Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0883
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date August 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 087-021-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 10, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 039-016-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 007-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/10/2023
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|