Illinois 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Illinois House Bill HB3242 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/16/2023

                    103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 HB3242 Introduced , by Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:  20 ILCS 50/520 ILCS 65/20-15  Amends the Uniform Racial Classification Act and the Data Governance and Organization to Support Equity and Racial Justice Act. Adds "Middle Eastern or Northern African" as a racial classification for purposes of the Acts.  LRB103 24797 DTM 51126 b   A BILL FOR 103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 HB3242 Introduced , by Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:  20 ILCS 50/520 ILCS 65/20-15 20 ILCS 50/5  20 ILCS 65/20-15  Amends the Uniform Racial Classification Act and the Data Governance and Organization to Support Equity and Racial Justice Act. Adds "Middle Eastern or Northern African" as a racial classification for purposes of the Acts.  LRB103 24797 DTM 51126 b     LRB103 24797 DTM 51126 b   A BILL FOR
103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 HB3242 Introduced , by Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:
20 ILCS 50/520 ILCS 65/20-15 20 ILCS 50/5  20 ILCS 65/20-15
20 ILCS 50/5
20 ILCS 65/20-15
Amends the Uniform Racial Classification Act and the Data Governance and Organization to Support Equity and Racial Justice Act. Adds "Middle Eastern or Northern African" as a racial classification for purposes of the Acts.
LRB103 24797 DTM 51126 b     LRB103 24797 DTM 51126 b
    LRB103 24797 DTM 51126 b
A BILL FOR
HB3242LRB103 24797 DTM 51126 b   HB3242  LRB103 24797 DTM 51126 b
  HB3242  LRB103 24797 DTM 51126 b
1  AN ACT concerning State government.
2  Be it enacted by the People of the State of Illinois,
3  represented in the General Assembly:
4  Section 5. The Uniform Racial Classification Act is
5  amended by changing Section 5 as follows:
6  (20 ILCS 50/5)
7  Sec. 5. Uniform racial classification. Notwithstanding any
8  other provision of law, except as otherwise required by
9  federal law or regulation, whenever a State agency is required
10  by law to compile or report statistical data using racial or
11  ethnic classifications, that State agency shall use the
12  following classifications: (i) White; (ii) Black or African
13  American; (iii) American Indian or Alaska Native; (iv) Asian;
14  (v) Native Hawaiian or Other Pacific Islander; or (vi)
15  Hispanic or Latino ; or (vii) Middle Eastern or Northern
16  African.
17  For the purposes of this Act, "State agency" means the
18  offices of the constitutional officers identified in Article V
19  of the Illinois Constitution, executive agencies, and
20  departments, boards, commissions, and authorities under the
21  Governor.
22  (Source: P.A. 98-982, eff. 8-18-14.)

 

103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 HB3242 Introduced , by Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:
20 ILCS 50/520 ILCS 65/20-15 20 ILCS 50/5  20 ILCS 65/20-15
20 ILCS 50/5
20 ILCS 65/20-15
Amends the Uniform Racial Classification Act and the Data Governance and Organization to Support Equity and Racial Justice Act. Adds "Middle Eastern or Northern African" as a racial classification for purposes of the Acts.
LRB103 24797 DTM 51126 b     LRB103 24797 DTM 51126 b
    LRB103 24797 DTM 51126 b
A BILL FOR

 

 

20 ILCS 50/5
20 ILCS 65/20-15



    LRB103 24797 DTM 51126 b

 

 



 

  HB3242  LRB103 24797 DTM 51126 b


HB3242- 2 -LRB103 24797 DTM 51126 b   HB3242 - 2 - LRB103 24797 DTM 51126 b
  HB3242 - 2 - LRB103 24797 DTM 51126 b
1  Section 10. The Data Governance and Organization to
2  Support Equity and Racial Justice Act is amended by changing
3  Section 20-15 as follows:
4  (20 ILCS 65/20-15)
5  Sec. 20-15. Data Governance and Organization to Support
6  Equity and Racial Justice.
7  (a) On or before July 1, 2022 and each July 1 thereafter,
8  the Board and the Department shall report statistical data on
9  the racial, ethnic, age, sex, disability status, sexual
10  orientation, gender identity, and primary or preferred
11  language demographics of program participants for each major
12  program administered by the Board or the Department. Except as
13  provided in subsection (b), when reporting the data required
14  under this Section, the Board or the Department shall use the
15  same racial and ethnic classifications for each program, which
16  shall include, but not be limited to, the following:
17  (1) American Indian and Alaska Native alone.
18  (2) Asian alone.
19  (3) Black or African American alone.
20  (4) Hispanic or Latino of any race.
21  (5) Native Hawaiian and Other Pacific Islander alone.
22  (6) White alone.
23  (7) Middle Eastern or Northern African.
24  (8) (7) Some other race alone.
25  (9) (8) Two or more races.

