Illinois 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Illinois House Bill HB2979 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/16/2023

                    103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 HB2979 Introduced , by Rep. Adam M. Niemerg SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:   35 ILCS 5/204 from Ch. 120, par. 2-204   Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Increases the standard exemption to $150,000. Effective immediately.  LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b   A BILL FOR 103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 HB2979 Introduced , by Rep. Adam M. Niemerg SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:  35 ILCS 5/204 from Ch. 120, par. 2-204 35 ILCS 5/204 from Ch. 120, par. 2-204 Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Increases the standard exemption to $150,000. Effective immediately.  LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b     LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b   A BILL FOR
103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 HB2979 Introduced , by Rep. Adam M. Niemerg SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:
35 ILCS 5/204 from Ch. 120, par. 2-204 35 ILCS 5/204 from Ch. 120, par. 2-204
35 ILCS 5/204 from Ch. 120, par. 2-204
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Increases the standard exemption to $150,000. Effective immediately.
LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b     LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b
    LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b
A BILL FOR
HB2979LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b   HB2979  LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b
  HB2979  LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b
1  AN ACT concerning revenue.
2  Be it enacted by the People of the State of Illinois,
3  represented in the General Assembly:
4  Section 5. The Illinois Income Tax Act is amended by
5  changing Section 204 as follows:
6  (35 ILCS 5/204) (from Ch. 120, par. 2-204)
7  Sec. 204. Standard exemption.
8  (a) Allowance of exemption. In computing net income under
9  this Act, there shall be allowed as an exemption the sum of the
10  amounts determined under subsections (b), (c) and (d),
11  multiplied by a fraction the numerator of which is the amount
12  of the taxpayer's base income allocable to this State for the
13  taxable year and the denominator of which is the taxpayer's
14  total base income for the taxable year.
15  (b) Basic amount. For the purpose of subsection (a) of
16  this Section, except as provided by subsection (a) of Section
17  205 and in this subsection, each taxpayer shall be allowed a
18  basic amount of $1000, except that for corporations the basic
19  amount shall be zero for tax years ending on or after December
20  31, 2003, and for individuals the basic amount shall be:
21  (1) for taxable years ending on or after December 31,
22  1998 and prior to December 31, 1999, $1,300;
23  (2) for taxable years ending on or after December 31,

 

103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 HB2979 Introduced , by Rep. Adam M. Niemerg SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:
35 ILCS 5/204 from Ch. 120, par. 2-204 35 ILCS 5/204 from Ch. 120, par. 2-204
35 ILCS 5/204 from Ch. 120, par. 2-204
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Increases the standard exemption to $150,000. Effective immediately.
LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b     LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b
    LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b
A BILL FOR

 

 

35 ILCS 5/204 from Ch. 120, par. 2-204



    LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b

 

 



 

  HB2979  LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b


HB2979- 2 -LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b   HB2979 - 2 - LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b
  HB2979 - 2 - LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b
1  1999 and prior to December 31, 2000, $1,650;
2  (3) for taxable years ending on or after December 31,
3  2000 and prior to December 31, 2012, $2,000;
4  (4) for taxable years ending on or after December 31,
5  2012 and prior to December 31, 2013, $2,050;
6  (5) for taxable years ending on or after December 31,
7  2013 and on or before December 31, 2023, $2,050 plus the
8  cost-of-living adjustment under subsection (d-5); and .
9  (6) for taxable years ending after December 31, 2023,
10  $150,000.
11  For taxable years ending on or after December 31, 1992, a
12  taxpayer whose Illinois base income exceeds the basic amount
13  and who is claimed as a dependent on another person's tax
14  return under the Internal Revenue Code shall not be allowed
15  any basic amount under this subsection.
16  (c) Additional amount for individuals. In the case of an
17  individual taxpayer, there shall be allowed for the purpose of
18  subsection (a), in addition to the basic amount provided by
19  subsection (b), an additional exemption equal to the basic
20  amount for each exemption in excess of one allowable to such
21  individual taxpayer for the taxable year under Section 151 of
22  the Internal Revenue Code.
23  (d) Additional exemptions for an individual taxpayer and
24  his or her spouse. In the case of an individual taxpayer and
25  his or her spouse, he or she shall each be allowed additional
26  exemptions as follows:

