Florida 2024 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0742 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 01/24/2024

                    The Florida Senate 
BILL ANALYSIS AND FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT 
(This document is based on the provisions contained in the legislation as of the latest date listed below.) 
Prepared By: The Professional Staff of the Committee on Community Affairs  
 
BILL: CS/SB 742 
INTRODUCER:  Community Affairs and Senator Grall 
SUBJECT:  Public Works Projects 
DATE: January 24, 2024 
 
 ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR  REFERENCE  	ACTION 
1. Hunter Ryon CA Fav/CS 
2.     GO  
3.     RC  
 
Please see Section IX. for Additional Information: 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE - Substantial Changes 
 
I. Summary: 
CS/SB 742 revises the circumstances under which certain governmental actions are prohibited 
for the procurement of a “public works project.”  
 
A “public works project” consists of the construction, maintenance, repair, renovation, 
remodeling, or improvement of certain infrastructure projects owned in whole or in part by any 
political subdivision. 
   
Current law prohibits the state or any political subdivision from imposing certain requirements 
on contractors for public works projects paid for with any state-appropriated funds. The bill 
expands this provision to also include public works projects paid for with any local funds.  
 
The bill does, however, maintain the ability for municipalities and counties to preclude certain 
contractors from bidding on a public works project based on the geographic location of the 
contractor’s headquarters or offices, if the project is paid solely with local funds. 
 
The bill also specifies that the term “public works project” does not include the provision of 
goods, services, or work incidental to the public works project in certain instances. 
 
The bill takes effect July 1, 2024. 
REVISED:   BILL: CS/SB 742   	Page 2 
 
II. Present Situation: 
Public Works Projects 
A public works project is an activity that is paid for with any state-appropriated funds and that 
consists of the construction, maintenance, repair, renovation, remodeling, or improvement of a 
building, road, street, sewer, storm drain, water system, site development, irrigation system, 
reclamation project, gas or electrical distribution system, gas or electrical substation, or other 
facility, project, or portion thereof owned in whole or in part by any political subdivision.
1
 
 
Prohibited Governmental Actions Related to Public Works Projects 
Except as required by federal or state law, the state or any political subdivision
2
 that contracts for 
a public works project paid for with any state-appropriated funds may not: 
 Prevent a certified, licensed, or registered contractor, subcontractor, or material supplier or 
carrier, from participating in the bidding process based on the geographic location of the 
company headquarters or offices of the contractor, subcontractor, or material supplier or 
carrier submitting a bid on a public works project or the residences of employees of such 
contractor, subcontractor, or material supplier or carrier; 
 Require a contractor, subcontractor, or material supplier or carrier engaged in the project to: 
o Pay employees a predetermined amount of wages or prescribe any wage rate; 
o Provide employees a specified type, amount, or rate of employee benefits;  
o Control, limit, or expand staffing; or 
o Recruit, train, or hire employees from a designated, restricted, or single source. 
 Prohibit any contractor, subcontractor, or material supplier or carrier from submitting a bid 
on the project if such individual is able to perform the work described and is qualified, 
licensed, or certified as required by state law.
 3
 
 
The foregoing governmental actions are prohibited only for public works projects paid for with 
any amount of state-appropriated funds. These restrictions do not apply to locally-funded public 
works projects.  
 
Prior to July 1, 2023, the state or a political subdivision could impose the otherwise prohibited 
requirements on contractors for state-funded public works projects, up to $1 million. However, in 
2023, the Legislature removed the $1 million cap and prohibited such actions for public works 
projects using any amount of state appropriated funds.
4
  
                                                
1
 Section 255.0992(1)(b) 
2
 “Political subdivision” means a separate agency or unit of local government created or established by law or ordinance and 
the officers thereof. The term includes, but is not limited to, a county; a city, town, or other municipality; or a department, 
commission, authority, school district, taxing district, water management district, board, public corporation, institution of 
higher education, or other public agency or body thereof authorized to expend public funds for construction, maintenance, 
repair, or improvement of public works. See s. 255.0992(1)(a), F.S. 
3
 Section 255.0992, F.S. 
4
 Ch. 2023-134, Laws of Fla.  BILL: CS/SB 742   	Page 3 
 
III. Effect of Proposed Changes: 
The bill amends s. 255.0992, F.S., to revise the definition of “public works project” to include all 
projects paid for with local or state funds, rather than just projects that include state funding. 
This change prevents the state or political subdivision from imposing the prohibited 
governmental actions for public works projects paid for with any amount of local funds.  
 
The bill does, however, maintains the ability for municipalities and counties to preclude certain 
contractors from bidding on a public works project based on the geographic location of the 
contractor’s headquarters or offices, for such public works projects paid solely with local funds. 
 
The bill also specifies that the term “public works project” does not include the provision of 
goods, services, or work incidental to the public works project, such as the provision of security 
services, janitorial services, landscaping services, maintenance services, transportation services, 
or other services that do not require a construction contracting license or involve supplying or 
carrying construction materials for a public works project. 
 
The bill takes effect July 1, 2024. 
IV. Constitutional Issues: 
A. Municipality/County Mandates Restrictions: 
None. 
B. Public Records/Open Meetings Issues: 
None. 
C. Trust Funds Restrictions: 
None. 
D. State Tax or Fee Increases: 
None. 
E. Other Constitutional Issues: 
None. 
V. Fiscal Impact Statement: 
A. Tax/Fee Issues: 
None.  BILL: CS/SB 742   	Page 4 
 
B. Private Sector Impact: 
The prohibition on certain predetermined wage, benefits, and staffing requirements may 
result in a positive fiscal impact for contractors. 
C. Government Sector Impact: 
The change to the definition of “public works project” may lower costs for local public 
construction projects by prohibiting certain actions by a local government such as 
imposing predetermined wage and benefit requirements on potential contractors. 
VI. Technical Deficiencies: 
None. 
VII. Related Issues: 
None. 
VIII. Statutes Affected: 
This bill substantially amends section 255.0992 of the Florida Statutes. 
IX. Additional Information: 
A. Committee Substitute – Statement of Substantial Changes: 
(Summarizing differences between the Committee Substitute and the prior version of the bill.) 
CS by Community Affairs on January 22, 2023: 
The committee substitute: 
 Specifies that the term “public works project” does not include the provision of 
goods, services, or work incidental to the public works project in certain instances.  
 Applies the exception allowing local governments to prevent a vendor from bidding 
based on a contractor's geographic location to municipalities and counties only, rather 
than all political subdivisions.  
B. Amendments: 
None. 
This Senate Bill Analysis does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill’s introducer or the Florida Senate.