Florida 2024 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1653 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 03/13/2024

                     
This document does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill sponsor or House of Representatives. 
STORAGE NAME: h1653z.DOCX 
DATE: 3/8/2024 
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES STAFF FINAL BILL ANALYSIS  
 
BILL #: CS/HB 1653    Duties and Prohibited Acts Associated with Death 
SPONSOR(S): Criminal Justice Subcommittee, Giallombardo and others 
TIED BILLS:   IDEN./SIM. BILLS: CS/SB 768 
 
 
 
 
FINAL HOUSE FLOOR ACTION: 112 Y’s 
 
0 N’s GOVERNOR’S ACTION: Pending 
 
 
SUMMARY ANALYSIS 
CS/HB 1653 passed the House on March 1, 2024, and subsequently passed the Senate on March 4, 2024. 
 
Generally, s. 406.11, F.S., requires a district medical examiner to determine the cause of death of a deceased 
human being in specified circumstances, including when a person’s cause of death is not obvious, when a 
death may implicate criminal activity, or when a death impacts public health and safety. Section 406.12, F.S., 
requires a person who becomes aware of the death of any person under circumstances described in s. 406.11, 
F.S., to report such a death and the circumstances surrounding the death to the district medical examiner. Any 
person who knowingly fails or refuses to report such a death or the circumstances surrounding the death, who 
refuses to make available prior medical or other information pertinent to the death investigation, or who, 
without an order from the office of the district medical examiner, willfully touches, removes, or disturbs the 
body, clothing, or any article upon or near the body, with the intent to alter the evidence or circumstances 
surrounding the death, commits a first degree misdemeanor. 
 
The bill amends s. 406.12, F.S., to require a person who becomes aware of the death of any person under the 
circumstances described in s. 406.11, F.S., to report such a death and the circumstances surrounding the 
death to either the district medical examiner or to a law enforcement agency having jurisdiction over the 
location.  
 
The bill retains the first degree misdemeanor offense in current law if a person knowingly fails or refuses to 
report a death under the circumstances described in s. 406.11, F.S., or refuses to make available prior medical 
or other information pertinent to a death investigation, and creates a new offense, punishable as a third degree 
felony,
 
if a person fails to make such a report or fails to make such specified information available with the 
intent to conceal the death or to alter the circumstances surrounding the death. 
 
The bill increases the penalty if a person, without an order from the office of the district medical examiner, 
willfully touches, removes, or disturbs a body, clothing, or any article upon or near the body, with the intent to 
conceal the death or alter the evidence or circumstances surrounding the death, from a first degree 
misdemeanor to a third degree felony. 
 
The Criminal Justice Impact Conference considered the bill on February 12, 2024, and determined that the bill 
may have a positive insignificant prison bed impact by creating a new felony offense and increasing the penalty 
for a specified violation of s. 406.12, F.S., from a first degree misdemeanor to a third degree felony, which may 
lead to increased admissions and longer terms of incarceration in such facilities. 
 
Subject to the Governor’s veto powers, the effective date of this bill is July 1, 2024.    
STORAGE NAME: h1653z.DOCX 	PAGE: 2 
DATE: 3/8/2024 
  
I. SUBSTANTIVE INFORMATION 
 
A. EFFECT OF CHANGES:  
 
Background 
 
District Medical Examiner 
 
The Governor is required to appoint a district medical examiner, who must be a physician who 
practices in pathology, for each medical examiner district in the state.
1
 Currently, there are 25 medical 
examiner districts in Florida.
2
 Section 406.11, F.S., requires a district medical examiner to determine 
the cause of death of a deceased human being in the following circumstances: 
 When any person dies in this state: 
o Of criminal violence. 
o By accident. 
o By suicide. 
o Suddenly, when in apparent good health. 
o Unattended by a practicing physician or other recognized practitioner. 
o In any prison or penal institution. 
o In police custody. 
o In any suspicious or unusual circumstance. 
o By criminal abortion. 
o By poison. 
o By disease constituting a threat to public health. 
o By disease, injury, or toxic agent resulting from employment. 
 When a dead body is brought into this state without proper medical certification. 
 When a body is to be cremated, dissected, or buried at sea.
3
 
