Iowa 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Iowa Senate Bill SF530 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/05/2025

                    Senate File 530 - Introduced   SENATE FILE 530   BY CELSI   A BILL FOR   An Act relating to support of direct care services and the 1   direct care workforce, establishing a state minimum hourly 2   wage for direct care workers under the Medicaid program, and 3   including a contingent effective date. 4   BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF IOWA: 5   TLSB 1469XS (3) 91   lh/ko  

  S.F. 530   DIVISION I 1   DIRECT CARE WORKFORCE SUPPORT PROGRAMS 2   Section 1. NEW SECTION   . 84A.22 Direct care workers  wage 3   survey. 4   Beginning January 1, 2027, and each odd-numbered year 5   thereafter, the department of workforce development shall 6   replicate the survey entitled Direct Care Workers of Iowa 7   2019 Wage & Benefit Survey, released in June 2019, to survey 8   wages and benefits for direct care workers. The survey shall 9   measure the wages and benefits of direct care workers employed 10   through temporary staffing agencies separately from direct care 11   workers employed directly by a facility or employer, and shall 12   measure wages and benefits delineated by direct care workers 13   years of experience to determine the effect of seniority on 14   current wages and benefits. A report containing the results of 15   the survey shall be published on the department of workforce 16   developments internet site no later than December 15. 17   Sec. 2. NURSING FACILITY FUNDING  REVIEW AND 18   REPORTING. The department of health and human services shall 19   do all of the following: 20   1. Review the appropriation made pursuant to 2023 Iowa 21   Acts, chapter 112, section 30, subsection 1, paragraph a, 22   subparagraph (1), subparagraph division (a), for the fiscal 23   period beginning July 1, 2023, and ending June 30, 2025, for 24   rebasing of case-mix nursing facilities including the fifteen 25   million dollars provided for this purpose, to identify how the 26   additional funding was utilized by the nursing facilities and 27   the extent to which the wages of direct care workers as defined 28   in section 249L.2 were increased as a result of the additional 29   funding. The department shall report initial findings and 30   recommendations by December 15, 2025, and final findings and 31   recommendations by December 15, 2026, to the governor and the 32   general assembly. 33   2. Review the outcomes of initiatives funded through the 34   federal American Rescue Plan Act of 2021, Pub. L. No. 117-2, to 35   -1-   LSB 1469XS (3) 91   lh/ko 1/ 4   

  S.F. 530   support the health care workforce including use of the funds to 1   increase the pay and benefits of direct support professionals, 2   and train, recruit, retain, and expand the direct support 3   professional workforce, to determine if the initiatives 4   should be continued. The department shall report findings and 5   recommendations to the governor and the general assembly by 6   December 15, 2025. 7   DIVISION II 8   DIRECT CARE WORKER MINIMUM WAGE REQUIREMENTS  MEDICAID 9   PROGRAM 10   Sec. 3. DIRECT CARE WORKER MINIMUM WAGE REQUIREMENTS  11   MEDICAID PROGRAM. 12   1. a. Notwithstanding section 91D.1, the state hourly wage 13   for an employee employed as a direct care worker by a provider 14   reimbursed under the Medicaid program shall be at least $15.00 15   beginning July 1, 2026; at least $16.00 beginning July 1, 16   2027; at least $17.00 beginning July 1, 2028; at least $18.00 17   beginning July 1, 2029; at least $19.00 beginning July 1, 2030; 18   and at least $20.00 beginning July 1, 2031. On or after July 19   1, 2032, the state hourly wage for an employee employed as a 20   direct care worker by a provider reimbursed under the Medicaid 21   program shall be increased by a cost-of-living adjustment as 22   determined by applying the percent change in the consumer price 23   index for urban wage earners and clerical workers, United 24   States city average, as published annually in October in the 25   federal register by the federal department of labor, bureau of 26   labor statistics.   27   b. Paragraph a shall not be construed to authorize a 28   provider that employs a direct care worker whose current hourly 29   wage is above the minimum wage pursuant to paragraph a, to 30   decrease the direct care workers current hourly wage. 31   2. For the purposes of this section, direct care worker 32   means an individual who provides supportive services and care 33   in home-based, community-based, or facility settings to people 34   experiencing health conditions, illness, or a disability, 35   -2-   LSB 1469XS (3) 91   lh/ko 2/ 4  

