This document does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill sponsor or House of Representatives. STORAGE NAME: h5005z1.DOCX DATE: 6/14/2024 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES STAFF FINAL BILL ANALYSIS BILL #: HB 5005 PCB APC 24-03 Collective Bargaining SPONSOR(S): Appropriations Committee, Leek TIED BILLS: IDEN./SIM. BILLS: SB 2504 FINAL HOUSE FLOOR ACTION: 108 Y’s 0 N’s GOVERNOR’S ACTION: Approved SUMMARY ANALYSIS HB 5005 passed the House on March 8, 2024, as amended by the conference committee, and subsequently passed the Senate on March 8, 2024. The bill directs the resolution of collective bargaining issues at impasse not relating to salary and benefit issues for the 2024-2025 fiscal year regarding state employees. Salary and benefit issues were resolved by the spending decisions in the Fiscal Year 2024-2025 General Appropriations Act (GAA). The bill was approved by the Governor on June 12, 2024, ch. 2024-229, L.O.F., and will become effective on July 1, 2024. STORAGE NAME: h5005z1.DOCX PAGE: 2 DATE: 6/14/2024 I. SUBSTANTIVE INFORMATION A. EFFECT OF CHANGES: Background Chapter 447, F.S., specifies the process for collective bargaining for public employees. The bargaining agent and the negotiator for the state must bargain collectively in the determination of the wages, hours, and terms and conditions of employment of the employees within the bargaining unit. Any collective bargaining agreement reached must be reduced to writing, signed by the chief executive officer for the state and the bargaining agent for the union, and submitted to the members of the bargaining unit for ratification. Upon execution of the collective bargaining agreement, the Governor must request the legislative body to appropriate amounts sufficient to fund the provisions of the agreement. If the Legislature appropriates funds that are not sufficient to fund the agreement, the agreement must be administered on the basis of the amounts actually appropriated. Typically, at the state level, an agreement is not reached on all issues. In that instance, and pursuant to s. 216.163(6), F.S., an impasse is declared on all unresolved issues when the Governor’s budget recommendations are released. By the first day of the regular legislative session, each party must notify the presiding officers of the Legislature of any unresolved issues. 1 A joint select committee of members of the Florida House of Representatives and the Senate is appointed to review the positions of the parties relating to the unresolved issues. No later than the 14th day of the regular session, the committee must hold a public meeting and take public testimony regarding the issues at impasse. 2 During the session, the Legislature must take action to resolve all issues remaining at impasse. Any actions taken by the Legislature are binding on the parties. 3 Following the resolution of the impasse issues, the parties are required to reduce to writing an agreement that includes those issues agreed to by the parties as well as those issues resolved by the Legislature. As noted above, the agreement must be signed by the chief executive officer and the bargaining agent and presented to the members of the bargaining unit for ratification. If the members ratify the agreement, all the provisions of the agreement take effect. If the members do not ratify the agreement, the issues resolved by the Legislature take effect for the next fiscal year that was the subject of the negotiations. The certified bargaining units for state employees and the respective bargaining agents include: American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, Council 79 Administrative and Clerical Unit Operational Services Unit Human Services Unit Professional Unit Florida Nurses Association Professional Health Care Unit Florida State Lodge Fraternal Order of Police Special Agent Unit 1 S. 447.403(5)(a), F.S. 2 Id. 3 S. 447.403(5)(b), F.S. STORAGE NAME: h5005z1.DOCX PAGE: 3 DATE: 6/14/2024 Federation of Physicians and Dentists and State Employees Attorneys Guild Supervisory Non-professional Unit Physicians Unit Attorneys Unit Florida State Fire Service Association Fire Service Unit Police Benevolent Association Law Enforcement Unit Florida Highway Patrol Unit Lottery Law Enforcement Unit Security Services Unit Federation of Public Employees Lottery Administrative and Support Unit Effect of the Bill The bill directs the resolution of collective bargaining issues at impasse not relating to salary and benefit issues for the 2024-2025 fiscal year regarding state employees. Salary and benefit issues were resolved by the spending decisions in the Fiscal Year 2024-2025 General Appropriations Act (GAA). Specifically, the bill provides: Collective bargaining issues at impasse between the State of Florida and the Florida State Fire Association – Fire Service Bargaining Unit, regarding Article 29 “Health and Welfare” are resolved by adopting the state’s proposal dated January 5, 2024. The remainder of the articles shall be resolved by maintaining the status quo under the current collective bargaining agreement. All other mandatory collective bargaining issues at impasse for the 2024-2025 fiscal year which are not addressed by this bill or the GAA will be resolved in accordance with the personnel rules in effect on March 5, 2024, and by otherwise maintaining the status quo under the language of the applicable current collective bargaining agreement. II. FISCAL ANALYSIS & ECONOMIC IMPACT STATEMENT A. FISCAL IMPACT ON STATE GOVERNMENT: 1. Revenues: None 2. Expenditures: None B. FISCAL IMPACT ON LOCAL GOVERNMENTS: None STORAGE NAME: h5005z1.DOCX PAGE: 4 DATE: 6/14/2024 1. Revenues: None 2. Expenditures: None C. DIRECT ECONOMIC IMPACT ON PRIVATE SECTOR: None D. FISCAL COMMENTS: None