23 LC 49 1230 S. B. 207 - 1 - Senate Bill 207 By: Senators Esteves of the 6th, Mallow of the 2nd, Islam of the 7th, Butler of the 55th, Jackson of the 41st and others A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT To amend Subpart 2 of Part 6 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of 1 Georgia Annotated, relating to conditions of employment for professionals in elementary and2 secondary education, so as to revise the minimum base salary for certificated professional3 personnel with bachelor's degrees and from zero to two years of creditable service; to provide4 for periodic salary studies; to provide for exemptions; to provide for related matters; to repeal5 conflicting laws; and for other purposes.6 BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF GEORGIA:7 SECTION 1.8 Subpart 2 of Part 6 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia9 Annotated, relating to conditions of employment for professionals in elementary and10 secondary education, is amended by revising Code Section 20-2-212, relating to salary11 schedules, as follows:12 23 LC 49 1230 S. B. 207 - 2 - "20-2-212. 13 (a)(1) The State Board of Education shall establish a schedule of minimum salaries for14 services rendered by teachers, administrators, and other certificated professional15 personnel employed by local units of administration which shall be on a ten-month basis16 and which shall be paid by local units of administration to the various classifications of17 professional personnel required to be certificated by the Professional Standards18 Commission. The minimum salary schedule shall provide a minimum salary base for19 each classification of professional personnel required to be certificated,; shall provide for20 increment increases above the minimum salary base of each classification based upon21 individual experience and length of satisfactory service,; and shall include such other22 uniformly applicable factors as the state board may find relevant to the establishment of23 such a schedule.24 (2) Effective July 1, 2023, the The minimum salary base for certificated professional25 personnel with a bachelor's degrees and no experience zero, one, or two years of26 creditable service, when annualized from a ten-month basis to a 12 month basis, shall be27 comparable to the beginning salaries of the recent graduates of the University System of28 Georgia holding bachelor's degrees and entering positions, excluding professional29 educator teaching positions, in Georgia having educational entry requirements30 comparable to the requirements for entry into Georgia public school teaching no less than31 $49,092.00.32 (3) The placement of teachers on the salary schedule of minimum salaries provided for33 in this subsection shall be based on certificate level and years of creditable experience,34 except service; provided, however, that a teacher shall not receive credit for any year of35 experience in which the teacher received an unsatisfactory or ineffective annual36 summative performance evaluation rating, or its equivalent, pursuant to Code37 Section 20-2-210 or for the second year of two consecutive years in which a teacher38 receives two consecutive annual summative received a needs development annual39 23 LC 49 1230 S. B. 207 - 3 - summative performance rating, or its equivalent, ratings pursuant to Code40 Section 20-2-210.41 (4) Beginning in 2027, and not less than once every five years thereafter, the State Board42 of Education, through a study which shall include consultation with the Department of43 Administrative Services, the Department of Labor, the University System of Georgia, the44 Technical College System of Georgia, representatives of local units of administration,45 and such others as the State Board of Education may consult, shall determine whether to46 recommend to the General Assembly an adjustment to the minimum salaries provided for47 in this Code section. Not later than October 1 of the year in which such study is48 concluded, the State School Superintendent shall submit a report of such study to the49 House Committee on Appropriations, the House Committee on Education, the Senate50 Appropriations Committee, and the Senate Education and Youth Committee.51 (b) The General Assembly shall annually appropriate funds to implement a salary schedule52 for certificated professional personnel. For each state fiscal year, the state board shall53 adopt the salary schedule for which funding has been appropriated by the General54 Assembly.55 (c)(1) A local unit of administration shall not pay to any full-time certificated56 professional employee personnel a salary less than that prescribed by the schedule of57 minimum salaries, except as required by this Code section; nor shall a local unit of58 administration pay to any part-time certificated professional employee personnel less than59 a pro rata portion of the respective salary prescribed by the schedule of minimum salaries,60 except as required by this Code section.61 (2) For purposes of this subsection, an educator's placement on the salary schedule shall62 not be based on a leadership degree, which shall mean a degree earned in conjunction63 with completion of an educator leadership preparation program approved by the64 Professional Standards Commission, unless the educator is employed in a leadership65 position as defined by the State Board of Education, but shall be placed on the salary66 23 LC 49 1230 S. B. 207 - 4 - schedule position attributable to the educator but for the leadership degree; provided, 67 however, that this shall not apply, regardless of whether or not he or she is in a leadership68 position, to:69 (1) (A) An educator who possessed a leadership degree prior to July 1, 2010; or70 (2)(B) An educator who possessed:71 (A)(i) A master's level leadership degree prior to July 1, 2012;72 (B)(ii) An education specialist level leadership degree prior to July 1, 2013; or73 (C)(iii) A doctoral level leadership degree prior to July 1, 2014,74 so long as he or she was enrolled in such leadership preparation program on or before75 April 1, 2009.76 (b)(d) Local units of administration may supplement the salaries of personnel subject to77 the schedule of minimum salaries under subsection (a) of this Code section and, in fixing78 the amount of those supplements, may take into consideration the nature of duties to be79 performed, the responsibility of the position held, the subject matter or grades to be taught,80 and the experience and performance of the particular employee whose salary is being81 supplemented. In any fiscal year in which such personnel receive an increase under the82 minimum salary schedule, a local unit of administration shall not decrease any local salary83 supplement for such personnel below the local supplement amount received in the84 immediately preceding fiscal year by those personnel of that local unit of administration85 unless such local unit of administration has conducted at least two public hearings86 regarding such decrease, notice of which hearings, including the time, place, agenda, and87 specific subject matter of the meeting, the local unit shall cause to be published in the legal88 organ of the county which is the legal situs of such local unit one time at least seven days89 prior to the date such hearings are to be held. Written notice shall be provided to each90 employee subject to the schedule of minimum salaries under subsection (a) of this Code91 section at least seven days prior to the date of the hearings. Each such hearing shall be held92 23 LC 49 1230 S. B. 207 - 5 - and shall commence after school hours to allow certificated and noncertificated personnel 93 to attend.94 (c) (e) A local unit of administration shall pay beginning classroom teachers the first salary95 payment for the number of days worked at the end of the first month of the school year in96 which service is rendered. The State Board of Education shall develop rules and97 procedures for implementing this subsection by July 1, 2001 2023.98 (f) The provisions of this Code section shall not apply to school principals or local school99 superintendents."100 SECTION 2.101 All laws and parts of laws in conflict with this Act are repealed.102