Iowa 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Iowa Senate Bill SF546 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 04/20/2023

                    1 
 
SF 546 – Posting of Statutorily Required Public Notices (LSB2387SZ) 
Staff Contact:  Anthony Arellano (515.281.6764) anthony.arellano@legis.iowa.gov 
Fiscal Note Version – New   
Description 
Senate File 546 requires the Secretary of State (SOS) to create an online portal on which a 
public posting entity must post all statutorily required public notices.  A public posting entity is 
also permitted to post a statutorily required public notice on an official Internet site, an official 
social media account, or in an official newspaper. A “public posting entity” is defined as the 
following:  the State of Iowa, an Iowa city, an Iowa county, an Iowa public school district, or an 
Iowa private or public agency as defined in Iowa Code section 28E.2. The Bill requires the SOS 
to collect a fee of $5 from a public posting entity for each notice posted by the entity.  Moneys 
collected by the SOS are to be deposited into the Business Administration Fund. The Bill is 
effective on July 1, 2024, but allows the SOS to adopt administrative rules prior to this date. 
Background 
Current law requires certain governmental entities to publish public notices in newspapers, 
given proper circulation within the municipality, and a governmental entity’s Internet site if the 
governmental entity maintains an Internet site. The Business Administration Fund is composed 
of moneys collected in surcharges implemented, assessed, and collected by the SOS.  Moneys 
in the Business Administration Fund are appropriated to the Office of the SOS to support the 
administration of the Office. Currently, Iowa counties pay approximately $50 to $250 per 
publication of a required public notice in a county newspaper.  
The Technology Modernization Fund under the control of the SOS is to be appropriated to the 
SOS for purposes of modernizing their Business Services Division.  Funds are available to the 
SOS until June 30, 2026, or until fully expended.  As of March 27, 2023, approximately $3.8 
million was available in the Fund. 
Assumptions 
• According to the SOS, the implementation of the Bill is dependent on the capability of the 
online portal system with the SOS’s current Fast Tracking Filing System, with a one-time 
cost between $150,000 and $500,000 to be funded by the Technology Modernization Fund.  
• The SOS’s new online portal will need ongoing maintenance and additional full-time 
equivalent (FTE) positions.  Ongoing costs will be approximately $500,000 per fiscal year 
and are to be funded by the revenue generated by the new $5 fee charged by the SOS to 
public posting entities. The fee will be deposited into the Business Administration Fund. 
• The SOS estimates needing $215,000 and 3.0 full-time equivalent (FTE) positions to 
administer the program. 
 
 
 Position Title Salary 
Software Developer 1 82,000$  
Help Desk Technician 1 65,000
Training Specialist 68,000
SOS FTE Positions 
Fiscal Note 
Fiscal Services Division  2 
• Total fee revenue that governmental entities will pay to the SOS is unknown. 
• The number of counties that will no longer publish required public notices in county 
newspapers cannot be estimated.  
Fiscal Impact 
The one-time cost to implement the online portal will be between $150,000 and $500,000.  This 
cost will be funded from the Technology Modernization Fund in FY 2024.  Annual maintenance 
of the database and additional FTE positions will cost approximately $500,000 beginning in  
FY 2024 and will be funded from the Business Administration Fund. The Bill will increase 
revenue to the SOS by an unknown amount. The Bill will reduce expenditures for local entities 
by an unknown amount.  
Sources 
Secretary of State Office 
Iowa State Association of Counties 
Legislative Services Agency analysis  
 
 
/s/ Jennifer Acton 
April 20, 2023 
 
 
 
Doc ID 1371101 
 
 
The fiscal note for this Bill was prepared pursuant to Joint Rule 17 and the Iowa Code.  Data used in developing this 
fiscal note is available from the Fiscal Services Division of the Legislative Services Agency upon request.  
 
www.legis.iowa.gov