24 LC 47 3042S The House Committee on Education offers the following substitute to SB 32: A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT To amend Article 11 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated,1 relating to public school property and facilities, so as to require local education agencies to2 implement a mobile panic alert system capable of connecting disparate emergency services3 technologies to ensure real-time coordination between multiple state and local first responder4 agencies in the event of a school security emergency; to provide for exceptions; to require5 the Department of Administrative Services to conduct market research and possibly issue a6 competitive solicitation for multiple vendors to provide for such systems; to provide for a7 short title; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting8 laws; and for other purposes.9 BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF GEORGIA:10 SECTION 1.11 This Act shall be known and may be cited as "Alyssa's Law."12 SECTION 2.13 Article 11 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to14 public school property and facilities, is amended by adding a new part to read as follows:15 S. B. 32 (SUB) - 1 - 24 LC 47 3042S "Part 416 20-2-590.17 (a)(1) Not later than July 1, 2026, each local education agency, as that term is defined18 in Code Section 20-2-167.1, shall implement a mobile panic alert system capable of19 connecting disparate emergency services technologies to ensure real-time coordination20 between local and state law enforcement and first responder agencies. Such system shall21 be known as the 'Alyssa's Alert' and shall integrate with existing technology found in22 each local public safety answering point infrastructure to transmit 9-1-1 calls and mobile23 activations.24 (2) In addition to the requirements of paragraph (1) of this subsection, each local25 education agency may implement additional strategies or systems to ensure real-time26 coordination between multiple first responder agencies in the event of a school security27 emergency.28 (3) A local education agency shall not be required to procure or implement new or29 additional capabilities if, as of July 1, 2025, such local education agency has already30 implemented a mobile panic alert system with capabilities which meet the requirements31 of paragraph (1) of this subsection.32 (b) Not later than December 1, 2025, the Department of Administrative Services shall33 conduct market research in consultation with the State School Superintendent and the34 Georgia Emergency Management and Homeland Security Agency to identify whether an35 existing competitive source of supply is available for a system that satisfies the36 requirements of paragraph (1) of subsection (a) of this Code section from multiple vendors37 for use by local education agencies. If no existing source of supply exists, the Department38 of Administrative Services shall issue a competitive solicitation for such source of supply39 no later than January 1, 2026."40 S. B. 32 (SUB) - 2 - 24 LC 47 3042S SECTION 3.41 This Act shall become effective on July 1, 2024.42 SECTION 4.43 All laws and parts of laws in conflict with this Act are repealed.44 S. B. 32 (SUB) - 3 -