Illinois 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Illinois House Bill HB2214 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/24/2023

                    HB2214 EngrossedLRB103 27204 KTG 53574 b   HB2214 Engrossed  LRB103 27204 KTG 53574 b
  HB2214 Engrossed  LRB103 27204 KTG 53574 b
1  AN ACT concerning public aid.
2  Be it enacted by the People of the State of Illinois,
3  represented in the General Assembly:
4  Section 5. The Illinois Public Aid Code is amended by
5  adding Section 12-4.57 as follows:
6  (305 ILCS 5/12-4.57 new)
7  Sec. 12-4.57. Stolen SNAP benefits and AABD cash
8  assistance via card skimming; data collection and reports.
9  (a) Individuals who have had their benefits provided under
10  the federal Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP)
11  or cash under the Aid to the Aged, Blind or Disabled (AABD)
12  program stolen through card skimming, card cloning, or similar
13  fraudulent methods, are at risk of significant food
14  insecurity, hunger, and financial instability. To alleviate
15  this risk, Illinois shall replace the benefits determined to
16  be stolen as provided in subsections (c) through (e).
17  (b) As used in this Section, "electronic benefits transfer
18  card" or "EBT card" means the card issued by the Department of
19  Human Services for the purpose of enabling a user of the card
20  to obtain federal Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program
21  benefits or cash assistance provided under Article III of this
22  Code.
23  (c) Subject to appropriation, the Department of Human

 

  HB2214 Engrossed  LRB103 27204 KTG 53574 b


HB2214 Engrossed- 2 -LRB103 27204 KTG 53574 b   HB2214 Engrossed - 2 - LRB103 27204 KTG 53574 b
  HB2214 Engrossed - 2 - LRB103 27204 KTG 53574 b
1  Services shall replace SNAP benefits that were stolen from a
2  recipient's EBT card by means of card skimming, card cloning,
3  or some other similar fraudulent method during the period
4  January 1, 2022 through September 30, 2022 using State funds
5  and by procedures that align with those set forth in the State
6  Plan submitted to the U.S. Department of Agriculture's Food
7  and Nutrition Service in accordance with the Consolidated
8  Appropriations Act of 2023, Public Law 117-328.
9  (d) The Department of Human Services shall replace SNAP
10  benefits that were stolen from a recipient's EBT card by means
11  of card skimming, card cloning, or some other similar
12  fraudulent method during the period October 1, 2022 through
13  September 30, 2024 under the State Plan submitted to and
14  approved by the U.S. Department of Agriculture's Food and
15  Nutrition Service in accordance with the Consolidated
16  Appropriations Act of 2023, Public Law 117-328.
17  (e) Subject to appropriation, the Department of Human
18  Services shall replace cash assistance provided under Article
19  III of this Code that was stolen from a recipient's EBT card by
20  means of card skimming, card cloning, or some other similar
21  fraudulent method during the period January 1, 2022 through
22  September 30, 2024. The Department may adopt any rules
23  necessary to implement this provision, including rules on how
24  to accept and substantiate recipient claims for stolen
25  benefits. Where possible, the rules for accepting and
26  substantiating claims shall be consistent with the State Plan

 

 

  HB2214 Engrossed - 2 - LRB103 27204 KTG 53574 b


HB2214 Engrossed- 3 -LRB103 27204 KTG 53574 b   HB2214 Engrossed - 3 - LRB103 27204 KTG 53574 b
  HB2214 Engrossed - 3 - LRB103 27204 KTG 53574 b
1  for SNAP replacement described in subsection (d) and submitted
2  in accordance with the Consolidated Appropriations Act of
3  2023, Public Law 117-328.
4  (f) As the State administrator of benefits provided under
5  the federally funded Supplemental Nutrition Assistance
6  Program, the Department of Human Services shall track and
7  collect data on the scope and frequency of SNAP benefits fraud
8  in this State where a SNAP recipient's benefits are stolen
9  from the recipient's electronic benefits transfer card by
10  means of card skimming, card cloning, or some other similar
11  fraudulent method. The Department shall specifically keep a
12  record of every report made to the Department by a SNAP
13  recipient alleging the theft of benefits due to no fault of the
14  recipient, the benefit amount stolen, and, if practicable, how
15  those stolen benefits were used and the location of those
16  thefts.
17  (g) The Department shall report its findings to the
18  General Assembly on an annual basis beginning on January 1,
19  2024. The Department shall file an annual report no later than
20  the 60th day of the following year following each reporting
21  period. A SNAP recipient's personally identifiable information
22  shall be excluded from the reports consistent with State and
23  federal privacy protections. Each annual report shall also be
24  posted on the Department's official website.
25  (h) If the Department determines that a SNAP recipient has
26  made a substantiated report of stolen benefits due to card

 

 

  HB2214 Engrossed - 3 - LRB103 27204 KTG 53574 b


HB2214 Engrossed- 4 -LRB103 27204 KTG 53574 b   HB2214 Engrossed - 4 - LRB103 27204 KTG 53574 b
  HB2214 Engrossed - 4 - LRB103 27204 KTG 53574 b
1  skimming, card cloning, or some other similar fraudulent
2  method, the Department shall refer the matter to the State's
3  Attorney who has jurisdiction over the alleged theft or fraud
4  and shall provide any assistance to that State's Attorney in
5  the prosecution of the alleged theft or fraud.

 

 

  HB2214 Engrossed - 4 - LRB103 27204 KTG 53574 b