Florida 2025 2025 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1513 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 04/14/2025

                    STORAGE NAME: h1513b.HHS 
DATE: 4/14/2025 
 	1 
 
      
FLORIDA HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
BILL ANALYSIS 
This bill analysis was prepared by nonpartisan committee staff and does not constitute an official statement of legislative intent. 
BILL #: HB 1513 
TITLE: Refund of Overpayments Made by Patients 
SPONSOR(S): Greco 
COMPANION BILL: CS/SB 1808 (Burton) 
LINKED BILLS: None 
RELATED BILLS: None 
Committee References 
 Health Professions & Programs 
15 Y, 0 N 

Health & Human Services 
 
 
SUMMARY 
 
Effect of the Bill: 
HB 1513 requires certain health care practitioners to refund a patient for any overpayment made by the patient 
within 30 days of the practitioner determining that an overpayment was made. The bill expressly states that its 
provisions do not apply to overpayments made to health care practitioners by commercial health insurers and 
health maintenance organizations. 
 
Fiscal or Economic Impact: 
None. 
 
 
  
JUMP TO SUMMARY 	ANALYSIS RELEVANT INFORMATION BILL HISTORY 
 
ANALYSIS 
EFFECT OF THE BILL: 
Patient Refund of Overpayment 
 
Under current law, healthcare practitioners  are not required to notify or return overpayments made by a patient, 
and there is no timeline for returning overpayments to patients. As a result, patients may be unaware of these 
overpayments or of their right to a refund or credit, or may wait months to be repaid.  
 
The bill requires certain health care practitioners to refund a patient for any overpayment made by the patient 
within 30 days of the practitioner determining that an overpayment was made. Specifically, the bill requires the 
following practitioners to refund the overpayment within 30 days: (Section 1) 
 
 Allopathic physicians, physician assistants, anesthesiologist assistants, and medical assistants;
1 
 Osteopathic physicians, physician assistants, and anesthesiologist assistants;
2 
 Chiropractic physicians and physician assistants;
3 
 Podiatric physicians;
4 
 Optometrists
5 
 Autonomous advanced practice registered nurses, advanced practice registered nurses, registered 
nurses, licensed practical nurses, and certified nursing assistants;
6 
 Pharmacists, pharmacy interns, and pharmacy technicians;
7 
                                                            
1 Chapter 458, F.S. 
2 Chapter 459, F.S. 
3 Chapter 460, F.S. 
4 Chapter 461, F.S. 
5 Chapter 463, F.S. 
6 Chapter 464, F.S.  JUMP TO SUMMARY 	ANALYSIS RELEVANT INFORMATION BILL HISTORY 
 	2 
 Dentists, dental hygienists, and dental laboratories;
8 
 Midwives;
9 
 Electrologists;
10 
 Clinical laboratory personnel;
11 
 Medical physicists;
12 
 Genetic counselors;
13 
 Opticians;
14 
 
The bill expressly states that its provisions do not apply to overpayments made to health care practitioners by 
commercial health insurers and health maintenance organizations. (Section 1) 
 
The bill does not contain an express disciplinary provision; however, current law makes any violation of the 
practitioner core licensure act (chapter 456, F. S.), or a practitioner’s individual practice act, subject to disciplinary 
action.
15 
 
The bill becomes effective upon becoming law. (Section 2). 
 
 
RELEVANT INFORMATION 
SUBJECT OVERVIEW: 
 
Patient Overpayment 
 
A patient overpayment occurs when an individual patient pays more for a healthcare service than they are 
obligated to pay, or when they pay for a service for which the provider later receives full or partial reimbursement 
from a third-party payer, such as an insurer. 
 
