Hawaii 2024 2024 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB2228 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/22/2024

                    HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES   H.B. NO.   2228     THIRTY-SECOND LEGISLATURE, 2024         STATE OF HAWAII                                A BILL FOR AN ACT     relating to the DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATION.     BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:   

HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.B. NO. 2228
THIRTY-SECOND LEGISLATURE, 2024
STATE OF HAWAII

HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

H.B. NO.

2228

THIRTY-SECOND LEGISLATURE, 2024

 

STATE OF HAWAII

 

 

 

 

 

 

A BILL FOR AN ACT

 

 

relating to the DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATION.

 

 

BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:

 

      SECTION 1.  (a)  Notwithstanding any law to the contrary, the department of corrections and rehabilitation shall establish a pilot program to allow inmates in its custody to perform work for the State.      (b)  The pilot program shall be separate from the Hawaii correctional industries program in chapter 354D, Hawaii Revised Statutes.      (c)  No later than September 1, 2024, the department of corrections and rehabilitation shall develop criteria to determine:      (1)  Which inmates shall be eligible to participate in the pilot program;      (2)  What type of work is appropriate for inmates in the pilot program to perform; and      (3)  The pay scale for which inmates shall be compensated for their work.      (d)  The department of corrections and rehabilitation shall implement the pilot program no later than October 1, 2024.      SECTION 2.  The department of corrections and rehabilitation shall submit a report of its findings and recommendations on the pilot program established pursuant to section 1, including any proposed legislation, to the legislature no later than twenty days before the convening of the regular session of 2026.      SECTION 3.  This Act shall take effect on July 1, 2024, and shall be repealed on June 30, 2026.      INTRODUCED BY:   _____________________________              

     SECTION 1.  (a)  Notwithstanding any law to the contrary, the department of corrections and rehabilitation shall establish a pilot program to allow inmates in its custody to perform work for the State.

     (b)  The pilot program shall be separate from the Hawaii correctional industries program in chapter 354D, Hawaii Revised Statutes.

     (c)  No later than September 1, 2024, the department of corrections and rehabilitation shall develop criteria to determine:

     (1)  Which inmates shall be eligible to participate in the pilot program;

     (2)  What type of work is appropriate for inmates in the pilot program to perform; and

     (3)  The pay scale for which inmates shall be compensated for their work.

     (d)  The department of corrections and rehabilitation shall implement the pilot program no later than October 1, 2024.

     SECTION 2.  The department of corrections and rehabilitation shall submit a report of its findings and recommendations on the pilot program established pursuant to section 1, including any proposed legislation, to the legislature no later than twenty days before the convening of the regular session of 2026.

     SECTION 3.  This Act shall take effect on July 1, 2024, and shall be repealed on June 30, 2026.

 

INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________

INTRODUCED BY:

_____________________________

 

 

       Report Title: Pilot Program; Inmates to Perform Work for State; Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation   Description: Requires the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation to establish a pilot program to allow inmates to perform work for the State.  Sunsets on 6/30/2026.       The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent. 

 

 

Report Title:

Pilot Program; Inmates to Perform Work for State; Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation

 

Description:

Requires the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation to establish a pilot program to allow inmates to perform work for the State.  Sunsets on 6/30/2026.

 

 

 

The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.