Georgia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Georgia Senate Bill SB32 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/15/2023

                    23 LC 49 1421S
S. B. 32 (SUB)
- 1 -
The House Committee on Education offers the following substitute to SB 32:
A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
AN ACT
To amend Article 11 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated,1
relating to public school property and facilities, so as to require local education agencies to2
implement a mobile panic alert system capable of connecting disparate emergency services3
technologies to ensure real-time coordination between multiple state and local first responder4
agencies in the event of a school security emergency; to provide for exceptions; to require5
the Department of Administrative Services to conduct market research and possibly issue a6
competitive solicitation for multiple vendors to provide for such systems; to provide for a7
short title; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting8
laws; and for other purposes.9
BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF GEORGIA:10
SECTION 1.11
This Act shall be known and may be cited as "Alyssa's Law."12
SECTION 2.13
Article 11 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to14
public school property and facilities, is amended by adding a new part to read as follows:15 23 LC 49 1421S
S. B. 32 (SUB)
- 2 -
"Part 416
20-2-590.17
(a)(1)  Not later than July 1, 2024, each local education agency, as that term is defined18
in Code Section 20-2-167.1, shall implement a mobile panic alert system capable of19
connecting disparate emergency services technologies to ensure real-time coordination20
between local and state law enforcement and first responder agencies.  Such system shall21
be known as the 'Alyssa's Alert' and shall integrate with local public safety answering22
point infrastructure to transmit 911 calls and mobile activations.23
(2)  In addition to the requirements of paragraph (1) of this subsection, each local24
education agency may implement additional strategies or systems to ensure real-time25
coordination between multiple first responder agencies in the event of a school security26
emergency.27
(3)  A local education agency shall not be required to procure or implement new or28
additional capabilities if, as of July 1, 2023, such local education agency has already29
implemented a mobile panic alert system with capabilities which meet the requirements30
of paragraph (1) of this subsection.31
(b)  Not later than December 1, 2023, the Department of Administrative Services shall32
conduct market research in consultation with the State School Superintendent and the33
Georgia Emergency Management and Homeland Security Agency to identify whether an34
existing competitively procured source of supply is available for a system that satisfies the35
requirements of paragraph (1) of subsection (a) of this Code section from multiple vendors36
for use by local education agencies.  If no existing source of supply exists, the Department37
of Administrative Services shall issue a competitive solicitation for such source of supply38
no later than January 1, 2024."39 23 LC 49 1421S
S. B. 32 (SUB)
- 3 -
SECTION 3.40
This Act shall become effective July 1, 2023.41
SECTION 4.42
All laws and parts of laws in conflict with this Act are repealed.43