 
To determine the cause of death, a medical examiner may perform examinations, investigations, and 
autopsies as he or she deems necessary or as requested by the state attorney.
4
 
 
Duty to Report 
 
Section 406.12, F.S., requires a person who becomes aware of the death of any person under 
circumstances described in s. 406.11, F.S., to report such a death and the circumstances surrounding 
the death to the district medical examiner. Any person who knowingly fails or refuses to report such a 
death or the circumstances surrounding the death, who refuses to make available prior medical or other 
information pertinent to the death investigation, or who, without an order from the office of the district 
medical examiner, willfully touches, removes, or disturbs the body, clothing, or any article upon or near 
the body, with the intent to alter the evidence or circumstances surrounding the death, commits a first 
degree misdemeanor.
5, 6
 
 
Effect of the Bill 
 
The bill amends s. 406.12, F.S., to require a person who becomes aware of the death of any person 
under the circumstances described in s. 406.11, F.S., to report such a death and the circumstances 
                                                
1
 S. 406.06(1)(a), F.S. 
2
 Florida Department of Law Enforcement, Coverage Map – Florida Medical Examiner Districts, 
https://www.fdle.state.fl.us/MEC/Maps/Documents/Coverage-Map.aspx (last visited Mar. 8, 2024). 
3
 S. 406.11(1), F.S. 
4
 Id. 
5
 S. 406.12, F.S. 
6
 A first degree misdemeanor is punishable by up to one year in jail and a $1,000 fine. Ss. 775.082 and 775.083, F.S.   
STORAGE NAME: h1653z.DOCX 	PAGE: 3 
DATE: 3/8/2024 
  
surrounding the death to either the district medical examiner or to a law enforcement agency having 
jurisdiction over the location.  
 
The bill retains the first degree misdemeanor offense in current law if a person knowingly fails or 
refuses to report a death under the circumstances described in s. 406.11, F.S., or refuses to make 
available prior medical or other information pertinent to a death investigation, and creates a new 
offense, punishable as a third degree felony,
 7
 if a person fails to make such a report or fails to make 
such specified information available with the intent to conceal the death or to alter the circumstances 
surrounding the death. 
 
The bill increases the penalty if a person, without an order from the office of the district medical 
examiner, willfully touches, removes, or disturbs a body, clothing, or any article upon or near the body, 
with the intent to conceal the death or alter the evidence or circumstances surrounding the death, from 
a first degree misdemeanor to a third degree felony. 
 
Subject to the Governor’s veto powers, the effective date of this bill is July 1, 2024. 
 
II.  FISCAL ANALYSIS & ECONOMIC IMPACT STATEMENT 
  
A. FISCAL IMPACT ON STATE GOVERNMENT: 
 
1. Revenues: 
 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
 
See Fiscal Comments. 
 
B. FISCAL IMPACT ON LOCAL GOVERNMENTS: 
 
1. Revenues: 
 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
 
See Fiscal Comments. 
 
C. DIRECT ECONOMIC IMPACT ON PRIVATE SECTOR: 
 
None. 
 
D. FISCAL COMMENTS: 
 
The Criminal Justice Impact Conference considered the bill on February 12, 2024, and determined that 
the bill may have a positive insignificant prison bed impact by creating a new felony offense and 
increasing the penalty for a specified violation of s. 406.12, F.S., from a first degree misdemeanor to a 
third degree felony, which may lead to increased admissions and longer terms of incarceration in such 
facilities. 
                                                
7
 A third degree felony is punishable by up to five years imprisonment and a $5,000 fine. Ss. 775.082, 775.083, or 775.084, F.S.