 

 

  HB2979 - 2 - LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b


HB2979- 3 -LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b   HB2979 - 3 - LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b
  HB2979 - 3 - LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b
1  (1) Additional exemption for taxpayer or spouse 65
2  years of age or older.
3  (A) For taxpayer. An additional exemption of
4  $1,000 for the taxpayer if he or she has attained the
5  age of 65 before the end of the taxable year.
6  (B) For spouse when a joint return is not filed. An
7  additional exemption of $1,000 for the spouse of the
8  taxpayer if a joint return is not made by the taxpayer
9  and his spouse, and if the spouse has attained the age
10  of 65 before the end of such taxable year, and, for the
11  calendar year in which the taxable year of the
12  taxpayer begins, has no gross income and is not the
13  dependent of another taxpayer.
14  (2) Additional exemption for blindness of taxpayer or
15  spouse.
16  (A) For taxpayer. An additional exemption of
17  $1,000 for the taxpayer if he or she is blind at the
18  end of the taxable year.
19  (B) For spouse when a joint return is not filed. An
20  additional exemption of $1,000 for the spouse of the
21  taxpayer if a separate return is made by the taxpayer,
22  and if the spouse is blind and, for the calendar year
23  in which the taxable year of the taxpayer begins, has
24  no gross income and is not the dependent of another
25  taxpayer. For purposes of this paragraph, the
26  determination of whether the spouse is blind shall be

 

 

  HB2979 - 3 - LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b


HB2979- 4 -LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b   HB2979 - 4 - LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b
  HB2979 - 4 - LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b
1  made as of the end of the taxable year of the taxpayer;
2  except that if the spouse dies during such taxable
3  year such determination shall be made as of the time of
4  such death.
5  (C) Blindness defined. For purposes of this
6  subsection, an individual is blind only if his or her
7  central visual acuity does not exceed 20/200 in the
8  better eye with correcting lenses, or if his or her
9  visual acuity is greater than 20/200 but is
10  accompanied by a limitation in the fields of vision
11  such that the widest diameter of the visual fields
12  subtends an angle no greater than 20 degrees.
13  (d-5) Cost-of-living adjustment. For purposes of item (5)
14  of subsection (b), the cost-of-living adjustment for any
15  calendar year and for taxable years ending prior to the end of
16  the subsequent calendar year is equal to $2,050 times the
17  percentage (if any) by which:
18  (1) the Consumer Price Index for the preceding
19  calendar year, exceeds
20  (2) the Consumer Price Index for the calendar year
21  2011.
22  The Consumer Price Index for any calendar year is the
23  average of the Consumer Price Index as of the close of the
24  12-month period ending on August 31 of that calendar year.
25  The term "Consumer Price Index" means the last Consumer
26  Price Index for All Urban Consumers published by the United

 

 

  HB2979 - 4 - LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b


HB2979- 5 -LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b   HB2979 - 5 - LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b
  HB2979 - 5 - LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b
1  States Department of Labor or any successor agency.
2  If any cost-of-living adjustment is not a multiple of $25,
3  that adjustment shall be rounded to the next lowest multiple
4  of $25.
5  (e) Cross reference. See Article 3 for the manner of
6  determining base income allocable to this State.
7  (f) Application of Section 250. Section 250 does not apply
8  to the amendments to this Section made by Public Act 90-613.
9  (g) Notwithstanding any other provision of law, for
10  taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2017, no
11  taxpayer may claim an exemption under this Section if the
12  taxpayer's adjusted gross income for the taxable year exceeds
13  (i) $500,000, in the case of spouses filing a joint federal tax
14  return or (ii) $250,000, in the case of all other taxpayers.
15  (Source: P.A. 100-22, eff. 7-6-17; 100-865, eff. 8-14-18.)
16  Section 99. Effective date. This Act takes effect upon
17  becoming law.

 

 

  HB2979 - 5 - LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b