Self-pay Patients 
 
Self-pay refers to a payment method where patients cover the costs of medical services out of pocket, without 
relying on insurance or third-party payers.
16  
 
The No Surprises Act was enacted to ensure healthcare providers adopt policies that provide the uninsured or self-
pay patients with good faith estimates of healthcare charges, either when care is scheduled or upon the patient’s 
request. Additionally, the Act mandates that providers implement a patient-provider dispute resolution process, 
enabling uninsured and self-pay individuals to challenge charges that significantly exceed the provided estimates.
17 
 
Patient Refund Laws – Other States 
 
Two states, California and Texas, currently require practitioners to refund patients for overpayments.  
 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
7 Chapter 465, F.S. 
8 Chapter 466, F.S. 
9 Chapter 467, F.S. 
10 Chapter 478, F.S. 
11 Part I, ch. 483, F.S. 
12 Part II, ch. 483, F.S. 
13 Part III, ch. 483, F.S. 
14 Part I, ch. 484, F.S. 
15 Because the bill’s provisions are placed within chapter 456, F. S., its requirements are enforceable by the applicable board, or by the 
Department of Health, if there is no board.  
16 Mayo Clinic, Billing and Insurance, available at https://www.mayoclinic.org/billing-insurance/glossary (last visited, April 11, 2025).  
17 CMS, The No Surprises Act’s Good Faith Estimates and Patient-Provider Dispute Resolution Requirements, available at 
https://www.cms.gov/files/document/gfe-and-ppdr-requirements-slides.pdf (last visited, April 11, 2025).   JUMP TO SUMMARY 	ANALYSIS RELEVANT INFORMATION BILL HISTORY 
 	3 
California requires physicians, surgeons and dentists to refund patients for duplicate payments made by the 
patient for services if such payments are also reimbursed by a third-party company. The refund must be issued 
within 30 days of a patient’s request if the duplicate payment has been received, or within 30 days of receiving the 
duplicate payment if it has not been received.
18 Physician, surgeons, and dentists are required to notify a patient of 
a duplicate payment within 90 days, and the duplicate payment must be refunded within 30 days, unless the 
patient requests a credit balance.
19 
 
Texas requires physicians, hospitals and health care practitioners to issue refunds for any overpayments received 
from patients. The practitioner or hospital must process the refund within 30 days of becoming aware that an 
overpayment has occurred.
20 
 
Health Care Practitioner Regulation  
 
Health care practitioners are regulated by the Department of Health (DOH) under ch. 456, F.S., and individual 
practice acts for each profession. The boards act as the governing body of a specified profession; they establish 
practice standards by rule, pursuant to statutory authority and directives, and determine disciplinary action 
against practitioners who have violated the practice standards.
21 
 
Section 456.072, F.S., outlines acts which constitute grounds for disciplinary action against a Florida licensed 
health care practitioner. While these predominately relate to specific acts the statute does provide that a 
practitioner who violates any provision of chapter 456, the applicable practice act, or any rules adopted pursuant 
thereto is subject to a disciplinary action. 
 
Additionally, each health care practitioner’s respective practice act contains specific statutory provisions on 
prohibited acts, disciplinary actions, grounds for discipline, and actions by the applicable board. 
 
 
 
 
BILL HISTORY 
COMMITTEE REFERENCE ACTION DATE 
STAFF 
DIRECTOR/ 
POLICY CHIEF 
ANALYSIS 
PREPARED BY 
Health Professions & Programs 
Subcommittee 
15 Y, 0 N 4/3/2025 McElroy Aderibigbe 
Health & Human Services 
Committee 
 4/14/2025 Calamas Aderibigbe 
 
 
 
 
 
 
  
                                                            
18 California Public Law, CA Business and Professions Code Section 732, available at 
https://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/codes_displaySection.xhtml?lawCode=BPC&sectionNum=732 (last viewed March 21, 2025).  
19 Id. 
20 Texas Public Law, Refund of Overpayment, available at https://texas.public.law/statutes/tex._ins._code_section_1661.005 (last viewed 
March 21, 2025).  
21 S. 456.072(1)(dd), F.S.