Florida 2024 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H5201 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 03/25/2024

                     
This document does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill sponsor or House of Representatives. 
STORAGE NAME: h5201z.DOCX 
DATE: 3/25/2024 
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES STAFF FINAL BILL ANALYSIS  
 
BILL #: HB 5201          PCB SAT 24-01    Trust Funds/Federal Law Enforcement Trust Fund/FGCC 
SPONSOR(S): State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, Busatta Cabrera 
TIED BILLS:   IDEN./SIM. BILLS: SB 2506 
 
 
 
 
FINAL HOUSE FLOOR ACTION: 114 Y’s 
 
0 N’s GOVERNOR’S ACTION: Approved 
 
 
SUMMARY ANALYSIS 
HB 5201 passed the House on February 8, 2024, and subsequently passed the Senate on February 8, 2024. 
 
The bill conforms current law to the proposed House of Representatives’ Fiscal Year 2024-2025 General 
Appropriation Act (GAA). The Florida Gaming Control Commission (Commission) may use the trust fund 
created in the bill to deposit funds collected through gaming enforcement activities. The use of the funds may 
be requested in the Commission’s Legislative Budget Request which must be approved by the Legislature and 
included in the General Appropriations Act. 
 
Section 16.71, F.S., establishes the Commission, within the Department of Legal Affairs (DLA). The 
commission is a separate budget entity and the commissioners serve as the agency head for all purposes. The 
commission is not subject to control, supervision, or direction by DLA.  
 
The Division of Gaming Enforcement (DGE) is created within the commission. The DGE is considered a 
criminal justice agency. The DGE and its investigators are authorized to seize any contraband in accordance 
with the Florida Contraband Forfeiture Act. Contraband includes any equipment, gambling device, apparatus, 
material of gaming, proceeds, substituted proceeds, real or personal property, Internet domain name, gambling 
paraphernalia, lottery tickets, money, currency, or other means of exchange which was obtained, received, 
used, attempted to be used, or intended to be used in violation of the gambling laws of the state.  
 
The Commission does not currently have an established Federal Law Enforcement Trust Fund to deposit 
revenues received as a result of federal criminal, administrative, or civil forfeiture proceedings and receipts and 
revenues received from federal asset-sharing programs. 
 
The bill creates a Federal Law Enforcement Trust Fund within the Commission. The bill states that the 
Commission may deposit into the trust fund receipts and revenues received as a result of federal criminal, 
administrative, or civil forfeiture proceedings and receipts and revenues received from federal asset-sharing 
programs. 
 
The bill does not directly impact state revenues or expenditures. See Fiscal Comments. 
 
The bill was approved by the Governor on March 22, 2024, ch. 2024-37, L.O.F., and will become effective on 
July 1, 2024. 
 
    
STORAGE NAME: h5201z.DOCX 	PAGE: 2 
DATE: 3/25/2024 
  
I. SUBSTANTIVE INFORMATION 
 
A. EFFECT OF CHANGES:  
 
Florida Gaming Control Commission  
 
Section 16.71, F.S., establishes the Florida Gaming Control Commission (Commission), within the 
Department of Legal Affairs (DLA). The Commission is a separate budget entity and the commissioners 
serve as the agency head for all purposes. The Commission is not subject to control, supervision, or 
direction by DLA.  
 
The Division of Gaming Enforcement (DGE) is created within the Commission, and requires the 
commissioners to appoint a director of the DGE who is qualified by training and experience in law 
enforcement or security to supervise, direct, coordinate, and administer all activities of the DGE. The 
DGE is considered a criminal justice agency within the definition of s. 943.045, F.S.
1
 The DGE director 
and all investigators employed by DGE are designated law enforcement officers and have the power to 
detect, apprehend, and arrest for any alleged violation of chapter 24, part II of chapter 285, chapter 
546, chapter 550, chapter 551, or chapter 849, F.S., or any rule adopted pursuant thereto, or any law of 
this state.
2
  
 
DGE law enforcement officers are authorized to enter upon any premises at which gaming activities are 
taking place in the state for the performance of their lawful duties and may take with them any 
necessary equipment.
3
 In any instance in which there is reason to believe that a violation has occurred, 
DGE law enforcement officers have the authority, without warrant, to search and inspect any premises 
where the violation is alleged to have occurred or is occurring, and may, consistent with the United 
States and Florida Constitutions, seize or take possession of any papers, records, tickets, currency, or 
other items related to any alleged violation. 
 
