Georgia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Georgia House Bill HB484 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/16/2023

                    23 LC 43 2633
H. B. 484
- 1 -
House Bill 484
By: Representatives Carter of the 93
rd
, Beverly of the 143
rd
, Evans of the 57
th
, Oliver of the
82
nd
, Blackmon of the 146
th
, and others 
A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
AN ACT
To amend Chapter 3 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the
1
Teachers Retirement System of Georgia, so as to extend the sunset date of an option for2
full-time employment of certain beneficiaries; to increase the number of the areas of highest3
need relative to the full-time employment beneficiaries; to provide for related matters; to4
provide conditions for an effective date and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and5
for other purposes.6
BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF GEORGIA:7
SECTION 1.8
Chapter 3 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Teachers9
Retirement System of Georgia, is amended by revising subsections (a) and (d) of Code10
Section 47-3-127.1, relating to full-time employment of beneficiaries permitted under limited11
conditions, required employer contributions, and areas of highest need, as follows:12
"(a)  From July 1, 2022, until June 30, 2026
 2027, notwithstanding the provisions of Code13
Section 47-3-127, to the extent and under the conditions provided for in this Code section,14
a public school system may employ a beneficiary who has obtained 30 years of creditable15
service in this retirement system in a full-time capacity as a certified teacher of16 23 LC 43 2633
H. B. 484
- 2 -
pre-kindergarten through grade 12 who has as his or her primary responsibility the
17
academic instruction of students in a classroom in an area of highest need determined for18
the RESA to which such public school system is assigned, provided that at least one year19
has expired from the effective date of such beneficiary's retirement and he or she was not20
restored to service as a teacher pursuant to Code Section 47-3-127 during such period of21
time."22
"(d)(1)  As used in this Code section, 'area of highest need' means one of the three
 six23
content areas for which there are the greatest percentages of unfilled positions for24
classroom teachers in a RESA.25
(2)  The areas of highest need shall be determined for each RESA annually by the26
Department of Education after consultation with the Professional Standards Commission.27
Such determinations shall be based upon a five-year average review of a survey reported28
by local school systems to the Department of Education.  The areas of highest need for29
each RESA shall be reported to the retirement system on an annual basis beginning30
July 1, 2022, and ending July 1, 2025 2026."31
SECTION 2.32
This Act shall become effective on July 1, 2024, only if it is determined to have been33
concurrently funded as provided in Chapter 20 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia34
Annotated, the "Public Retirement Systems Standards Law"; otherwise, this Act shall not35
become effective and shall be automatically repealed in its entirety on July 1, 2024, as36
required by subsection (a) of Code Section 47-20-50.37
SECTION 3.38
All laws and parts of laws in conflict with this Act are repealed.39