The Florida Senate BILL ANALYSIS AND FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT (This document is based on the provisions contained in the legislation as of the latest date listed below.) Prepared By: The Professional Staff of the Committee on Fiscal Policy BILL: CS/CS/SB 208 INTRODUCER: Fiscal Policy Committee; Criminal Justice Committee; and Senators Burgess and Perry SUBJECT: Alzheimer’s Disease and Related Dementia Training for Law Enforcement Officers DATE: February 16, 2024 ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR REFERENCE ACTION 1. Wyant Stokes CJ Fav/CS 2. Kolich Harkness ACJ Favorable 3. Wyant Yeatman FP Fav/CS Please see Section IX. for Additional Information: COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE - Substantial Changes I. Summary: CS/CS/SB 208 creates s. 943.17299, F.S., which establishes a continued employment training component related to Alzheimer’s disease and related forms of dementia. The Florida Department of Law Enforcement (FDLE) shall establish an online training in consultation with the Department of Elder Affairs. The training must include, but is not limited to: Instruction on interacting with persons with Alzheimer’s disease or a related form of dementia. Instruction on techniques for recognizing behavioral symptoms and characteristics. Effective communication. Employing the use of alternatives to physical restraints. Identifying signs of abuse, neglect, or exploitation. Completion of the training component may count toward the 40 hours of instruction for continued employment or appointment as a law enforcement officer, correctional officer, or correctional probation officer. This bill may have an insignificant fiscal impact on the FDLE. See Section V. Fiscal Impact Statement. The bill is effective October 1, 2024. REVISED: BILL: CS/CS/SB 208 Page 2 II. Present Situation: Chapter 943, F.S., contains a number of specific requirements relevant to law enforcement officer training including training in subjects such as victims assistance, 1 sexual assault investigation, 2 autism spectrum disorder, 3 and others. Section 943.17296, F.S., requires each certified law enforcement officer to successfully complete training on identifying and investigating elder abuse and neglect as part of the basic recruit training, 4 or continuing education. 5 The training is required to be developed in consultation with the Department of Elder Affairs and the Department of Children and Families and must incorporate instruction on the identification of and appropriate responses for persons suffering from dementia and on identifying and investigating elder abuse and neglect. Elder abuse training must include instruction of and appropriate responses for persons suffering from dementia and on identifying and investigating elder abuse and neglect. 6 An officer who fails to comply with the elder abuse and neglect training requirements must become an inactive officer. The officer’s certification is reactivated when the officer’s employing agency provides Criminal Justice Standards and Training Commission (CJSTC) staff with verification that the officer has met the continuing education or training requirement. Full time, part time, or auxiliary officers must successfully complete 40 hours of continuing education or training every four years. III. Effect of Proposed Changes: The bill creates s. 943.17299, F.S., which establishes a continued employment training component related to Alzheimer’s disease and related forms of dementia. The FDLE shall establish an online training in consultation with the Department of Elder Affairs. The training must include, but is not limited to: Instruction on interacting with persons with Alzheimer’s disease or a related form of dementia. Instruction on techniques for recognizing behavioral symptoms and characteristics. 1 Section 943.172, F.S., requires every basic skills course required in order for law enforcement officers, probation officers, and other appropriate correctional staff to obtain initial certification to include a minimum of 4 hours of training in victims’ assistance and rights. 2 Section 943.1724, F.S., requires each basic skills course required for a law enforcement office to obtain initial certification must incorporate culturally responsive, trauma-informed training on interviewing sexual assault victims and investigation of incidents of sexual assault. 3 Section 943.1727, F.S., requires 40 hours of instruction for continued employment or appointment as a law enforcement officer on training related to autism spectrum disorder, including but not limited to, instruction on the recognition of the symptoms and characteristics of an individual on the autism disorder spectrum and appropriate responses to a person exhibiting such symptoms and characteristics. 4 Section 943.13(9), F.S., requires any person employed or appointed as a full-time, part-time, or auxiliary law enforcement officer or correctional officer or auxiliary correctional probation officer to complete a commission-approved basic recruit training program. 5 Section 943.135(1), F.S., requires all officers, as a condition of continued employment, to receive periodic commission- approved continuing training or education. Such continuing training or education is required at the rate of 40 hours every 4 years. 6 Rule 11B-27.00212 (15) (b), F.A.C. BILL: CS/CS/SB 208 Page 3 Effective communication. Employing the use of alternatives to physical restraints. Identifying signs of abuse, neglect, or exploitation. Completion of the training component may count toward the 40 hours of instruction for continued employment or appointment as a law enforcement officer, correctional officer, or correctional probation officer. The bill takes effect on October 1, 2024. IV. Constitutional Issues: A. Municipality/County Mandates Restrictions: None. B. Public Records/Open Meetings Issues: None. C. Trust Funds Restrictions: None. D. State Tax or Fee Increases: None. E. Other Constitutional Issues: None identified. V. Fiscal Impact Statement: A. Tax/Fee Issues: None. B. Private Sector Impact: None. C. Government Sector Impact: The bill requires FDLE to establish an online training component relating to Alzheimer’s disease and related forms of dementia. According to FDLE, development of the training BILL: CS/CS/SB 208 Page 4 curricula will cost approximately $11,000. 7 This cost can be absorbed within current resources. VI. Technical Deficiencies: None. VII. Related Issues: None. VIII. Statutes Affected: This bill creates section 934.17299 of the Florida Statutes. IX. Additional Information: A. Committee Substitute – Statement of Substantial Changes: (Summarizing differences between the Committee Substitute and the prior version of the bill.) CS/CS by Fiscal Policy on February 15, 2024: The committee substitute: Adds correctional officers and correctional probation officers to the persons who may count the training relating to Alzheimer’s disease and related forms of dementia towards the 40 hours of instruction for continued employment. CS by Criminal Justice on January 23, 2024: The committee substitute: Makes a technical change to correct “Department of Elderly Affairs” to “Department of Elder Affairs.” Provides an effective date of October 1, 2024. B. Amendments: None. This Senate Bill Analysis does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill’s introducer or the Florida Senate. 7 Florida Department of Law Enforcement, 2024 Agency Analysis of SB 208, October 23, 2023 (on file with the Senate committee on Criminal Justice).