Florida 2025 2025 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0806 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 03/11/2025

                    The Florida Senate 
BILL ANALYSIS AND FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT 
(This document is based on the provisions contained in the legislation as of the latest date listed below.) 
Prepared By: The Professional Staff of the Committee on Judiciary  
 
BILL: SB 806 
INTRODUCER:  Senator Yarborough 
SUBJECT:  Florida Trust Code 
DATE: March 11, 2025 
 
 ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR  REFERENCE  	ACTION 
1. Bond Cibula JU Pre-meeting 
2.     ACJ   
3.     RC  
 
I. Summary: 
SB 806 provides that only the Attorney General has standing to enforce the terms of a charitable 
trust having its principal place of administration in this state. The term “standing” means the 
legal right to pursue a particular civil action. This would have the effect of setting aside the 
common law special interest rule that gives a person having a “special interest” in a charitable 
trust standing to file an action to enforce the terms of the charitable trust. This will also have the 
effect of setting aside the historical standing afforded to the settlor of a charitable trust and that 
of a specific named charitable beneficiary.  
 
The bill is effective upon becoming law. 
II. Present Situation: 
Trust Law – In General 
A trust is an entity established by a settlor to hold, invest, and distribute moneys on behalf of one 
or more beneficiaries, in compliance with the terms of the trust as established by the settlor. 
Where the beneficiary of the trust is for a general charitable purpose, the trust is known as a 
“charitable trust.” An individual or entity managing the trust is known as a trustee. 
 
In a private trust arrangement, only the settlor, or any of the individual named beneficiaries, has 
legal standing (i.e., the right to) file an action in the probate court to enforce the terms of the 
trust. As to a charitable trust, the settlor, a named charitable organization beneficiary, and the 
Attorney General may enforce a charitable trust.
1
 The reason that general beneficiaries may not 
sue to enforce a charitable trust is that, “unlike a private trust, where there are identifiable 
 
1
 Sections 736.0110 and 736.0405, F.S.; State of Del. ex rel. Gebelein v. Fla. First Nat. Bank of Jacksonville, 381 So. 2d 
1075, 1077 (Fla. 1st DCA 1979). 
REVISED:   BILL: SB 806   	Page 2 
 
beneficiaries who are the equitable owners of the trust property, the beneficiaries of a charitable 
trust are the public at large.”
2
 
 
Florida courts recognize an exception to rule of standing whereby a person alleging a special 
interest, an interest beyond the general interest possessed by the public at large, may have 
standing to enforce the terms of a charitable trust.
3
 The reason for requiring a special interest is: 
“If it were otherwise there would be no end to potential litigation against a given [trust], whether 
he be a public official or otherwise, brought by individuals or residents, all possessed by the 
same general interest . . . .”
4
 “Trustees have been permitted to bring suit against co-trustees, and 
persons or organizations having a special interest in a trust or a special status under a trust 
instrument are considered to have standing to enforce the trust.”
5
 
 
The common law “special interest” exception to the general rule of standing to file an action to 
enforce a trust provision in a charitable trust has not been codified in the Trust Code, although it 
is alluded to in s. 736.0405(3), F.S. In a 2024 case, a district court of appeal noted that the 
special interest rule had not been changed by statute, and stated that the Legislature could change 
or eliminate that common law rule by amending the Trust Code.
6
 
 
The Attorney General 
The Attorney General is a statewide elected official whose office is created by the state 
constitution.
7
 The Attorney General is the chief state's legal officer. 
III. Effect of Proposed Changes: 
The bill amends s. 736.0110, F.S., to effectively set aside the common law special interest rule 
regarding standing to enforce the terms of a charitable trust. The bill provides that the Attorney 
General has the exclusive standing to assert the rights of a qualified beneficiary related to a 
charitable trust. Only the Attorney General may pursue an action for contract and trust law 
claims relating to a charitable distribution or the exercise of the powers of a trustee. The bill 
specifies that neither the Attorney General of another state, nor any other state official of another 
state, may assert the rights of a qualified beneficiary as to a Florida trust.  
 
The bill amends s. 736.0106, F.S., to conform. The bill also amends s. 736.0405, F.S., to reiterate 
that the Attorney General of any other state, or any other public official of another state, may not 
seek enforcement of the terms of a charitable trust as to a Florida trust. 
 
The bill is effective upon becoming law. 
 
2
 Id. 
3
 See United States Steel Corp. v. Save Sand Key, 303 So.2d 9 (Fla. 1974). 
4
 Askew v. Hold the Bulkhead-Save our Bays, 269 So.2d 696 (Fla. 2d DCA 1972). 
5
 Milton v. Milligan, No. 4:12CV384-RH/CAS, 2013 WL 828607, at *4 (N.D. Fla. Mar. 5, 2013). 
6
 Jennings v. Durden, No. 5D2023-0064, 2024 WL 2788198, at *6 (Fla. 5th DCA May 31, 2024), review denied sub nom. 
Uthmeier v. Jennings, No. SC2024-1372, 2025 WL 561329 (Fla. Feb. 20, 2025). In this case, the State of Delaware claims a 
special interest in enforcing the terms of a trust that includes the condition “first consideration, in each instance, being given 
to beneficiaries who are residents of Delaware.” 
7
 Article IV, s. 4(b), STATE CONST.  BILL: SB 806   	Page 3 
 
IV. Constitutional Issues: 
A. Municipality/County Mandates Restrictions: 
None. 
B. Public Records/Open Meetings Issues: 
None. 
C. Trust Funds Restrictions: 
None. 
D. State Tax or Fee Increases: 
None. 
E. Other Constitutional Issues: 
None. 
V. Fiscal Impact Statement: 
A. Tax/Fee Issues: 
None. 
B. Private Sector Impact: 
The bill appears to end the claims being asserted by the State of Delaware regarding the 
trust created by the will of Alfred I. duPont which created the Nemours Foundation. The 
Nemours Foundation operates children’s hospitals and health care facilities in multiple 
states. 
C. Government Sector Impact: 
None. 
VI. Technical Deficiencies: 
The change to s. 736.0110(3), F.S., by the bill gives that Attorney General exclusive standing to 
assert the rights of a qualified beneficiary of a charitable trust. However, that change appears 
inconsistent with existing s. 736.0110(1), F.S., which recognizes that charitable organizations 
may also have the rights of a qualified beneficiary. Accordingly, the Legislature may wish to 
amend the bill reconcile the conflicting provisions.  
VII. Related Issues: 
None.  BILL: SB 806   	Page 4 
 
VIII. Statutes Affected: 
This bill substantially amends the following sections of the Florida Statutes: 736.0110, 736.0106, 
and 736.0405. 
This bill reenacts part of section 738.303 of the Florida Statutes. 
IX. Additional Information: 
A. Committee Substitute – Statement of Changes: 
(Summarizing differences between the Committee Substitute and the prior version of the bill.) 
None. 
B. Amendments: 
None. 
This Senate Bill Analysis does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill’s introducer or the Florida Senate.