Florida 2024 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1158 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 02/13/2024

                    The Florida Senate 
BILL ANALYSIS AND FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT 
(This document is based on the provisions contained in the legislation as of the latest date listed below.) 
Prepared By: The Professional Staff of the Committee on Rules  
 
BILL: SB 1158 
INTRODUCER  Senators Bradley and Trumbull  
SUBJECT:  Lights Displayed on Fire Department Vehicles 
DATE: February 13, 2024 
 
 ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR  REFERENCE  	ACTION 
1. Shutes Vickers TR Favorable 
2. Hackett Ryon CA Favorable 
3. Shutes Twogood RC Pre-meeting 
 
I. Summary: 
SB 1158 allows government-owned fire department vehicles, excluding vehicles of a fire patrol 
or volunteer fire departments, to display blue lights, in addition to red or red and white lights, as 
long as the vehicles meet the following criteria: 
 Have a gross weight of 24,000 pounds or more; 
 Are authorized in writing by the fire chief of the governmental agency; and 
 Show or display the blue lights only on the rear of the government-owned fire department 
vehicle. 
 
The bill may have indeterminate fiscal impact on local governments. 
 
The bill takes effect July 1, 2024. 
II. Present Situation: 
Show or Display of Blue Lights on Florida Vehicles or Equipment 
Under current Florida law, vehicles of a fire department and fire patrol, including vehicles of 
volunteer firefighters, may show or display red or red and white lights.
1
 Florida does not 
currently allow the use of blue lights on fire department vehicles. 
 
Florida law expressly prohibits any vehicle or equipment, except police vehicles, to show or 
display blue lights, with the exception that vehicles owned, operated, or leased by the 
Department of Corrections or any county correctional agency may show or display blue lights 
when responding to emergencies.
2
 
                                                
1
 Section 316.2397(3), F.S. 
2
 Section 316.2397(2), F.S. 
REVISED:   BILL: SB 1158   	Page 2 
 
Additionally, under Florida law, it is generally prohibited for non-government owned vehicles or 
vessels to use any flashing or rotating blue light unless such person is a law enforcement officer 
employed by a federal, state, county, or city law enforcement agency or is appointed by the 
Governor.
3
  
 
Visibility of Red and Blue Lights on Emergency Vehicles  
At least 16 states in the United States allow fire department vehicles to display blue emergency 
warning lights.
4
 Studies have shown that blue
5
 and red emergency lights are rated as the most 
visible colors
6
, with red lights being most visible in the daytime and blue lights being most 
visible at night.
7
 Such studies recommend that emergency vehicles use a combination of red and 
blue lights to maximize visibility under all ambient lighting conditions.
8
 
 
Standard Fire Engine Weight 
A standard fire engine typically weighs within a 20,000 to 40,000-pound range.
9
  
III. Effect of Proposed Changes: 
This bill allows government-owned fire department vehicles, excluding vehicles of a fire patrol 
or volunteer fire departments, to display blue lights, in addition to red or red and white lights, as 
long as the vehicles meet the following criteria: 
 Have a gross weight of 24,000 pounds or more; 
 Are authorized in writing by the fire chief of the governmental agency; and 
 Show or display the blue lights only on the rear of the government-owned fire department 
vehicle. 
 
The bill takes effect July 1, 2024. 
                                                
3
 Section 843.081(2), F.S.  
4
 See Guardian Angel, State Statutes Emergency Vehicle Lights Guide, https://www.guardianangeldevices.com/state-statutes/ 
(last visited January 12, 2024). See also Henry Cesari, Here’s the color of Police and Fire Truck Lights in Every State, 
MotorBiscuit (Oct. 16, 2023), https://www.motorbiscuit.com/heres-the-color-of-police-and-fire-truck-lights-in-every-state/ 
(last visited January 12, 2024). 
5
 Michael J. Flannigan, Daniel F. Blower, and Joel M. Devonshire, Effects of Warning Lamp Color and Intensity on Driver 
Vision, (Oct. 2008), https://www.sae.org/standardsdev/tsb/cooperative/warninglamp0810.pdf, pp. 38-39 (last visited January 
12, 2024). The study was supported by Department of Homeland Security, Federal Emergency Management Agency, United 
States Fire Administration, and the US Department of Justice, Office of Justice Programs. Id. 
6
 Emergency Responder Safety Institute, New Study of Driver Perception of Emergency Warning Lights and Retroreflective 
Markings Commissioned by The Emergency Responder Safety Institute Yields Surprising Findings, (Jan. 2022), 
https://www.respondersafety.com/news/news/2022/01/new-study-of-driver-perception-of-emergency-warning-lights-and-
retroreflective-markings-commissioned-by-the-emergency-responder-safety-institute-yields-surprising-findings/# (last visited 
January 12, 2024).  
7
 Justice Technology Information Center, Law Enforcement Vehicle Lighting and Reflectivity Studies: An Overview, 
https://www.ojp.gov/pdffiles1/nij/nlectc/253106.pdf, p.8 (last visited January 12, 2024). 
8
 Id. 
9
 Simon Burge, How Much Does a Fire Truck Weigh?, International Fire and Safety Journal (Aug. 1, 
2023),https://internationalfireandsafetyjournal.com/how-much-does-a-fire-truck-
weigh/#:~:text=The%20range%20in%20weight%20is,20%2C000%20to%2040%2C000%2Dpound%20range (last visited 
January 12, 2024).   BILL: SB 1158   	Page 3 
 
IV. Constitutional Issues: 
A. Municipality/County Mandates Restrictions: 
None. 
B. Public Records/Open Meetings Issues: 
None. 
C. Trust Funds Restrictions: 
None. 
D. State Tax or Fee Increases: 
None. 
E. Other Constitutional Issues: 
None identified. 
V. Fiscal Impact Statement: 
A. Tax/Fee Issues: 
None. 
B. Private Sector Impact: 
None. 
C. Government Sector Impact: 
The bill may have an indeterminate fiscal impact on fire departments that voluntarily 
elect to retrofit their vehicles to display blue lights on the rear of qualified vehicles. 
VI. Technical Deficiencies: 
None. 
VII. Related Issues: 
None. 
VIII. Statutes Affected: 
This bill substantially amends section 316.2397 of the Florida Statutes.  BILL: SB 1158   	Page 4 
 
IX. Additional Information: 
A. Committee Substitute – Statement of Changes: 
(Summarizing differences between the Committee Substitute and the prior version of the bill.) 
None. 
B. Amendments: 
None. 
This Senate Bill Analysis does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill’s introducer or the Florida Senate.