Florida 2024 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0066 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 12/04/2023

                    The Florida Senate 
BILL ANALYSIS AND FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT 
(This document is based on the provisions contained in the legislation as of the latest date listed below.) 
Prepared By: The Professional Staff of the Committee on Health Policy  
 
BILL: SB 66 
INTRODUCER:  Senators Brodeur and Hooper 
SUBJECT:  Naloxone Awareness Day 
DATE: November 21, 2023 
 
 ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR  REFERENCE  	ACTION 
1. Looke Brown HP Pre-meeting 
2.     GO  
3.     RC  
 
I. Summary: 
SB 66 creates “Victoria’s Law” and designates June 6 of each year as “Naloxone Awareness 
Day.” The bill allows the Governor to issue an annual proclamation for the designation and 
encourages the Department of Health (DOH) to hold events to raise awareness of the dangers of 
opioid overdose and the availability and safe use of Naloxone. 
II. Present Situation: 
According to the U.S. Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC), in 2021 nearly 17,000 
people in the United States died from overdosing on prescription opioids and nearly 71,000 from 
synthetic opioid overdoses.
1
 In Florida, from January to June of 2022, nearly 4,000 people died 
from opioid overdoses with Fentanyl causing 2,744 deaths on its own. Additionally, nearly 
another 2,000 died with opioids in their system.
2
 
 
Naloxone 
An opioid antagonist, such as Naloxone, is a medicine that quickly reverses the effects of an 
opioid overdose. The antagonist works by attaching to opioid receptors to reverse and block the 
effect of opioids. In the case of an opioid overdose, an antagonist is capable of restoring normal 
breathing in someone whose breathing has slowed dramatically or even stopped because of the 
overdose.
3
 
                                                
1
 Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Opioid Overdose, available at 
https://www.cdc.gov/drugoverdose/deaths/opioid-overdose.html, (last visited Nov. 29, 2023). 
2
 Drugs Identified in Deceased Persons by Florida Medical Examiners 2022 Interim Report, Florida Department of Law 
Enforcement, p. 3, available at https://www.fdle.state.fl.us/MEC/Publications-and-Forms/Documents/Drugs-in-Deceased-
Persons/2022-Interim-Drug-Report-FINAL.aspx, (last visited Nov. 29, 2023). 
3
 National Institute on Drug Abuse, Naloxone Drug Facts (Jan. 2022) https://nida.nih.gov/publications/drugfacts/naloxone, 
(Last visited Nov. 29, 2023). 
REVISED:   BILL: SB 66   	Page 2 
 
 
Naloxone is a proven medicine and is deemed to be an essential tool in hospital emergency 
rooms and ambulance emergency kits. It reverses both heroin and opioid overdoses within 
minutes of its administration and can save a life if given in time.
4
 Research shows that when 
naloxone and overdose education are available to community members, overdose deaths 
decrease in those communities.
5
 
 
On March 29, 2023, the U.S. Food and Drug Administration approved Narcan, a four milligram 
Naloxone hydrochloride nasal spray, for over-the-counter, nonprescription use, ensuring that the 
life-saving medication is widely available without the requirement of obtaining a prescription.
6
 
 
Victoria’s Voice Foundation 
Victoria's Voice Foundation was established in 2019 by Jackie and David Siegel after losing 
their 18-year-old daughter, Victoria, to an accidental drug overdose. Victoria's Voice is dedicated 
to providing drug prevention education and naloxone awareness, support and resources to those 
affected by substance use.
7
 
 
As the result of advocacy by the Victoria’s Voice Foundation, the U.S. Congress passed a joint 
resolution on June 6, 2023, recognizing June 6 as Naloxone Awareness Day. The resolution 
promotes awareness of the life-saving drug, Naloxone, which reverses opioid overdoses and 
prevents unnecessary deaths. It also aims to educate members of the public about the importance 
of recognizing the signs of overdose and equipping themselves with the life-saving antidote.
8
 
III. Effect of Proposed Changes: 
SB 66 creates “Victoria’s Law” which designates June 6 of each year as “Naloxone Awareness 
Day.” The bill allows the Governor to issue an annual proclamation designating June 6 as 
“Naloxone Awareness Day” and encourages the DOH to hold events to raise awareness of the 
dangers of opioid overdose and the available and safe use of Naloxone as an effective way to 
rapidly reverse the effects of opioid overdose. 
 
The provisions of the bill take effect upon becoming law. 
                                                
4
 John Strang et al., Take-Home Naloxone for the Emergency Interim Management of Opioid Overdose: The Public Health 
Application of an Emergency Medicine, 79(13) Drugs 1395-1418 (2019), available at 
https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC6728289/, (Last visited Nov. 29, 2023) 
5
 Id. 
6
 FDA Approves First Over-the-Counter Naloxone Nasal Spray, the FDA, March 29, 2023, available at 
https://www.fda.gov/news-events/press-announcements/fda-approves-first-over-counter-naloxone-nasal-spray, (last visited 
Nov. 29, 2023). 
7
 Victoria's Voice Foundation Launches First Ever National Naloxone Awareness Day on June 6 with Support from a 
Bipartisan Congressional Resolution, WCAX3 News, Jun. 6, 2023, available at 
https://www.wcax.com/prnewswire/2023/06/06/victorias-voice-foundation-launches-first-ever-national-naloxone-awareness-
day-june-6-with-support-bipartisan-congressional-resolution/?outputType=amp, (last visited Nov. 29, 2023). 
8
 Marky, Scott Lead Bipartisan, Bicameral Resolution Designating June 6
th
 Naloxone Awareness Day, June 6, 2023, 
available at https://www.markey.senate.gov/news/press-releases/markey-scott-scott-lead-bipartisan-bicameral-resolution-
designating-june-6th-naloxone-awareness-day, (last visited Nov. 29, 2023).  BILL: SB 66   	Page 3 
 
IV. Constitutional Issues: 
A. Municipality/County Mandates Restrictions: 
None. 
B. Public Records/Open Meetings Issues: 
None. 
C. Trust Funds Restrictions: 
None. 
D. State Tax or Fee Increases: 
None. 
E. Other Constitutional Issues: 
None. 
V. Fiscal Impact Statement: 
A. Tax/Fee Issues: 
None. 
B. Private Sector Impact: 
None. 
C. Government Sector Impact: 
None. 
VI. Technical Deficiencies: 
None. 
VII. Related Issues: 
None. 
VIII. Statutes Affected: 
This bill creates section 683.3342 of the Florida Statutes.  BILL: SB 66   	Page 4 
 
IX. Additional Information: 
A. Committee Substitute – Statement of Changes: 
(Summarizing differences between the Committee Substitute and the prior version of the bill.) 
None. 
B. Amendments: 
None. 
This Senate Bill Analysis does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill’s introducer or the Florida Senate.