Florida 2024 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1165 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 03/13/2024

                     
This document does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill sponsor or House of Representatives. 
STORAGE NAME: h1165z.LFS.docx 
DATE: 3/13/2024 
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES STAFF FINAL BILL ANALYSIS  
 
BILL #: CS/CS/HB 1165    Town of Sneads, Jackson County 
SPONSOR(S): State Affairs Committee; Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts 
Subcommittee; Abbott 
TIED BILLS:    IDEN./SIM. BILLS:   
 
 
 
 
FINAL HOUSE FLOOR ACTION: 118 Y’s 
 
0 N’s GOVERNOR’S ACTION: Pending 
 
 
SUMMARY ANALYSIS 
CS/CS/HB 1165 passed the House on February 15, 2024, and subsequently passed the Senate on March 7, 
2024. 
 
The State of Florida owns lands for many purposes including preservation, conservation, recreation, water 
management, historic preservation, and administration of government. Most of these lands are held by the 
Board of Trustees of the Internal Improvement Trust Fund (Board), consisting of the Governor and Cabinet.  
The Board may acquire, sell, transfer, and administer state lands in the manner consistent with state law. 
 
The Town of Sneads is a municipality of approximately 4.5 square miles in Jackson County. The town has a 
population of 1,687.  
 
The bill directs the Board to convey in fee simple to the Town of Sneads property in Jackson County consisting 
of approximately 13.44 acres. The bill requires the Board to convey the property within 90 days of the bill 
taking effect. 
 
The bill requires the Town of Sneads to manage and protect the conveyed property and use it continuously for 
recreational means and purposes. In the event of a sale or disposition of the property, the bill gives the Board 
the option to regain ownership of the property. 
 
The Economic Impact Statement states that the bill is not expected to have a fiscal impact. 
 
Subject to the Governor’s veto powers, the effective date of this bill is upon becoming a law. 
    
STORAGE NAME: h1165z.LFS.docx 	PAGE: 2 
DATE: 3/13/2024 
  
I. SUBSTANTIVE INFORMATION 
 
A. EFFECT OF CHANGES:  
 
Present Situation 
 
State Lands 
 
The State of Florida owns lands for many purposes including preservation, conservation, recreation, 
water management, historic preservation, and administration of government. These lands include all: 
 Swamp and overflowed lands held by the state or that may inure to the state. 
 Lands owned by the state by right of its sovereignty.
1
 
 Internal improvement lands proper. 
 Tidal lands. 
 Lands covered by shallow waters of the ocean or gulf, or bays or lagoons thereof, and lands 
owned by the state covered by fresh water. 
 Parks, reservations, or lands or bottoms set aside in the name of the state, excluding lands held 
for transportation facilities and transportation corridors and canal rights-of-way. 
 Lands that have accrued or may accrue to the state.
2
 
 
State lands are held in trust for the use and benefit of the people of Florida by the Board of Trustees of 
the Internal Improvement Trust Fund (Board).
3
 The Board consists of the Governor, Attorney General, 
Chief Financial Officer, and Commissioner of Agriculture.
4
 This body may acquire, sell, transfer, and 
administer state lands in the manner consistent with state law.
5
   
 
The Department of Environmental Protection through the Division of State Lands generally performs all 
staff duties and functions related to the acquisition, administration, and disposition of state lands, 
although certain staff duties may be performed by water management districts, the Department of 
Agriculture and Consumer Services, or the Fish and Wildlife Conservation Commission.
6
  
 
Town of Sneads 
 
The Town of Sneads is a municipality of approximately 4.5 square miles in Jackson County.
7
 The town 
has a population of 1,687.
8
 Located on the southeastern shore of Lake Seminole, Sneads is well-
known for its “rich outdoor recreation” opportunities, including freshwater fishing, boating, and hunting.
9
 
 
Effect of the Bill 
 
The bill directs the Board to convey in fee simple to the Town of Sneads property in Jackson County 
consisting of approximately 13.44 acres. The bill requires the Board to convey the property within 90 
days of the bill taking effect. 
 
                                                
1
 These are “sovereignty submerged lands,” which include but are not limited to, tidal lands, islands, sand bars, shallow banks, and 
lands waterward of the ordinary or mean high water line, beneath navigable fresh water or beneath tidally-influenced waters, to which 
the State of Florida acquired title on March 3, 1845, by virtue of statehood, and which have not been heretofore conveyed or alienated. 
R. 18-21.003(67), F.A.C. 
2
 S. 253.03(1), F.S. 
3
 S. 253.001, F.S. 
4
 S. 253.02(1), F.S. 
5
 Id. 
6
 S. 253.002(1), F.S. 
7
 Town of Sneads, Community Information, https://sneadsfl.com/ (last visited Jan. 24, 2024). 
8
 Office of Economic and Demographic Research, Florida Population Estimates by County and Municipality 
April 1, 2023, http://edr.state.fl.us/Content/population-demographics/data/2023_Pop_Estimates.pdf (last visited Jan. 27. 2024). 
9
 Town of Sneads, Community Information, https://sneadsfl.com/ (last visited Jan. 24, 2024).   
STORAGE NAME: h1165z.LFS.docx 	PAGE: 3 
DATE: 3/13/2024 
  
The bill requires the Town of Sneads to manage and protect the conveyed property and use it 
continuously for recreational means and purposes. In the event of a sale or disposition of the property, 
the bill gives the Board the option to regain ownership of the property. 
 
The Economic Impact Statement states that the bill is not expected to have a fiscal impact. 
 
II.  FISCAL ANALYSIS & ECONOMIC IMPACT STATEMENT 
  
A. FISCAL IMPACT ON STATE GOVERNMENT: 
 
1. Revenues: 
 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
 
None. 
 
B. FISCAL IMPACT ON LOCAL GOVERNMENTS: 
 
1. Revenues: 
 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
 
According to the economic impact statement, the bill is not expected to have a fiscal impact. 
 
C. ECONOMIC IMPACT STATEMENT FILED?     Yes [x]     No [] 
 
D. NOTICE PUBLISHED?     Yes [x]     No [] 
 
      IF YES, WHEN? October 12, 2023. 
 
      WHERE?  Jackson County Times, a weekly newspaper published in Jackson County. 
 
E. REFERENDUM(S) REQUIRED?     Yes []     No [x]