Florida 2024 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1422 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 02/12/2024

                    The Florida Senate 
BILL ANALYSIS AND FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT 
(This document is based on the provisions contained in the legislation as of the latest date listed below.) 
Prepared By: The Professional Staff of the Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General 
Government  
BILL: SB 1422 
INTRODUCER:  Senators Burgess and Rouson 
SUBJECT:  Food Recovery 
DATE: February 12, 2024 
 
 ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR  REFERENCE  	ACTION 
1. Becker Becker AG Favorable 
2. Blizzard Betta AEG  Pre-meeting 
3.     FP  
 
I. Summary: 
SB 1422 directs the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services (department), subject to 
legislative appropriation, to implement a program to provide incentives to food producers to sell 
high-quality fresh food products to food recovery entities at a discounted price. The bill 
authorizes food recovery entities to negotiate the price for fresh food products and requires the 
department to reimburse them for each negotiated purchase of fresh food products produced, 
purchased, and distributed in this state. 
 
The bill directs the department to submit a report on the program to the Governor, President of 
the Senate, and Speaker of the House of Representatives by January 1, 2025, and to submit an 
updated report by January 1, 2026. The bill grants the department rulemaking authority for the 
program.  
 
The bill appropriates $5,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the department to 
implement the program for the 2024-2025 fiscal year. 
 
This bill takes effect July 1, 2024. 
II. Present Situation: 
Section 595.420, F.S., provides legislative intent and powers of the Department of Agriculture 
and Consumer Services (department) regarding food recovery. The Legislature finds that 
millions of pounds of surplus and slightly blemished fruits and vegetables are destroyed each 
year, while many Floridians go without food.
1
 The Legislature further finds that the state, 
through the Commissioner of Agriculture, should assist food recovery programs, when needed, 
                                                
1
 Section 595.420(1)(a), F.S. 
REVISED:   BILL: SB 1422   	Page 2 
 
to aid in their establishment and to support their continued and efficient operation.
2
 In helping to 
coordinate the establishment of food recovery programs, the department may: identify suppliers, 
volunteers, and nonprofit organizations in the community to ascertain the level of interest in 
establishing a food recovery program; provide facilities and other resources for initial 
organizational meetings; and provide direct and indirect support for the fledgling program, upon 
demonstration of serious interest at the local level.
3
  
 
Approximately one-fifth of Floridians are food insecure, including over one million children. 
The department’s Food Recovery Program works to recover food by working with farmers 
(volunteers visit the farms and collect surplus produce in a process called gleaning) and by 
working with schools (the department provides Florida Schools with guidance on food waste 
audits, share tables, food donations, and composting).
4
 
 
Food distribution programs are funded by the legislature through the Food Recovery Program 
within the department. Partnerships for the 2022-2023 fiscal year include: 
 Feeding Florida’s Farmers Feeding Florida Program, which purchases cosmetically 
blemished produce from local agricultural producers and provides it to households in need 
through Feeding Florida’s member food banks. 
 The Farm Share Program, which provides food free of charge to local community partner 
agencies as well as directly to families, children, senior citizens, and individuals in need to 
address food insecurity throughout the state.
5
 
III. Effect of Proposed Changes: 
SB 1422 creates s. 595.420(8), F.S., and directs the department to implement a program to 
provide incentives to agricultural companies to sell fresh products to food recovery entities. It 
creates definitions for “food producer,” “food recovery entity,” “fresh food products,” and “high-
quality fresh food products.” 
 
Subject to appropriation, the bill directs the department to implement a program to incentivize 
food producers to sell high-quality fresh food products to food recovery entities at a discounted 
price with the goal of reducing human hunger in this state. The bill authorizes food recovery 
entities to negotiate the price for fresh food products and requires the department to reimburse 
them for each negotiated purchase of fresh food products produced, purchased, and distributed in 
this state. To receive a reimbursement, a food entity must: 
 Certify in writing to the department that all of the fresh food products on an invoice meet the 
food recovery entity’s food quality standards and that the fresh food products received will 
not be sold at wholesale, retail, or secondary markets for monetary gain; and 
 Submit the invoice and any other documents provided by the food producer to the 
department. The invoice must include the shipment date; shipment location, by shipper and 
city; total number of packages shipped and the price of each product; total price paid for each 
product; total invoice price paid; and total pounds shipped. 
                                                
2
 Section 595.420(1)(c), F.S. 
3
 Section 595.420(3), F.S. 
4
 Florida Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services Food Recovery Program see https://www.fdacs.gov/Food-
Nutrition/Nutrition-Programs/Food-Recovery-Program (last visited January 17, 2024). 
5
 Id.  BILL: SB 1422   	Page 3 
 
 
The bill requires the department submit a report on the program to the Governor, the President of 
the Senate, and the Speaker of the House of Representatives by January 1, 2025, and to submit 
an updated report by January 1, 2026. The reports must include an itemized list of all of the 
following: 
 Each fresh food product by package size, the total number of packages, and the average price 
paid per package. 
 The total weight in pounds of each fresh food product type, the price paid per pound for each 
fresh food product type, and the total spent per fresh food product type. 
 The total amount spent and the total amount spent per major fresh food product. 
 
The bill appropriates $5,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the department to 
implement the program and grants the department rulemaking authority to implement the bill.  
 
This act shall take effect July 1, 2024. 
IV. Constitutional Issues: 
A. Municipality/County Mandates Restrictions: 
None. 
B. Public Records/Open Meetings Issues: 
None. 
C. Trust Funds Restrictions: 
None. 
D. State Tax or Fee Increases: 
None. 
E. Other Constitutional Issues: 
None. 
V. Fiscal Impact Statement: 
A. Tax/Fee Issues: 
None. 
B. Private Sector Impact: 
Food producers may benefit from having an additional market for their produce and 
Floridians may benefit from the increased availability of fresh produce from food 
recovery entities.  BILL: SB 1422   	Page 4 
 
C. Government Sector Impact: 
The bill appropriates $5,000,000 to the department from the General Revenue Fund for 
the 2024-2025 fiscal year to implement the program.  
VI. Technical Deficiencies: 
None. 
VII. Related Issues: 
None. 
VIII. Statutes Affected: 
This bill substantially amends section 595.420 of the Florida Statutes. 
IX. Additional Information: 
A. Committee Substitute – Statement of Changes: 
(Summarizing differences between the Committee Substitute and the prior version of the bill.) 
None. 
B. Amendments: 
None. 
This Senate Bill Analysis does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill’s introducer or the Florida Senate.