Florida 2024 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1612 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 02/07/2024

                    The Florida Senate 
BILL ANALYSIS AND FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT 
(This document is based on the provisions contained in the legislation as of the latest date listed below.) 
Prepared By: The Professional Staff of the Committee on Health Policy  
 
BILL: CS/SB 1612 
INTRODUCER:  Health Policy Committee and Senator Brodeur 
SUBJECT:  Adult Cardiovascular Care Standards 
DATE: February 7, 2024 
 
 ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR  REFERENCE  	ACTION 
1. Looke Brown HP Fav/CS 
2.     AHS   
3.     RC  
 
Please see Section IX. for Additional Information: 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE - Substantial Changes 
 
I. Summary: 
CS/SB 1612 amends s. 395.1055, F.S., to amend requirements in that section related to the 
Agency for Health Care Administration’s (AHCA) rules governing adult cardiovascular services 
(ACS) to specify that Level I services include rotational or other atherectomy devices, 
electrophysiology, and treatment of chronic total occlusions. 
II. Present Situation: 
Adult Cardiovascular Services 
Section 395.1055(18), F.S., establishes requirements that the AHCA must adopt in rule 
governing the provision of ACS. The section divides ACS into two levels, Level I and Level II, 
with Level I ACS providers authorized to provide adult percutaneous cardiac intervention (PCI) 
without cardiac surgery and with Level II providers being authorized to perform PCI with 
cardiac surgery. 
 
REVISED:   BILL: CS/SB 1612   	Page 2 
 
Percutaneous Coronary Intervention 
Percutaneous coronary intervention (PCI), also commonly known as coronary angioplasty or 
angioplasty, is a nonsurgical technique for treating obstructive coronary artery disease, including 
unstable angina, acute myocardial infarction, and multi-vessel coronary artery disease.
1
 
 
PCI uses a catheter to insert a small structure called a stent to reopen blood vessels in the heart 
that have been narrowed by plaque build-up, a condition known as atherosclerosis. Using a 
special type of X-ray called fluoroscopy, the catheter is threaded through blood vessels into the 
heart where the coronary artery has narrowed. When the tip is in place, a balloon tip covered 
with a stent is inflated. The balloon tip compresses the plaque and expands the stent. Once the 
plaque is compressed and the stent is in place, the balloon is deflated and withdrawn. The stent 
stays in the artery, holding it open.
2
 
 
Rotational Atherectomy 
Rotational atherectomy (RA) is an atheroablative technology that enables percutaneous coronary 
intervention for complex, calcified coronary lesions. RA works on the principle of ‘differential 
cutting’ and preferentially ablates hard, inelastic, calcified plaque. The objective of RA use has 
evolved from plaque debulking to plaque modification to enable balloon angioplasty and optimal 
stent expansion.
3
 
 
Electrophysiological Study 
An electrophysiological study (EP study) is a test used to evaluate the heart's electrical system 
and to check for abnormal heart rhythms. Natural electrical impulses coordinate contractions of 
the different parts of the heart. This helps keep blood flowing the way it should. This movement 
of the heart creates the heartbeat, or heart rhythm. During an EP study, a doctor inserts small, 
thin wire electrodes into a vein in the groin (or neck, in some cases). He or she will then thread 
the wire electrodes through the vein and into the heart. To do this, he or she uses a special type of 
X-ray called fluoroscopy. Once in the heart, the electrodes measures the heart’s electrical signals. 
Electrical signals are also sent through the electrodes to stimulate the heart tissue to try to cause 
the abnormal heart rhythm. This is done so that it can be evaluated and its cause can be found. It 
may also be done to help evaluate how well a medicine is working.
4
 
 
Chronic Total Occlusion 
A Chronic total occlusion (CTO) is a complete or nearly complete blockage of one or more 
coronary arteries. The blockage, typically present for at least three months, is caused by a 
                                                
1
 Medscape: Percutaneous cardiac intervention, available at http://emedicine.medscape.com/article/161446-overview, (last 
visited Feb. 2, 2024). 
2
 Heart and Stroke Foundation, available at https://www.heartandstroke.ca/heart/treatments/surgery-and-other-
procedures/percutaneous-coronary-intervention, (last visited Feb. 2, 2024). 
3
 Gupta T, Weinreich M, Greenberg M, Colombo A, Latib A. Rotational Atherectomy: A Contemporary Appraisal. Interv 
Cardiol. 2019 Nov 18;14(3):182-189. doi: 10.15420/icr.2019.17.R1. PMID: 31867066; PMCID: PMC6918488. 
4
 What is an electrophysiological study? Johns Hopkins Medicine, available at 
https://www.hopkinsmedicine.org/health/treatment-tests-and-therapies/electrophysiological-
studies#:~:text=An%20electrophysiological%20study%20(EP%20study,flowing%20the%20way%20it%20should., (last 
visited Feb. 2, 2024). 
  BILL: CS/SB 1612   	Page 3 
 
buildup of plaque within a coronary artery. When this happens, blood flow to the heart is 
compromised. CTO is a common heart disorder in patients with coronary artery disease. 
Between 20 and 25 percent of patients with coronary artery disease also have a chronically 
blocked artery.
5
 
III. Effect of Proposed Changes: 
CS/SB 1612 amends s. 395.1055, F.S., to specify that Level I ACS includes PCI with rotational 
or other atherectomy devices, electrophysiology, and treatment of chronic total occlusions. 
 
The bill provides an effective date of July 1, 2024. 
IV. Constitutional Issues: 
A. Municipality/County Mandates Restrictions: 
None. 
B. Public Records/Open Meetings Issues: 
None. 
C. Trust Funds Restrictions: 
None. 
D. State Tax or Fee Increases: 
None. 
E. Other Constitutional Issues: 
None. 
V. Fiscal Impact Statement: 
A. Tax/Fee Issues: 
None. 
B. Private Sector Impact: 
None. 
C. Government Sector Impact: 
None. 
                                                
5
 Chronic Total Occlusion (CTO), University of Michigan Health, available at https://www.uofmhealth.org/conditions-
treatments/chronic-total-occlusion-cto, (last visited Feb. 2, 2024).  BILL: CS/SB 1612   	Page 4 
 
VI. Technical Deficiencies: 
None. 
VII. Related Issues: 
None. 
VIII. Statutes Affected: 
This bill substantially amends section 395.1055 of the Florida Statutes.  
IX. Additional Information: 
A. Committee Substitute – Statement of Substantial Changes: 
(Summarizing differences between the Committee Substitute and the prior version of the bill.) 
CS by Health Policy on February 6, 2024: 
The committee substitute eliminates all provisions of the bill other than the provision 
specifying rotational or other atherectomy devices, electrophysiology, and treatment of 
chronic total occlusions to services that may be provided by Level I ACS providers. 
B. Amendments: 
None. 
This Senate Bill Analysis does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill’s introducer or the Florida Senate.