 

 

  HB3242 - 2 - LRB103 24797 DTM 51126 b


HB3242- 3 -LRB103 24797 DTM 51126 b   HB3242 - 3 - LRB103 24797 DTM 51126 b
  HB3242 - 3 - LRB103 24797 DTM 51126 b
1  The Board and the Department may further define, by rule,
2  the racial and ethnic classifications, including, if
3  necessary, a classification of "No Race Specified".
4  (b) (c) If a program administered by the Board or the
5  Department is subject to federal reporting requirements that
6  include the collection and public reporting of statistical
7  data on the racial and ethnic demographics of program
8  participants, the Department may maintain the same racial and
9  ethnic classifications used under the federal requirements if
10  such classifications differ from the classifications listed in
11  subsection (a).
12  (c) (d) The Department of Innovation and Technology shall
13  assist the Board and the Department by establishing common
14  technological processes and procedures for the Board and the
15  Department to:
16  (1) Catalog data.
17  (2) Identify similar fields in datasets.
18  (3) Manage data requests.
19  (4) Share data.
20  (5) Collect data.
21  (6) Improve and clean data.
22  (7) Match data across the Board and Departments.
23  (8) Develop research and analytic agendas.
24  (9) Report on program participation disaggregated by
25  race and ethnicity.
26  (10) Evaluate equitable outcomes for underserved

 

 

  HB3242 - 3 - LRB103 24797 DTM 51126 b


HB3242- 4 -LRB103 24797 DTM 51126 b   HB3242 - 4 - LRB103 24797 DTM 51126 b
  HB3242 - 4 - LRB103 24797 DTM 51126 b
1  populations in Illinois.
2  (11) Define common roles for data management.
3  (12) Ensure that all major programs can report
4  disaggregated data by race, ethnicity, age, sex,
5  disability status, sexual orientation, and gender
6  identity, and primary or preferred language.
7  The Board and the Department shall use the common
8  technological processes and procedures established by the
9  Department of Innovation and Technology.
10  (d) (e) If the Board or the Department is unable to begin
11  reporting the data required by subsection (a) by July 1, 2022,
12  the Board or the Department shall state the reasons for the
13  delay under the reporting requirements.
14  (e) (f) By no later than March 31, 2022, the Board and the
15  Department shall provide a progress report to the General
16  Assembly to disclose: (i) the programs and datasets that have
17  been cataloged for which race, ethnicity, age, sex, disability
18  status, sexual orientation, gender identity, and primary or
19  preferred language have been standardized; and (ii) to the
20  extent possible, the datasets and programs that are
21  outstanding for each agency and the datasets that are planned
22  for the upcoming year. On or before March 31, 2023, and each
23  year thereafter, the Board and the Department Departments
24  shall provide an updated report to the General Assembly.
25  (f) (g) By no later than October 31, 2021, the Governor's
26  Office shall provide a plan to establish processes for input

 

 

  HB3242 - 4 - LRB103 24797 DTM 51126 b


HB3242- 5 -LRB103 24797 DTM 51126 b   HB3242 - 5 - LRB103 24797 DTM 51126 b
  HB3242 - 5 - LRB103 24797 DTM 51126 b
1  from the Board and the Department into processes outlined in
2  subsection (c) (b). The plan shall incorporate ongoing efforts
3  at data interoperability within the Department and the
4  governance established to support the P-20 Longitudinal
5  Education Data System enacted by Public Act 96-107.
6  (g) (h) Nothing in this Section shall be construed to
7  limit the rights granted to individuals or data sharing
8  protections established under existing State and federal data
9  privacy and security laws.
10  (Source: P.A. 101-654, eff. 3-8-21; 102-543, eff. 8-20-21;
11  revised 2-4-23.)

 

 

  HB3242 - 5 - LRB103 24797 DTM 51126 b