DGE and its investigators are authorized to seize any contraband in accordance with the Florida 
Contraband Forfeiture Act. Contraband includes any equipment, gambling device, apparatus, material 
of gaming, proceeds, substituted proceeds, real or personal property, Internet domain name, gambling 
paraphernalia, lottery tickets, money, currency, or other means of exchange which was obtained, 
received, used, attempted to be used, or intended to be used in violation of the gambling laws of the 
state.
4
 
 
Federal Law Enforcement Trust Funds 
 
Multiple state agencies responsible for law enforcement have Federal Law Enforcement Trust Funds 
that have been statutorily created for various deposits related to criminal, administrative and civil 
forfeiture proceedings. Some of the agencies include the Department of Law Enforcement,
5
 the 
Department of Financial Services,
6
 the Department of Business and Professional Regulation,
7
 the 
                                                
1
 Section 119.01(4), F.S., defines a “criminal justice agency” to mean any law enforcement agency, court, or prosecutor; any other 
agency charged by law with criminal law enforcement duties; any agency having custody of criminal intelligence information or 
criminal investigative information for the purpose of assisting such law enforcement agencies in the conduct of active criminal 
investigation or prosecution or for the purpose of litigating civil actions under the Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organization Act, 
during the time that such agencies are in possession of criminal intelligence information or criminal investigative information pursuant 
to their criminal law enforcement duties; or the Department of Corrections. 
2
 S. 16.711(3), F.S. 
3
 Id. 
4
 S. 932.701(2)(a)2, F.S. 
5
 S. 943.365, F.S. 
6
 S. 17.43, F.S. 
7
 S. 561.027, F.S.   
STORAGE NAME: h5201z.DOCX 	PAGE: 3 
DATE: 3/25/2024 
  
Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services,
8
 the Department of Military Affairs,
9
 and the 
Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles.
10
 
 
The Commission does not currently have an established Federal Law Enforcement Trust Fund to 
deposit revenues received as a result of federal criminal, administrative, or civil forfeiture proceedings 
and receipts and revenues received from federal asset-sharing programs. 
 
Effect of the Bill: 
 
The bill creates a Federal Law Enforcement Trust Fund within the Commission. The bill states that the 
Commission may deposit into the trust fund receipts and revenues received as a result of federal 
criminal, administrative, or civil forfeiture proceedings and receipts and revenues received from federal 
asset-sharing programs. Further, the bill states that funds deposited into the trust fund may be used for 
the operation of the Commission. 
 
The bill takes effect July 1, 2024. 
 
 
II.  FISCAL ANALYSIS & ECONOMIC IMPACT STATEMENT 
 
 
  
A. FISCAL IMPACT ON STATE GOVERNMENT: 
 
1.  Revenues: 
 
See Fiscal Comments. 
 
 
2. Expenditures: 
 
See Fiscal Comments. 
 
 
B. FISCAL IMPACT ON LOCAL GOVERNMENTS: 
 
1. Revenues: 
 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
 
None. 
  
                                                
8
 S. 570.205, F.S. 
9
 S. 250.175, F.S. 
10
 S. 932.705, F.S.   
STORAGE NAME: h5201z.DOCX 	PAGE: 4 
DATE: 3/25/2024 
  
C. DIRECT ECONOMIC IMPACT ON PRIVATE SECTOR: 
 
None. 
 
D. FISCAL COMMENTS: 
 
The bill does not directly impact state revenues or expenditures. However, the creation of the trust fund 
will allow funds that are acquired through the Commission’s gaming enforcement activities to be 
deposited by the Commission. Once there are sufficient funds within the trust fund, the Commission 
may request budget authority to use the funds as part of their Legislative Budget Request.