Reemployment rights; 
 Freedom from discrimination and retaliation; and 
 Continuation of health insurance coverage.
3
 
 
USERRA requires compliance of private and public employers, including at the state and local level.
4
 
 
Public Employment Leave of Absence for Military Duty 
 
Current law provides a paid leave of absence for state officials and employees, as well as the officials 
and employees of counties, municipalities, and other political subdivisions of the state, for participation 
in training or active military service.
5
 The provisions apply to  
servicemembers serving as a member of the: 
 United States Armed Forces on active or state active duty;
 6
 
 Florida National Guard; or 
 United States Reserve Forces.
7
 
 
 
A public official or employee who is a servicemember of the National Guard or a reserve component of 
the United States Armed Forces is eligible to receive full public pay, regardless of any other 
compensation from the military or other source, for the first 30 days of a leave of absence to perform 
active military service.
8
 Beyond the first 30 days, an employer may supplement military pay to bring the 
total salary of the employee, including base military pay, to the amount earned before the start of active 
military duty.
9
 During the time that a public employee is in active military service, the employer must 
continue to provide health insurance and other employee benefits.
10
 
 
A leave of absence due to military training is addressed separately from active military duty.
11
 A public 
official or employee who is a servicemember is entitled to a leave of absence without loss of vacation 
leave, pay, time, or efficiency rating for each day ordered to military training.
12
 However, paid leaves of 
absence is limited to 240 working hours in any one annual period. For any absence in excess of 240 
                                                
1
 38 U.S.C. ch. 43. 
2
 S. 115.15, F.S. 
3
 U.S. Dept. of Labor, Veterans’ Employment and Training Service, Know Your Rights, 
https://www.dol.gov/agencies/vets/programs/userra/aboutuserra#:~:text=USERRA%20prohibits%20employment%20discrimination%20
against,obligations%2C%20or%20intent%20to%20serve (last visited Jan. 19, 2024). 
4
 U.S. Dept. of Labor, A Guide to the Uniformed Services Employment and Reemployment Rights Act, 
https://www.dol.gov/agencies/vets/programs/userra/USERRA-Pocket-
Guide#:~:text=USERRA%20applies%20to%20virtually%20all,size%2C%20including%20the%20Federal%20Government (last visited 
Jan. 20, 2024). 
5
 Ss. 115.07, 115.09, and 115.14, F.S. 
6
 The “armed forces” include the United States Army, Navy, Air Force, Marine Corps, Space Force, or Coast Guard. S. 250.01(4), F.S. 
7
 S. 250.01(19), F.S. 
8
 Ss. 115.09 and 115.14, F.S. See also Op. Att’y Gen. Fla. 98-43 (1998). 
9
 Section 115.14, F.S. 
10
 Id. 
11
 S. 115.07, F.S. 
12
 S. 115.07(2), F.S.  STORAGE NAME: h0765b.APC 	PAGE: 3 
DATE: 2/7/2024 
  
hours, an employer may grant administrative leave without pay, but may not reduce a servicemember’s 
time or efficiency rating for providing such leave. 
 
Effect of Proposed Changes 
 
The bill revises a requirement that a public employer provide an employee or official who is a 
servicemember a full paid leave of absence for the first 30 days of active military service. The 
bill limits application of the paid leave of absence to a servicemember who is activated under 
federal military service that is 90 consecutive days or more. 
 
 
B. SECTION DIRECTORY: 
Section 1: Amends s. 115.09, F.S., providing certain public officials and employees 
may receive full pay for a leave of absence relating to active federal military service that 
lasts a certain length of time.  
 
 Section 2: Amends s. 115.14, F.S., providing certain public officials and employees 
may receive full pay for a leave of absence relating to active federal military service that 
lasts a certain length of time. 
 
Section 3: Provides an effective date of July 1, 2024. 
II.  FISCAL ANALYSIS & ECONOMIC IMPACT STATEMENT 
 
A. FISCAL IMPACT ON STATE GOVERNMENT: 
 
1. Revenues: 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
The bill may have a positive impact on state government expenditures to the extent employees 
currently receive pay for leaves of absence of less than 90 days. 
 
 
B. FISCAL IMPACT ON LOCAL GOVERNMENTS: 
 
1. Revenues: 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
The bill may have a positive impact on local government expenditures to the extent employees 
currently receive pay for leaves of absence of less than 90 days. 
 
 
C. DIRECT ECONOMIC IMPACT ON PRIVATE SECTOR: 
None. 
 
D. FISCAL COMMENTS: 
None. 
  STORAGE NAME: h0765b.APC 	PAGE: 4 
DATE: 2/7/2024 
  
III.  COMMENTS 
 
A. CONSTITUTIONAL ISSUES: 
 
 1. Applicability of Municipality/County Mandates Provision: 
Not Applicable.  This bill does not appear to require counties or municipalities to spend funds or take 
action requiring the expenditures of funds; reduce the authority that counties or municipalities have 
to raise revenues in the aggregate; or reduce the percentage of state tax shared with counties or 
municipalities. 
 
 2. Other: 
    None. 
 
B. RULE-MAKING AUTHORITY: 
The bill neither provides authority for nor requires rulemaking by executive branch agencies. 
 
C. DRAFTING ISSUES OR OTHER COMMENTS: 
None. 
 
IV.  AMENDMENTS/COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE CHANGES 
None.