Iowa 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Iowa House Bill HSB307 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/06/2025

                    House Study Bill 307 - Introduced   HOUSE FILE _____   BY (PROPOSED COMMITTEE ON   WAYS AND MEANS BILL BY   CHAIRPERSON KAUFMANN)   A BILL FOR   An Act relating to the assessment of certain development 1   property, and including effective date and retroactive 2   applicability provisions. 3   BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF IOWA: 4   TLSB 2625YC (1) 91   jm/md  

  H.F. _____   Section 1. Section 441.72, Code 2025, is amended to read as 1   follows: 2   441.72 Assessment of platted lots   development property . 3   1. a. Except as provided in subsection 2 , when a 4   subdivision plat is recorded pursuant to   chapter 354 , the 5   individual lots within the subdivision plat shall not be   6   assessed in excess of the total assessment of the land as 7   acreage or unimproved property for five years after the 8   recording of the plat or until the lot is actually improved   9   with permanent construction, whichever occurs first. When an 10   individual lot has been improved with permanent construction,   11   the lot shall be assessed for taxation purposes as provided 12   in chapter 428 and this chapter . Property acquired for 13   development on or after January 1, 2020, or property owned   14   for development upon which development activities occur on or 15   after January 1, 2020, shall continue to be classified and 16   assessed for taxation in the manner the property was prior to 17   the acquisition or commencement of development activities. The   18   assessor shall not change the classification or assessment of   19   the property or a lot on the property while development is 20   occurring until the property or lot is improved with a new   21   permanent structure, sold, or five years have elapsed from the 22   date the subdivision plat is recorded pursuant to chapter 354,   23   if applicable. Upon the occurrence of one or more such events, 24   the property or lot shall be assessed for taxation purposes as 25   provided in chapter 428 and this chapter. 26   b. As used in this subsection, development means any of 27   the following: 28   (1) A reconstruction, alteration of the size or material 29   change in the external appearance of an existing structure on   30   a lot. 31   (2)   A change in the intensity of the use of lots or a change 32   in zoning, including an increase in the number of dwelling 33   units in an existing structure, or further subdividing the   34   lots to increase the number of dwelling units, commercial 35   -1-   LSB 2625YC (1) 91   jm/md   1/ 4                                                      

  H.F. _____   structures, manufacturing establishments, or offices. 1   (3)   Clearing the lots in anticipation of construction. 2   (4) Depositing fill dirt on the lots in anticipation of 3   construction. 4   (5)   Installing streets and public utilities on the lots. 5   2.   For subdivision plats recorded pursuant to chapter 6   354 on or after January 1, 2004, but before January 1, 2011, 7   the individual lots within the subdivision plat shall not 8   be assessed in excess of the total assessment of the land   9   as acreage or unimproved property for eight years after the 10   recording of the plat or until the lot is actually improved   11   with permanent construction, whichever occurs first. When an 12   individual lot has been improved with permanent construction, 13   the lot shall be assessed for taxation purposes as provided in   14   chapter 428 and this chapter . 15   3. 2. This section does not apply to special assessment 16   levies. 17   Sec. 2. REPEAL. Section 405.1, Code 2025, is repealed. 18   Sec. 3. IMPLEMENTATION. Nothing in this Act shall be 19   construed to require the refund or modification of property 20   taxes that are attributable to assessment years beginning 21   before January 1, 2025, or the adjustment of property 22   assessments for assessment years beginning before January 1, 23   2025. 24   Sec. 4. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act, being deemed of immediate 25   importance, takes effect upon enactment. 26   Sec. 5. RETROACTIVE APPLICABILITY. This Act applies 27   retroactively to assessment years beginning on or after January 28   1, 2025. 29   EXPLANATION 30   The inclusion of this explanation does not constitute agreement with 31   the explanations substance by the members of the general assembly. 32   This bill repeals Code section 405.1, which authorizes a 33   county board of supervisors to adopt an ordinance providing 34   that property acquired and subdivided for development of 35   -2-   LSB 2625YC (1) 91   jm/md   2/ 4                                

  H.F. _____   housing shall continue to be assessed for taxation in the 1   manner that it was prior to the acquisition for housing until 2   the lot is sold for construction or occupancy of housing or 3   five years from the date of subdivision, whichever is shorter. 4   Code section 405.1 also authorizes time extensions of certain 5   ordinances that affect the assessment of property subdivided 6   for development of housing and authorizes the time extensions 7   of certain ordinances by counties and by cities in the portion 8   of the applicable area located in the incorporated area of 9   the city. Additionally, the Code section authorizes cities 10   and counties to adopt, amend, or extend such ordinances and 11   provides that property acquired and subdivided for development 12   of housing shall continue to be assessed for taxation and taxed 13   in the manner it was prior to its acquisition for housing until 14   the lot is sold for construction or occupancy of housing. 15   Code section 441.72 provides that a platted lot for which 16   a subdivision plat was recorded is assessed for property tax 17   purposes as acreage or unimproved property for five years or 18   until the lot is actually improved with permanent construction, 19   whichever occurs first. However, for subdivision plats 20   recorded on or after January 1, 2004, but before January 1, 21   2011, the time limit is eight years. 22   The bill strikes the portions of Code section 441.72 23   relating to the five-year limitation and the eight-year 24   limitation and provides that property acquired for development 25   on or after January 1, 2020, or property owned for development 26   upon which development activities occur on or after January 1, 27   2020, shall continue to be classified and assessed for taxation   28   in the manner the property was prior to the acquisition or 29   commencement of development activities. The bill specifies 30   the assessor shall not change the classification or assessment 31   until the property or lot is improved with a new permanent 32   structure, sold, or five years have elapsed since the 33   subdivision plat was recorded, if applicable. 34   The bill defines development to include reconstruction, 35   -3-   LSB 2625YC (1) 91   jm/md   3/ 4  

  H.F. _____   zoning changes, clearing lots, depositing fill dirt, and 1   installing streets and public utilities on the lots. 2   The bill specifies nothing shall be construed to require the 3   refund or modification of property taxes that are attributable 4   to assessment years beginning before January 1, 2025, or 5   the adjustment of property assessments for assessment years 6   beginning before January 1, 2025. 7   The bill takes effect upon enactment and applies 8   retroactively to assessment years beginning on or after January 9   1, 2025. 10   -4-   LSB 2625YC (1) 91   jm/md   4/ 4