The Florida Senate BILL ANALYSIS AND FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT (This document is based on the provisions contained in the legislation as of the latest date listed below.) Prepared By: The Professional Staff of the Committee on Fiscal Policy BILL: CS/SB 830 INTRODUCER: Health Policy Committee and Senator Collins SUBJECT: Youth Athletic Activities DATE: February 13, 2024 ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR REFERENCE ACTION 1. Morgan Brown HP Fav/CS 2. Gerbrandt McKnight AHS Favorable 3. Morgan Yeatman FP Pre-meeting Please see Section IX. for Additional Information: COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE - Substantial Changes I. Summary: CS/SB 830 amends the Education Code in s. 1012.55, F.S., to require that an athletic coach in any public school in the state must hold and maintain a certification in cardiopulmonary resuscitation (CPR), first aid, and the use of an automatic external defibrillator (AED). The certification must be consistent with national, evidence-based emergency cardiovascular care guidelines. This bill does not have a fiscal impact on state government. See Section V. Fiscal Impact Statement. The bill provides an effective date of July 1, 2024. II. Present Situation: Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation, First Aid, and Automatic External Defibrillation Many types of injuries and illnesses can occur when participating in organized sports, including sudden cardiac arrest. While rare in young, healthy athletes, it can happen, and preparation via an emergency action plan, as well as required coursework and training, is pivotal in preparing REVISED: BILL: CS/SB 830 Page 2 coaches, parents and other athletics personnel or staff to respond in the most effective way to save lives. 1 Cardiopulmonary resuscitation (CPR) is an emergency lifesaving procedure performed when the heart stops beating. Immediate CPR can double or triple chances of survival after cardiac arrest by keeping the blood flow active until the arrival of trained medical staff. 2 First aid refers to medical attention that is usually administered immediately on-site after the injury occurs. It often consists of a one-time, short-term treatment and requires little technology or training to administer. First aid can include cleaning minor cuts, scrapes, or scratches; treating a minor burn; applying bandages and dressings; the use of non-prescription medicine; draining blisters; removing debris from the eyes; massage; and drinking fluids to relieve heat stress. 3 An automated external defibrillator (AED) is a lightweight, portable device. It delivers an electric shock through the chest to the heart when it detects an abnormal rhythm and changes the rhythm back to normal. 4 AEDs can greatly increase a cardiac arrest victim’s chances of survival. 5 Although formal AED training isn’t required, it’s recommended to increase the confidence level of the user, promoting better outcomes. 6 Student Extracurricular Activities and Athletics Legislation Currently, the Education Code provides that each public school that is a member of the Florida High School Athletic Association (FHSAA) must have an operational AED on school grounds. The AED must be available in a clearly marked and publicized location for each athletic contest, practice, workout, or conditioning session, including those conducted outside of the school year. Public and private partnerships are encouraged to cover the cost associated with the purchase, placement, and training in the use of the AED. 7 Under current law, an FHSAA member school employee or volunteer with current training in CPR and use of an AED must be present at each athletic event during and outside of the school year, including athletic contests, practices, workouts, and conditioning sessions. The training must include completion of a course in CPR or a basic first aid course that includes CPR training, and demonstrated proficiency in the use of an AED. Each employee or volunteer who is reasonably expected to use an AED must complete this training. 8 1 Atlantic Health System, How to Be Better Prepared at a Child’s Sporting Event, available at https://www.atlantichealth.org/about-us/stay-connected/news/content-central/2023/cardiac-arrest-kids-sports.html (last visited Feb. 1, 2024). 2 American Heart Association Emergency Cardiovascular Care, What is CPR?, available at https://cpr.heart.org/en/resources/what-is-cpr (last visited Feb. 1, 2024). 3 Occupational Safety and Health Administration, What is First Aid?, available at https://www.osha.gov/medical-first- aid/recognition (last visited Feb. 1, 2024). 4 American Heart Association, What Is an Automated External Defibrillator?, available at https://www.heart.org/- /media/files/health-topics/answers-by-heart/what-is-an-aed.pdf (last visited Jan. 30, 2024). 5 Supra note 2. 6 Supra note 4. 7 Section 1006.165(1)(a), F.S. 8 Section 1006.165(1)(b), F.S. BILL: CS/SB 830 Page 3 The location of each AED must be registered with a local emergency medical services medical director. Each employee or volunteer required to complete the training must annually be notified in writing of the location of each AED on school grounds. 9 Immunity from civil liability for the use of AEDs by employees and volunteers is covered under the Good Samaritan Act 10 and the Cardiac Arrest Survival Act. 11, 12 III. Effect of Proposed Changes: The bill amends s. 1012.55, F.S., to require that a Florida public school athletic coach must hold and maintain a certification in CPR, first aid, and the use of an AED. The certification must be consistent with national, evidence-based emergency cardiovascular care guidelines. The bill provides an effective date of July 1, 2024. IV. Constitutional Issues: A. Municipality/County Mandates Restrictions: None. B. Public Records/Open Meetings Issues: None. C. Trust Funds Restrictions: None. D. State Tax or Fee Increases: None. E. Other Constitutional Issues: None. V. Fiscal Impact Statement: A. Tax/Fee Issues: None. B. Private Sector Impact: None. 9 Section 1006.165(1)(c), F.S. 10 Section 768.13, F.S. 11 Section 768.1325, F.S. 12 Section 1006.165(d), F.S. BILL: CS/SB 830 Page 4 C. Government Sector Impact: The bill does not have a fiscal impact on state expenditures. There could be an impact to school districts to ensure the staff receive the required training. VI. Technical Deficiencies: None. VII. Related Issues: None. VIII. Statutes Affected: This bill substantially amends section 1012.55 of the Florida Statutes: IX. Additional Information: A. Committee Substitute – Statement of Substantial Changes: (Summarizing differences between the Committee Substitute and the prior version of the bill.) CS by Health Policy on January 30, 2024: The committee substitute removes Section 1 of the underlying bill and retains only the amendment to s. 1012.55, F.S., to update the qualifications of a Florida public school athletic coach to include a certification in CPR, first aid, and the use of an AED. B. Amendments: None. This Senate Bill Analysis does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill’s introducer or the Florida Senate.