Florida 2024 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0767 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 02/12/2024

                    This docum ent does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill sponsor or House of Representatives. 
STORAGE NAME: h0767c.EEC 
DATE: 2/12/2024 
 
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES STAFF ANALYSIS  
 
BILL #: CS/HB 767    Resident Status for Tuition Purposes 
SPONSOR(S): Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee, Edmonds and others 
TIED BILLS:  None. IDEN./SIM. BILLS: SB 62 
 
REFERENCE 	ACTION ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR or 
BUDGET/POLICY CHIEF 
1) Postsecondary Education & Workforce 
Subcommittee 
15 Y, 1 N, As CS Kiner Kiner 
2) Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee 13 Y, 1 N Smith Smith 
3) Education & Employment Committee 	Kiner Hassell 
SUMMARY ANALYSIS 
In-state tuition rates for Florida public postsecondary education institutions are set in statute. A student 
classified as a ‘resident for tuition purposes’ qualifies to pay in-state tuition. Any student classified as a 
‘nonresident for tuition purposes’ is charged an additional fee for instruction provided by a public 
postsecondary education institution in the state. To be classified as a resident for tuition purposes, a person 
must have maintained legal residence in the state for 12 consecutive months and provide documentation of his 
or her residence as outlined in statute.  
 
The bill provides that an individual classified as a resident for tuition purposes may not lose his or her resident 
status for tuition purposes solely by reason of incarceration in a state or federal correctional facility in this state.  
 
The bill has an indeterminate fiscal impact on state revenues. See fiscal comments. 
 
The bill is effective July 1, 2024. 
   STORAGE NAME: h0767c.EEC 	PAGE: 2 
DATE: 2/12/2024 
  
FULL ANALYSIS 
I.  SUBSTANTIVE ANALYSIS 
 
A. EFFECT OF PROPOSED CHANGES: 
Current Situation 
 
Tuition and Out-of-State Fees  
 
Under Florida law, ‘tuition’ is defined as the basic fee charged to a student for instruction provided by a 
public postsecondary educational institution in the state.
1
 A ‘resident for tuition purposes’ is a student 
who qualifies for the in-state tuition rate.
2
 The resident undergraduate tuition rate for the State 
University System (SUS) is currently set in statute at $105.07 per credit hour.
3
 For baccalaureate 
degree programs offered at a Florida College System institution, the statutory resident tuition rate is 
$91.79 per credit hour.
4
 
 
Residents for tuition purposes are charged the statutory rates for tuition while non-residents pay out-of-
state fees in addition to tuition, unless these costs are exempted or waived. An ‘out-of-state fee’ is the 
additional fee for instruction provided by a public postsecondary education institution in the state, and is 
charged to a student who does not qualify for the in-state tuition rate.
5
 Across the State University 
System, for the 2023-24 academic year, the average out-of-state fee was $464.94 per credit hour.
6
  
Across the Florida College System, for the 2022-23 academic year, the weighted average of out-of-
state fee for baccalaureate degree programs was $318.63 per credit hour.
7
   
 
Establishing Residency Status for Tuition Purposes 
 
With respect to tuition and fees at public postsecondary institutions, a legal Florida resident is someone 
who has maintained his or her residence in the state for the preceding year, has purchased a home 
which is occupied by him or her as his or her residence, or has established a domicile in this state.
8
 
Such residency must be bona fide and not for the sole purpose of enrollment at the institution. If the 
person is a dependent child, his or her parent (or guardian) must meet this requirement. 
 
Currently, residency must be proven by two or more documents, including at least one of the following:
9
 
 A voter registration card. 
 A driver license/identification card.  
 A vehicle registration. 
 Proof of a permanent home in Florida occupied as a primary residence. 
 Proof of a homestead exemption. 
 High school transcripts from a Florida high school for multiple years if the diploma was earned 
within the last 12 months. 
 Proof of permanent employment (30 or more hours per week for a 12-month period).  
               
