Florida 2024 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0436 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 02/07/2024

                    The Florida Senate 
BILL ANALYSIS AND FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT 
(This document is based on the provisions contained in the legislation as of the latest date listed below.) 
Prepared By: The Professional Staff of the Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services  
 
BILL: SB 436 
INTRODUCER:  Senator Grall 
SUBJECT:  Pregnancy and Parenting Resources Website 
DATE: February 7, 2024 
 
 ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR  REFERENCE  	ACTION 
1. Looke Brown HP Favorable 
2. Gerbrandt McKnight AHS  Pre-meeting 
3.     FP  
 
I. Summary: 
SB 436 creates s. 383.0131, F.S., to require the Department of Health (DOH), in consultation 
with the Department of Children and Families (DCF) and the Agency for Health Care 
Administration (AHCA), to maintain a website, distinct from its own website, to provide 
information and links for public and private resources for expectant families and new parents. 
The DOH must contract for the creation of the website and it must be operational by January 1, 
2025. The bill specifies categories of resources that must be available on the website but does not 
limit the website to those categories. Additionally, the bill requires the DCF and the AHCA to 
include clear and conspicuous links to the website on their websites. 
 
The bill has a significant, negative fiscal impact on state expenditures. See Section V., Fiscal 
Impact Statement.  
 
The bill takes effect July 1, 2024. 
II. Present Situation: 
DOH Pregnancy Support and New Parent Support Web Resources 
Currently, the Department of Health (DOH) provides separate websites for pregnancy and new 
parent resources. The DOH’s pregnancy website
1
 includes numerous links to resources for 
pregnant women. These include information on what to do after pregnancy, available community 
resources, still-birth prevention, emergency preparedness, birth defects, the effect of various 
conditions and illness on pregnancy, tobacco use, and the Healthy Start program, among others. 
                                                
1
 The Florida Department of Health, Pregnancy, available at https://www.floridahealth.gov/programs-and-services/womens-
health/pregnancy/index.html, (last visited Jan. 19, 2024). 
REVISED:   BILL: SB 436   	Page 2 
 
The parenting support webpage
2
 has similar links to multiple resources for new parents including 
information on newborn screening, immunizations, and other programs such as Early Steps, 
Healthy Start, Florida Prepaid, and Bright Expectations. 
 
Online Portals 
State agencies in Florida operate statutorily mandated online portals on various topics. For 
example: 
 The Department of Education is required in s. 1001.10, F.S., to develop an online portal for 
parents to choose the best education options for their students. The statute requires that the 
portal must: 
o Recommend educational options based on questions about the student, including the 
needs and interests of the student. 
o Advise parents on the recommended educational options for their student. 
o Enable schools to develop a school profile and connect directly with families who 
express interest in the school. 
o Allow parents to complete the school enrollment process. 
 The Department of Children and Families is required by s. 409.1464, F.S., to operate a 
website as part of the Responsible Fatherhood Initiative that will allow a father to obtain 
information about effective parenting, identify areas in which support would enable him to 
enhance his ability to be an effective father, and be connected to such support, including, but 
not limited to, support provided by organizations receiving specified grants. 
 The Agency for Health Care Administration is required by s. 408.05, F.S., to contract with a 
vendor to provide a consumer-friendly, Internet-based platform that allows a consumer to 
research the cost of health care services and procedures and allows for price comparison. The 
AHCA is required to actively oversee the platform and the platform must allow a consumer 
to search by condition or service bundles that are comprehensible to a layperson and may not 
require registration, a security password, or user identification. The vendor is also required to 
establish and maintain a Florida-specific data set of health care claims information available 
to the public and any interested party. 
III. Effect of Proposed Changes: 
The bill creates s. 383.0131, F.S., to establish a pregnancy and parenting resources website. The 
bill requires the Department of Health (DOH) to contract for the creation of the website which is 
required to be a stand-alone website that must be operational by January 1, 2025. The DOH, in 
consultation with the Department of Children and Families and the Agency for Health Care 
Administration, is required to maintain the website, and each of these agencies must post a clear 
and conspicuous link to the website on their respective webpages. The website must have 
information and links to public and private resources for expectant families which include, but 
are not limited to: 
 Educational materials on pregnancy and parenting; 
 Maternal health services; 
 Prenatal and postnatal services; 
                                                
2
 The Florida Department of Health, New Parents, available at https://www.floridahealth.gov/programs-and-services/vital-
statistics/index.html. (last visited Jan. 19, 2024).  BILL: SB 436   	Page 3 
 
 Educational and mentorship programs for fathers; 
 Social services; 
 Financial assistance; and 
 Adoption services. 
 
The bill takes effect July 1, 2024. 
IV. Constitutional Issues: 
A. Municipality/County Mandates Restrictions: 
None. 
B. Public Records/Open Meetings Issues: 
None. 
C. Trust Funds Restrictions: 
None. 
D. State Tax or Fee Increases: 
None. 
E. Other Constitutional Issues: 
None. 
V. Fiscal Impact Statement: 
A. Tax/Fee Issues: 
None. 
B. Private Sector Impact: 
None. 
C. Government Sector Impact: 
The bill has a significant, negative fiscal impact on the Department of Health (DOH). The 
DOH estimates a cost of $466,200 to implement the bill, of which $97,600 is recurring 
and $368,600 is nonrecurring.
3
 
                                                
3
 Department of Health, 2024 Agency Legislative Bill Analysis: SB 436, pp. 3-4, Nov. 17, 2023 (on file with the Senate 
Committee on Health Policy).  BILL: SB 436   	Page 4 
 
VI. Technical Deficiencies: 
None. 
VII. Related Issues: 
None. 
VIII. Statutes Affected: 
This bill creates section 383.0131 of the Florida Statutes. 
IX. Additional Information: 
A. Committee Substitute – Statement of Changes: 
(Summarizing differences between the Committee Substitute and the prior version of the bill.) 
None. 
B. Amendments: 
None. 
This Senate Bill Analysis does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill’s introducer or the Florida Senate.