Florida 2024 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0436 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 01/23/2024

                    The Florida Senate 
BILL ANALYSIS AND FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT 
(This document is based on the provisions contained in the legislation as of the latest date listed below.) 
Prepared By: The Professional Staff of the Committee on Health Policy  
 
BILL: SB 436 
INTRODUCER:  Senator Grall 
SUBJECT:  Pregnancy and Parenting Resources Website 
DATE: January 22, 2024 
 
 ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR  REFERENCE  	ACTION 
1. Looke Brown HP Favorable 
2.     AHS   
3.     FP  
 
I. Summary: 
SB 436 creates s. 383.0131, F.S., to require the Department of Health (DOH), in consultation 
with the Department of Children and Families (DCF) and the Agency for Health Care 
Administration (AHCA), maintain a website, distinct from its own website, to provide 
information and links for public and private resources for expectant families and new parents. 
The DOH must contract for the creation of the website and it must be operational by January 1, 
2025. The bill specifies categories of resources that must be available on the website but does not 
limit the website to those categories. Additionally, the bill requires the DCF and the AHCA to 
include clear and conspicuous links to the website on their websites. 
 
The bill provides an effective date of July 1, 2024. 
II. Present Situation: 
DOH Pregnancy Support and New Parent Support Web Resources 
Currently, the DOH provides separate websites for pregnancy and new parent resources. The 
DOH’s pregnancy website
1
 includes numerous links to resources for pregnant women. These 
include information on what to do after pregnancy, available community resources, still-birth 
prevention, emergency preparedness, birth defects, the effect of various conditions and illness on 
pregnancy, tobacco use, and the Healthy Start program, among others. The parenting support 
webpage
2
 has similar links to multiple resources for new parents including information on 
newborn screening, immunizations, and other programs such as Early Steps, Healthy Start, 
Florida Prepaid, and Bright Expectations. 
 
                                                
1
 Available at https://www.floridahealth.gov/programs-and-services/womens-health/pregnancy/index.html, (last visited Jan. 
19, 2024). 
2
 Available at https://www.floridahealth.gov/programs-and-services/vital-statistics/index.html. (Last visited Jan. 19, 2024). 
REVISED:  01/23/24   BILL: SB 436   	Page 2 
 
Online Portals 
State agencies in Florida operate statutorily mandated online portals on various topics. For 
example: 
 The Department of Education is mandated in s. 1001.10, F.S., to develop an online portal for 
parents to choose the best education options for their students. The statute requires that the 
portal must: 
o Recommend educational options based on questions about the student, including the 
needs and interests of the student. 
o Advise parents on the recommended educational options for their student. 
o Enable schools to develop a school profile and connect directly with families who 
express interest in the school. 
o Allow parents to complete the school enrollment process. 
 The DCF is required by s. 409.1464, F.S., to operate a website as part of the Responsible 
Fatherhood Initiative that will allow a father to obtain information about effective parenting, 
identify areas in which support would enable him to enhance his ability to be an effective 
father, and be connected to such support, including, but not limited to, support provided by 
organizations receiving specified grants. 
 The AHCA is required by s. 408.05, F.S., to contract with a vendor to provide a consumer-
friendly, Internet-based platform that allows a consumer to research the cost of health care 
services and procedures and allows for price comparison. The AHCA is required to actively 
oversee the platform and the platform must allow a consumer to search by condition or 
service bundles that are comprehensible to a layperson and may not require registration, a 
security password, or user identification. The vendor is also required to establish and 
maintain a Florida-specific data set of health care claims information available to the public 
and any interested party. 
III. Effect of Proposed Changes: 
SB 436 creates s. 383.0131, F.S., to establish a pregnancy and parenting resources website. The 
bill requires the DOH to contract for the creation of the website which is required to be a stand-
alone website that must be operational by January 1, 2025. The DOH, in consultation with the 
DCF and the AHCA, is required to maintain the website, and each of these agencies must post a 
clear and conspicuous link to the website on their respective webpages. The website must have 
information and links to public and private resources for expectant families which include, but 
are not limited to: 
 Educational materials on pregnancy and parenting; 
 Maternal health services; 
 Prenatal and postnatal services; 
 Educational and mentorship programs for fathers; 
 Social services; 
 Financial assistance; and 
 Adoption services. 
 
The bill provides an effective date of July 1, 2024.  BILL: SB 436   	Page 3 
 
IV. Constitutional Issues: 
A. Municipality/County Mandates Restrictions: 
None. 
B. Public Records/Open Meetings Issues: 
None. 
C. Trust Funds Restrictions: 
None. 
D. State Tax or Fee Increases: 
None. 
E. Other Constitutional Issues: 
None. 
V. Fiscal Impact Statement: 
A. Tax/Fee Issues: 
None. 
B. Private Sector Impact: 
None. 
C. Government Sector Impact: 
SB 436 is estimated to have a negative fiscal impact on the DOH. The department 
estimates a cost of $466,200 to implement the bill, of which $97,600 would be recurring.
3
 
VI. Technical Deficiencies: 
None. 
VII. Related Issues: 
None. 
                                                
3
 Department of Health, 2024 Agency Legislative Bill Analysis: SB 436, pp. 3-4, Nov. 17, 2023 (on file with the Senate 
Committee on Health Policy).  BILL: SB 436   	Page 4 
 
VIII. Statutes Affected: 
This bill creates section 383.0131 of the Florida Statutes. 
IX. Additional Information: 
A. Committee Substitute – Statement of Changes: 
(Summarizing differences between the Committee Substitute and the prior version of the bill.) 
None. 
B. Amendments: 
None. 
This Senate Bill Analysis does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill’s introducer or the Florida Senate.