Iowa 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Iowa Senate Bill SF633 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 04/24/2025

                    1 
 
SF 633 – Forest and Fruit-Tree Reservations, Requirements (LSB2007SV) 
Staff Contact:  Michael Peters (515.281.6934) michael.peters@legis.iowa.gov 
Fiscal Note Version – New     
Description 
Senate File 633 establishes a fee structure for forest and fruit-tree reservations beginning 
January 1, 2026.  Each acre of qualifying reservation land will be subject to a fee, payable 
annually to the county treasurer where the property is located and is deposited into the county 
general fund.  The Bill categorizes the fees as follows: 
• $2 per acre for reservations located in the county where the owner maintains a homestead. 
• $3 per acre for reservations located in a county contiguous to the homestead county. 
• For all other reservations, including those within city limits, a per-acre fee calculated using a 
formula based on the average agricultural property tax rate and corn suitability rating in the 
county with the most exempt acres. 
 
Beginning on January 1, 2027, all fees will be subject to an increase based on the percentage of 
the Annual Inflation Factor established in this Bill. 
 
The Department of Management is tasked with determining and communicating the calculated 
rate by July 1 of each year.  This Bill takes effect for assessment years beginning on or after 
January 1, 2026, and all fees would be due annually on September 1 to the county treasurer 
where the reservation is located.  Fees collected in 2026 and 2027 are to be used for any 
county general fund purpose. Amounts collected after September 1, 2028, shall be used for 
property tax relief for fiscal years beginning on or after July 1, 2029. 
 
This Bill’s effective date is contingent on the passage of 2025 Iowa Acts, Senate Study Bill 1227 
(Property Tax Rates, Credits, and Exemptions Bill), Division I. 
Background 
Current Iowa Code chapter 427C defines forest and fruit-tree reservations, and Iowa Code 
section 441.22 establishes the property tax exemption.  Under current law, forest reservations 
are fully exempt from property tax and fruit-tree reservations are exempt for eight years after 
planting.   
 
A property tax preference for forest and fruit-tree property was first enacted in 1906 Iowa Acts, 
chapter 52 (Encourage the Planting of Forest and Fruit Trees Act).  Qualified property was not 
fully exempt under the 1906 legislation but instead limited to a taxable valuation of $1 per acre.  
The qualifications for an area to be considered a forest or fruit-tree reservation are substantially 
the same today as originally enacted in 1906.     
 
Since 1906, several changes to the preferential taxation of forest and fruit-tree reservations 
have been enacted:  
• 1933 Iowa Acts, chapter 121 (Assessed and Taxable Value the Same Act) — Assessed 
value of forest and fruit-tree reservations was raised to $4 per acre. 
• 1974 Iowa Acts, chapter 1231 (Valuation of Property Act) — Assessed value of forest and 
fruit-tree reservations was raised to $14.82 per acre. 
Fiscal Note 
Fiscal Services Division  2 
• 1982 Iowa Acts, chapter 1247 (Natural Resources Exemption and Assessment Act) — Rural 
forest reserve property was made fully exempt from property tax, while urban forest reserve 
property was to be assessed at market value.  Fruit-tree reservations were assessed at $20 
per acre. 
• 1984 Iowa Acts, chapter 1222 (Fruit-Tree and Forest Reservations Act) — Forest and  
fruit-tree reservation property was made fully exempt from property tax.  The fruit-tree  
eight-year limit after planting remains.   
 
The current annual value of the tax exemption to landowners is estimated to average $15.39 per 
acre statewide, although there is a significant variation in this amount among benefiting 
properties.   
 
For forest and fruit-tree reservations not located in the same or contiguous counties, or those 
located inside the corporate limits of a city, the annual fee per acre is based on a formula that 
adjusts the average property tax per acre of farmland in the county with the most land in this 
exemption program by a factor that reflects how productive the farmland is in that county using 
the corn suitability rating.  This formula multiplies the average property tax per acre by 13 
divided by the county’s average corn suitability rating. 
Assumptions 
• A total of 841,200 acres with a combined assessed value of $843.8 million will be affected 
by the forest and fruit-tree property tax exemption for assessment year (AY) 2024 
(FY 2026).   
• The number of impacted parcels will remain constant. 
• The number of acres in the program will increase at the current average annual rate of 
1.2%, while exempt value will increase at the current average annual rate of 11.6%.   
Fiscal Impact 
The fiscal impact of SF 633 is unknown.  It is not possible to estimate the total number of acres 
that will be assigned to each of the three fee classes.  If all forest and fruit-tree reservations 
were assigned to the minimum $2 per acre fee, an additional $1.7 million would be generated 
for local governments. 
 
The Department of Management may incur minimal administrative costs to compute and 
distribute the annual calculated rate. 
Sources 
Department of Management 
Department of Natural Resources 
Department of Revenue 
Legislative Services Agency analysis 
 
 
/s/ Jennifer Acton 
April 24, 2025 
 Doc ID 1526452 
 
The fiscal note for this Bill was prepared pursuant to Joint Rule 17 and the Iowa Code.  Data used in developing this 
fiscal note is available from the Fiscal Services Division of the Legislative Services Agency upon request.  
 
www.legis.iowa.gov