25 LC 60 0051 House Resolution 128 By: Representatives Dempsey of the 13 th , Barton of the 5 th , and Lumsden of the 12 th A RESOLUTION Compensating Mr. Joseph Samuel Watkins; and for other purposes. 1 WHEREAS, on the evening of January 11, 2000, while driving north on Highway 27 toward2 Rome, Georgia, a man saw a small blue car driving erratically in front of him and interacting3 aggressively with a truck, and shortly thereafter the man observed a flash and saw the truck4 veer over the median and opposite lanes and then crash; and5 WHEREAS, 20-year-old Isaac Dawkins was driving north in his truck on Highway 27 when6 he was shot in the head, causing Mr. Dawkins to crash his truck and later die from the7 injuries he suffered; and8 WHEREAS, on the same evening of January 11, 2000, 18-year-old Joseph Watkins drove9 his white truck south from his home in Rome to the home of his girlfriend in Cedartown,10 undisputedly making several calls on his cell phone and passing the scene of Mr. Dawkins's11 crash on the way; and12 WHEREAS, cell phone records establish that Mr. Watkins could not have been at the crime13 scene when Mr. Dawkins interacted with the small blue car and was shot; and14 H. R. 128 - 1 - 25 LC 60 0051 WHEREAS, police determined that Mr. Dawkins had been shot with a 9mm bullet; and 15 WHEREAS, on November 13, 2000, the Floyd County Police Department arrested Mr.16 Watkins on charges in relation to Mr. Dawkins's death; and17 WHEREAS, law enforcement learned of a dead, rotting dog found in a plastic bag in the18 graveyard about 15 feet from Mr. Dawkins's grave, and they collected and possessed the dog19 for another seven months before disclosing its existence to Mr. Watkins, the weekend before20 the trial; and21 WHEREAS, despite cell phone evidence of innocence and Mr. Watkins's consistent claims22 of innocence, the Floyd County District Attorney's Office prosecuted Mr. Watkins and23 inflamed the jury by arguing an unfounded theory of depravity: that Mr. Watkins had not24 only killed Mr. Dawkins, but also shot the grave dog in the head and dumped it near Mr.25 Dawkins's grave as a "signature" or "calling card"; and26 WHEREAS, following Mr. Watkins's attorney's demand at trial to know any and all evidence27 about the newly disclosed grave dog, the prosecutor and a Georgia Bureau of Investigation28 forensic analyst explained that the GBI analyst had with him an x-ray of the dog showing a29 bullet in the dog's head, but falsely said that no bullet had been extracted from the dog, no30 report had been created, and the State had no knowledge of the type of bullet used; and31 32 WHEREAS, jurors found the grave dog testimony extremely disturbing and compelling; and33 WHEREAS, during the trial, the main Rome newspaper inaccurately reported that police had34 determined, and the GBI analyst had testified at trial, that the grave dog was shot with a 9mm35 bullet, and the article also pointed out that Mr. Dawkins had been shot with a 9mm; and36 H. R. 128 - 2 - 25 LC 60 0051 WHEREAS, Mr. Watkins was convicted by a jury and sentenced to life imprisonment on 37 July 2, 2001; and38 WHEREAS, Mr. Watkins's co-defendant, who was the alleged shooter, was acquitted by a39 different jury; and40 WHEREAS, Mr. Watkins continued to maintain his innocence and pursued appeals and other41 post-conviction relief; and42 WHEREAS, years later, the podcast Undisclosed and the Georgia Innocence Project learned43 that during jury deliberations at Mr. Watkins's trial, one of the jurors had improperly44 conducted her own "drive test" related to the cell phone records, causing her to erroneously45 determine that Mr. Watkins could have been present at the crime scene, a determination46 which she then shared with other jurors; and47 WHEREAS, the Georgia Innocence Project also discovered that critical information had been48 suppressed and not disclosed to Mr. Watkins, namely, that contrary to the State's assertions,49 before trial a bullet was indeed extracted from the grave dog, determined to be a .22 caliber50 bullet (rather than a 9mm, the type of bullet used to shoot Mr. Dawkins) and that a forensic51 report and a chain of custody log were prepared documenting the same, and that the GBI52 analyst had even brought the extracted bullet to the courthouse on the day he testified; and53 WHEREAS, after discovering this evidence