  S.F. 530   and who receives compensation for such services. Direct 1   care worker includes but is not limited to direct support 2   professionals, supported community living workers, home health 3   aides, universal workers, hospice aides, personal assistants, 4   patient care technicians, consumer directed attendant care 5   providers, senior helpers or companions, and certified nursing 6   assistants. 7   Sec. 4. CONTINGENT EFFECTIVE DATE. This division of this 8   Act takes effect upon the effective date of an increased 9   appropriation to the department of health and human services 10   for the Medicaid program to provide a reimbursement rate 11   increase to Medicaid providers who are subject to payment of 12   the required minimum wage for direct care workers under this 13   division of this Act in an amount that offsets the increase in 14   the required minimum wage paid by such Medicaid providers. 15   EXPLANATION 16   The inclusion of this explanation does not constitute agreement with 17   the explanations substance by the members of the general assembly. 18   This bill includes measures to support direct care services 19   and the direct care workforce. 20   DIVISION I. Division I of the bill includes provisions 21   relating to support of the direct care workforce. 22   Beginning January 1, 2027, and each odd-numbered year 23   thereafter, Iowa workforce development shall replicate the 24   survey entitled Direct Care Workers of Iowa 2019 Wage & 25   Benefit Survey, released in June 2019, to survey wages and 26   benefits for direct care workers, and publish the results of 27   the survey on Iowa workforce developments internet site no 28   later than December 15. 29   The bill requires the department of health and human 30   services (HHS) to review the funding appropriated for the 31   fiscal period beginning July 1, 2023, and ending June 30, 2025, 32   for rebasing of case-mix nursing facilities to identify how the 33   additional funding was utilized, and the extent to which direct 34   care worker wages were increased as a result of the additional 35   -3-   LSB 1469XS (3) 91   lh/ko 3/ 4  

  S.F. 530   funding. HHS must report initial and final findings and 1   recommendations to the governor and the general assembly. HHS 2   is also required to review the outcomes of initiatives funded 3   through the federal American Rescue Plan Act to support the 4   health care workforce and report findings and recommendations 5   to the governor and the general assembly by December 15, 2025. 6   DIVISION II. Division II of the bill requires Medicaid 7   providers to comply with direct care worker minimum wage 8   requirements. The bill provides that notwithstanding Code 9   section 91D.1 (minimum wage requirements  exceptions), the 10   state hourly wage for an employee employed as a direct care 11   worker, as defined in the bill, by a Medicaid provider shall 12   be at least $15.00 beginning July 1, 2026, and the minimum 13   shall increase by $1.00 per year to at least $20.00 beginning 14   July 1, 2031. The bill does not authorize a Medicaid provider 15   who is paying a direct care worker an hourly wage above the 16   required minimum to decrease the direct care workers current 17   hourly wage. On or after July 1, 2032, this state hourly 18   wage shall be increased by a cost-of-living adjustment amount 19   as determined by applying the percent change in the consumer 20   price index for urban wage earners and clerical workers, United 21   States city average, as published annually in October in the 22   federal register by the federal department of labor, bureau of 23   labor statistics. This division of the bill takes effect upon 24   the effective date of an increased appropriation to HHS for the 25   Medicaid program to provide a reimbursement rate increase to 26   Medicaid providers who are subject to payment of the required 27   minimum wage for direct care workers in an amount that offsets 28   the increase in the required minimum wage paid by such Medicaid 29   providers. 30   -4-   LSB 1469XS (3) 91   lh/ko 4/ 4