Georgia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Georgia House Bill HB1198 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/08/2024

                    24 LC 49 1607
House Bill 1198
By: Representatives Bazemore of the 69
th
, Bennett of the 94
th
, Beverly of the 143
rd
, Jones of
the 25
th
, Carter of the 93
rd
, and others 
A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
AN ACT
To amend Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to
1
elementary and secondary education, so as to provide for the State Board of Education to2
establish a three-year pilot immersive writing program for eligible public elementary schools;3
to provide for eligibility; to provide for grant funds for eligible public schools to develop and4
implement immersive writing programs for students in grades two through four; to provide5
for applications and selection to participate in the pilot program; to provide for assessment6
and reporting on the impacts of the pilot program; to authorize the State Board of Education7
to promulgate rules and regulations to implement the pilot program; to provide for automatic8
repeal; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting9
laws; and for other purposes.10
BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF GEORGIA:11
SECTION 1.12
Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to elementary and13
secondary education, is amended in Article 7, relating to additional state aid, by designating14
Code Sections 20-2-330 through 20-2-334 as Part 1 and by adding a new part to read as15
follows:16
H. B. 1198
- 1 - 24 LC 49 1607
"Part 217
20-2-335.18
(a)(1)  The State Board of Education shall establish a pilot immersive writing program19
for elementary school students in order to:20
(A)  Provide funding for all public school students in grades two through four to21
participate in programs that provide for immersive writing experiences that are aligned22
with writing standards established by the State Board of Education and can be23
integrated into existing curricula;24
(B)  Improve literacy skills of elementary school students and motivate them to engage25
in writing projects; and26
(C)  Study the impacts of such pilot writing program.27
(2)  Subject to appropriations by the General Assembly, the pilot program shall include28
funding for up to $2 million in grants each school year, for up to three school years29
beginning with the 2025-2026 school year, to participating public elementary schools.30
(3)  To be eligible to participate in the pilot program, a public elementary school shall:31
(A)  Serve students in any grades two through four; and32
(B)  By January 1, 2025, submit an application to participate in the pilot program,33
which application shall include such school's statement of intent for the use of grant34
funds.35
(4)  The State Board of Education shall establish pilot program requirements and criteria36
for selecting eligible public schools to participate in the pilot program in accordance with37
the provisions of this Code section.38
(5)  The State Board of Education shall be authorized to establish reporting requirements39
for the public schools participating in the pilot program.40
(6)  The State Board of Education shall promulgate rules and regulations necessary to41
carry out the provisions of this Code section.42
H. B. 1198
- 2 - 24 LC 49 1607
(b)(1)  By October 1, 2024, the Department of Education shall develop an application43
process and seek applications from eligible public schools for the pilot program to be44
submitted no later than January 1, 2025.45
(2)(A)  The Department of Education shall monitor and annually assess the status of the46
pilot program with cooperation and input from the public schools and local school47
systems participating in the pilot program.48
(B)  Beginning no later than June 1, 2025, and by June 1 of each year thereafter, the49
Department of Education shall provide to the State Board of Education a report of the50
annual assessment provided for in subparagraph (A) of this paragraph.51
(c)  This Code section shall stand repealed in its entirety on July 1, 2028."52
SECTION 2.53
This Act shall become effective on July 1, 2024.54
SECTION 3.55
All laws and parts of laws in conflict with this Act are repealed.56
H. B. 1198
- 3 -