of misconduct, Mr. Watkins filed a second54 petition for habeas corpus alleging that juror misconduct and the misconduct of the Floyd55 County Police Department and the Georgia Bureau of Investigation led to an unfair trial and56 his conviction despite his innocence; and57 H. R. 128 - 3 - 25 LC 60 0051 WHEREAS, following a three-day evidentiary hearing in February and March, 2022, where 58 Mr. Watkins presented the evidence of misconduct, evidence suppression and Mr. Watkins's59 innocence, the state habeas court found that the GBI analyst gave false and misleading60 testimony at trial, that the State committed misconduct by failing to disclose exculpatory61 evidence, and the juror's error-filled "drive test" experiment resulted in a fundamentally62 unfair trial, all in violation of Mr. Watkins's constitutional rights, and thus the court granted63 the habeas corpus petition, overturning Mr. Watkins's convictions, and granting him a new64 trial; and 65 WHEREAS, in a unanimous decision on December 20, 2022, the Supreme Court of Georgia66 affirmed the state habeas court's grant of relief to Mr. Watkins; and67 WHEREAS, on January 3, 2023, Mr. Watkins was granted bond and released, but the68 charges against him remained pending and the State could have sought to retry him; and69 WHEREAS, on September 21, 2023, based on a review of all of the available evidence,70 including the evidence presented at trial and new investigations, the State moved for entry71 of an order of nolle prosequi, which the Superior Court of Floyd County granted, thereby72 dismissing all the charges and officially exonerating Mr. Watkins; and73 WHEREAS, the conviction, incarceration, and subsequent loss of liberty and other damages74 suffered by Mr. Watkins occurred through no fault or negligence on his part, and it is only75 fitting and proper that he be compensated for his losses in the amount of $75,000.00 for each76 year of wrongful imprisonment; and77 H. R. 128 - 4 - 25 LC 60 0051 WHEREAS, Georgia is one of only eleven states that does not have a statutory regime for 78 compensating innocent individuals who have been exonerated following wrongful conviction79 and incarceration; and80 WHEREAS, this lack of a statutory regime for compensation requires introduction of a81 private resolution to secure such compensation in Georgia.82 NOW, THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF83 GEORGIA that the Department of Administrative Services is authorized and directed to pay84 the sum of $1,688,527.40 to Mr. Joseph Samuel Watkins as compensation as provided above. 85 Said sum shall be paid from funds appropriated to or available to the Department of86 Administrative Services and shall be paid subject to the provisions of this resolution. After87 an initial payment of $535,000.00, the remainder of said sum shall be paid immediately into88 a commercial annuity account bearing interest at the prevailing market rate, payable in equal89 monthly installments over ten years beginning in 2026 with interest payable to Mr. Joseph90 Samuel Watkins. The State of Georgia shall be entitled to a credit equal to the amount it91 pays under this resolution should Mr. Joseph Samuel Watkins recover damages as a result92 of a lawsuit against any state official or employee acting in an official capacity whose tort93 liability for wrongful conviction arises from the same circumstances as described herein, less94 any attorney's fees or costs Mr. Joseph Samuel Watkins paid in obtaining those damages. 95 Should Mr. Joseph Samuel Watkins recover damages totaling less than the amount the State96 of Georgia pays under this resolution, the State of Georgia shall be entitled to a partial credit97 no greater than the amount of damages Mr. Joseph Samuel Watkins recovers less any98 attorney's fees or costs Mr. Joseph Samuel Watkins paid in obtaining those damages. Upon99 the death of Mr. Joseph Samuel Watkins, all payments and all obligations of the State of100 Georgia regarding any and all future payments with respect to the annuity shall continue to101 be made to his estate or heirs.102 H. R. 128 - 5 - 25 LC 60 0051 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that any amount received by Mr. Joseph Samuel Watkins 103 pursuant to this resolution shall be excluded from his taxable net income for state income tax104 purposes.105 H. R. 128 - 6 -