 
Additionally, one or more of the following may also be evidenced:
10
 
                                                
1
 s. 1009.01(1), F.S. 
2
 s. 1009.21(1)(g), F.S.  
3
 s. 1009.24(4)(a), F.S. 
4
 s. 1009.23(3)(b), F.S. 
5
 s. 1009.01(2), F.S.  
6
 Florida Board of Governors, Tuition & Fees, https://www.flbog.edu/universities/parents-students/tuition-fees/ (last visited Feb. 1, 
2024). 
7
 Florida Department of Education, Florida College System, Accountability – Data Systems, 
https://www.fldoe.org/accountability/data-sys/CCTCMIS/reports.stml, (link to 2023 Fact Book, worksheet FB 7.12T within the Excel 
file) (last visited Feb. 1, 2024). 
8
 s. 1009.21(1)(d), F.S. 
9
 s. 1009.21(3)(c)1., F.S. 
10
 s. 1009.21(3)(c)2., F.S.  STORAGE NAME: h0767c.EEC 	PAGE: 3 
DATE: 2/12/2024 
  
 Declaration of domicile. 
 Professional or occupational license. 
 Business incorporation. 
 Documentation of family ties.  
 Membership in Florida-based charitable or professional organization. 
 Any other supporting documentation supporting residency (lease agreement, utility bills, etc.). 
 
A person loses his or her classification as a resident for tuition purposes if:
11
 
 The person or, if he or she is a dependent child, the person’s parent or parents establish 
domicile or legal residence outside of the state. The person’s resident status will continue for a 
12-month statutory grace period.  
 The person ceases to be enrolled at or graduates from an institution of higher education while 
classified as a resident for tuition purposes, subsequently abandons their domicile in Florida, 
and fails to reestablish his or her domicile in the state within 12 months.  
 
Effect of Proposed Changes 
 
The bill provides that an individual classified as a resident for tuition purposes may not lose his or her 
resident status for tuition purposes solely by reason of incarceration in a state or federal correctional 
facility in this state. 
 
B. SECTION DIRECTORY: 
Section 1: Provides that a person may not lose his or her resident status for tuition purposes due to 
incarceration. 
 
Section 2:  Provides an effective date. 
II.  FISCAL ANALYSIS & ECONOMIC IMPACT STATEMENT 
 
A. FISCAL IMPACT ON STATE GOVERNMENT: 
 
1. Revenues: 
See fiscal comments. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
None. 
 
B. FISCAL IMPACT ON LOCAL GOVERNMENTS: 
 
1. Revenues: 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
None. 
 
C. DIRECT ECONOMIC IMPACT ON PRIVATE SECTOR: 
See fiscal comments. 
 
D. FISCAL COMMENTS: 
The bill has an indeterminate fiscal impact on Florida College System and State University System 
revenues. An out-of-state fee would no longer be collected from students that would not qualify for in-
state tuition rates solely by reason of incarceration. However, colleges and universities may see an 
                                                
11
 s. 1009.21(8)-(9), F.S.  STORAGE NAME: h0767c.EEC 	PAGE: 4 
DATE: 2/12/2024 
  
increase in enrollment, and therefore revenues, as the bill removes a barrier to access for the formerly 
incarcerated student population.  
 
The formerly incarcerated students impacted by this bill would save an average of $318.63 per credit 
hour for baccalaureate programs at Florida College System institutions and an average of $464.94 per 
credit hour at State University System institutions. 
III.  COMMENTS 
 
A. CONSTITUTIONAL ISSUES: 
 
 1. Applicability of Municipality/County Mandates Provision: 
None. 
 
 2. Other: 
None. 
 
B. RULE-MAKING AUTHORITY: 
None. 
 
C. DRAFTING ISSUES OR OTHER COMMENTS: 
None. 
IV.  AMENDMENTS/COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE CHANGES 
On January 25, 2024, the Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee considered a 
Proposed Committee Substitute (PCS) and subsequently reported the PCS favorably as a committee 
substitute. The PCS differed from the original bill in the following ways: 
 
 Removed a provision allowing an individual who is currently incarcerated or who has been released 
within the 12 months preceding their residency determination to provide expired documentation to 
support their request for resident status; and 
 Removed a provision allowing a non-resident to earn residency for tuition purposes by virtue of 
being incarcerated in Florida for at least 18 months of a sentence of three years or longer and by 
evidencing ties to Florida. 
 
The bill analysis is drafted to the committee substitute adopted by the Postsecondary Education & 
Workforce Subcommittee.