Florida 2024 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0066 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 01/08/2024

                    The Florida Senate 
BILL ANALYSIS AND FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT 
(This document is based on the provisions contained in the legislation as of the latest date listed below.) 
Prepared By: The Professional Staff of the Committee on Governmental Oversight and Accountability  
 
BILL: SB 66 
INTRODUCER:  Senators Brodeur and Hooper 
SUBJECT:  Naloxone Awareness Day 
DATE: January 8, 2024 
 
 ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR  REFERENCE  	ACTION 
1. Looke Brown HP Favorable 
2. Limones-Borja McVaney GO Pre-meeting 
3.     RC  
 
I. Summary: 
SB 66 creates “Victoria’s Law” and designates June 6 of each year as “Naloxone Awareness 
Day.” The bill allows the Governor to issue an annual proclamation for the designation of 
June 6
th
 as “Naloxone Awareness Day.” The bill encourages the Department of Health (DOH) to 
hold events to raise awareness of the dangers of opioid overdose and the availability and safe use 
of Naloxone. 
 
The bill is not expected to impact state or local government revenues and expenditures. 
 
The bill takes effect upon becoming a law. 
II. Present Situation: 
According to the U.S. Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC), in 2021 nearly 17,000 
people in the United States died from overdosing on prescription opioids and nearly 71,000 
people died from synthetic opioid overdoses.
1
 In Florida, from January to June of 2022, nearly 
4,000 people died from opioid overdoses, while fentanyl, a synthetic opioid, caused another 
2,744 deaths.
2
 
 
Naloxone 
Naloxone is a life-saving medicine that quickly reverses the effects of an opioid overdose. As an 
opioid antagonist, it works by attaching to opioid receptors to reverse and block the effect of 
                                                
1
 Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Opioid Overdose, (Aug. 23, 2023), 
https://www.cdc.gov/drugoverdose/deaths/opioid-overdose.html (last visited Dec. 6, 2023).  
2
 Florida Department of Law Enforcement, Drugs Identified in Deceased Persons by Florida Medical Examiners 2022 
Interim Report, 3 (July 2023), available at https://www.fdle.state.fl.us/MEC/Publications-and-Forms/Documents/Drugs-in-
Deceased-Persons/2022-Interim-Drug-Report-FINAL.aspx (last visited Dec. 6, 2023).  
REVISED:   BILL: SB 66   	Page 2 
 
opioids. In the case of an opioid overdose, an antagonist is capable of restoring normal breathing 
in someone whose breathing has slowed dramatically or even stopped because of the overdose.
3
 
 
Naloxone is a proven medicine that is an essential tool in hospital emergency rooms and 
ambulance emergency kits. It reverses both heroin and opioid overdoses within minutes of its 
administration and can save a life if given in time.
4
 Research shows that when naloxone and 
overdose education are available to community members, overdose deaths decrease in those 
communities.
5
  
 
On March 29, 2023, the U.S. Food and Drug Administration approved Narcan, a four-milligram 
Naloxone hydrochloride nasal spray, for over-the-counter, nonprescription use, ensuring that the 
life-saving medication is widely available without the requirement of obtaining a prescription.
6
 
 
Victoria’s Voice Foundation  
Victoria's Voice Foundation was established in 2019 by Jackie and David Siegel after losing 
their 18-year-old daughter, Victoria, to an accidental drug overdose. Victoria's Voice is dedicated 
to providing drug prevention education and naloxone awareness, support, and resources to those 
affected by substance use.
7
  
 
The U.S. Senate passed a joint resolution on June 6, 2023, recognizing June 6, 2023, as 
Naloxone Awareness Day.
8
 The resolution promotes awareness of the life-saving drug, 
Naloxone, which reverses opioid overdoses and prevents deaths. It also aims to educate members 
of the public about the importance of recognizing the signs of overdose and equipping 
themselves with the life-saving antidote.
9
 
III. Effect of Proposed Changes: 
The bill contains 15 whereas clauses that detail the negative effects of the opioid epidemic in the 
United States.  
 
Section 1 provides that this act may be cited as “Victoria’s Law.”  
                                                
3
 National Institute on Drug Abuse, Naloxone Drug Facts (Jan. 2022), https://nida.nih.gov/publications/drugfacts/naloxone 
(last visited Dec 6. 29, 2023).  
4
 John Strang et al., Take-Home Naloxone for the Emergency Interim Management of Opioid Overdose: The Public Health 
Application of an Emergency Medicine, 79(13) Drugs 1395-1418 (2019), available at 
https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC6728289/ (last visited Dec. 6, 2023)   
5
 Id. 
6
 The Food and Drug Administration, FDA Approves First Over-the-Counter Naloxone Nasal Spray (March 29, 2023),  
https://www.fda.gov/news-events/press-announcements/fda-approves-first-over-counter-naloxone-nasal-spray (last visited 
Dec. 6, 2023). 
7
 Victoria’s Voice Foundation ,Victoria's Voice Foundation Launches First Ever National Naloxone Awareness Day on June 
6 with Support from a Bipartisan Congressional Resolution, (Jun. 6, 2023), https://www.prnewswire.com/news-
releases/victorias-voice-foundation-launches-first-ever-national-naloxone-awareness-day-on-june-6-with-support-from-a-
bipartisan-congressional-resolution-301843527.html (last visited Dec. 6, 2023).  
8
 S. Res. 250, 118
th
 Cong. (2023). 
9
 Ed Markey, Markey, Scott Lead Bipartisan, Bicameral Resolution Designating June 6th Naloxone Awareness Day (June 6, 
2023), https://www.markey.senate.gov/news/press-releases/markey-scott-scott-lead-bipartisan-bicameral-resolution-
designating-june-6th-naloxone-awareness-day (last visited Dec. 6, 2023).   BILL: SB 66   	Page 3 
 
 
Section 2 creates s. 683.3342, F.S., to designate June 6 of each year as “Naloxone Awareness 
Day.” The section authorizes the Governor to issue an annual proclamation designating June 6 as 
“Naloxone Awareness Day.” The section also encourages the DOH to hold events to raise 
awareness of the dangers of opioid overdose and the available and safe use of Naloxone as an 
effective way to rapidly reverse the effects of opioid overdose.  
 
Section 3 provides that the bill take effect upon becoming a law. 
IV. Constitutional Issues: 
A. Municipality/County Mandates Restrictions: 
Not applicable. The mandate restrictions do not apply because the bill does not require 
counties and municipalities to spend funds, reduce counties’ or municipalities’ ability to 
raise revenue, or reduce the percentage of state tax shared with counties and 
municipalities. 
B. Public Records/Open Meetings Issues: 
None. 
C. Trust Funds Restrictions: 
None. 
D. State Tax or Fee Increases: 
None. 
E. Other Constitutional Issues: 
None identified. 
V. Fiscal Impact Statement: 
A. Tax/Fee Issues: 
None. 
B. Private Sector Impact: 
None. 
C. Government Sector Impact: 
The bill is not expected to impact state or local government revenues and expenditures. 
  BILL: SB 66   	Page 4 
 
VI. Technical Deficiencies: 
None. 
VII. Related Issues: 
None. 
VIII. Statutes Affected: 
This bill creates section 683.3342 of the Florida Statutes. 
IX. Additional Information: 
A. Committee Substitute – Statement of Changes: 
(Summarizing differences between the Committee Substitute and the prior version of the bill.) 
None. 
B. Amendments: 
None. 
This Senate Bill Analysis does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill’s introducer or the Florida Senate.