Georgia 2025-2026 Regular Session

Georgia House of Representatives 2025 Bills & Legislation

GA

Georgia 2025-2026 Regular Session

Georgia House Bill HR165

Introduced
2/4/25  
Enrolled
2/4/25  
Physical Therapy Day at the state capitol; January 28, 2025; recognize
GA

Georgia 2025-2026 Regular Session

Georgia House Bill HR166

Introduced
2/4/25  
Enrolled
2/4/25  
Dental Hygienists Appreciation Day; February 6, 2025; recognize
GA

Georgia 2025-2026 Regular Session

Georgia House Bill HR167

Introduced
2/4/25  
Enrolled
2/4/25  
Alzheimer's Awareness Day in Georgia; February 6, 2025; recognize
GA

Georgia 2025-2026 Regular Session

Georgia House Bill HR168

Introduced
2/4/25  
Enrolled
2/4/25  
Thomas, Dr. David A.; retirement from Morehouse College; recognize
GA

Georgia 2025-2026 Regular Session

Georgia House Bill HR169

Introduced
2/4/25  
Enrolled
2/4/25  
Physician's Day at the state capitol; 02/05/25; saluting the physicians of Georgia; recognize
GA

Georgia 2025-2026 Regular Session

Georgia House Bill HR17

Introduced
1/14/25  
Enrolled
1/14/25  
Veterans who were victims of Agent Orange during the Vietnam War; commend
GA

Georgia 2025-2026 Regular Session

Georgia House Bill HR170

Introduced
2/4/25  
Enrolled
2/4/25  
Cornerstone Baptist Church PTC; occasion of its 15th anniversary; recognize
GA

Georgia 2025-2026 Regular Session

Georgia House Bill HR171

Introduced
2/4/25  
Enrolled
2/4/25  
Curry, Reverend Dr. Augustus T.; commend
GA

Georgia 2025-2026 Regular Session

Georgia House Bill HR172

Introduced
2/4/25  
Enrolled
2/4/25  
Wear Red Day; February 7, 2025; recognize
GA

Georgia 2025-2026 Regular Session

Georgia House Bill HR173

Introduced
2/4/25  
Enrolled
2/4/25  
Newton, Charles G., IV.; outstanding public service; commend
GA

Georgia 2025-2026 Regular Session

Georgia House Bill HR174

Introduced
2/5/25  
State Board of Education; appointment of state school superintendent effective not later than January 1, 2031; provide - CA
GA

Georgia 2025-2026 Regular Session

Georgia House Bill HR175

Introduced
2/5/25  
Enrolled
2/5/25  
Latino Day at the state capitol; February 5, 2025; recognize
GA

Georgia 2025-2026 Regular Session

Georgia House Bill HR176

Introduced
2/5/25  
Enrolled
2/5/25  
Threadcraft, Johnese; condolences
GA

Georgia 2025-2026 Regular Session

Georgia House Bill HR177

Introduced
2/5/25  
Enrolled
2/5/25  
Adekola, Richard Olorunrokan, "King Rokan"; condolences
GA

Georgia 2025-2026 Regular Session

Georgia House Bill HR178

Introduced
2/5/25  
Enrolled
2/5/25  
Baker, Antonio Cornelius; condolences

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records