Illinois 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Illinois Senate Bill SB2154 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/10/2023

                    103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 SB2154 Introduced 2/10/2023, by Sen. Cristina Castro SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:  625 ILCS 5/12-830 new  Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that all school buses that are newly purchased, leased, or contracted after January 1, 2028, shall be an electric vehicle. Provides that all school buses that provide transportation for enrolled students operating primarily within an equity investment eligible community or primarily serving students living in an equity investment eligible community after January 1, 2030, shall be an electric vehicle. Provides that all school buses that provide transportation for enrolled students in the State after January 1, 2035, shall be an electric vehicle. Effective immediately.  LRB103 27715 MXP 54092 b   A BILL FOR 103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 SB2154 Introduced 2/10/2023, by Sen. Cristina Castro SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:  625 ILCS 5/12-830 new 625 ILCS 5/12-830 new  Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that all school buses that are newly purchased, leased, or contracted after January 1, 2028, shall be an electric vehicle. Provides that all school buses that provide transportation for enrolled students operating primarily within an equity investment eligible community or primarily serving students living in an equity investment eligible community after January 1, 2030, shall be an electric vehicle. Provides that all school buses that provide transportation for enrolled students in the State after January 1, 2035, shall be an electric vehicle. Effective immediately.  LRB103 27715 MXP 54092 b     LRB103 27715 MXP 54092 b   A BILL FOR
103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 SB2154 Introduced 2/10/2023, by Sen. Cristina Castro SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:
625 ILCS 5/12-830 new 625 ILCS 5/12-830 new
625 ILCS 5/12-830 new
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that all school buses that are newly purchased, leased, or contracted after January 1, 2028, shall be an electric vehicle. Provides that all school buses that provide transportation for enrolled students operating primarily within an equity investment eligible community or primarily serving students living in an equity investment eligible community after January 1, 2030, shall be an electric vehicle. Provides that all school buses that provide transportation for enrolled students in the State after January 1, 2035, shall be an electric vehicle. Effective immediately.
LRB103 27715 MXP 54092 b     LRB103 27715 MXP 54092 b
    LRB103 27715 MXP 54092 b
A BILL FOR
SB2154LRB103 27715 MXP 54092 b   SB2154  LRB103 27715 MXP 54092 b
  SB2154  LRB103 27715 MXP 54092 b
1  AN ACT concerning transportation.
2  Be it enacted by the People of the State of Illinois,
3  represented in the General Assembly:
4  Section 5. The Illinois Vehicle Code is amended by adding
5  Section 12-830 as follows:
6  (625 ILCS 5/12-830 new)
7  Sec. 12-830. Electric school buses.
8  (a) As used in this Section:
9  "Electric vehicle" means a vehicle that is exclusively
10  powered by and refueled by electricity, must be plugged in to
11  charge, and is licensed to drive on public roadways as defined
12  in the Electric Vehicle Rebate Act.
13  "Equity investment eligible community" and "eligible
14  community" are synonymous and mean the geographic areas
15  throughout the State which would most benefit from equitable
16  investments by the State designed to combat discrimination and
17  foster sustainable economic growth as defined in the Illinois
18  Power Agency Act.
19  "School bus" means every motor vehicle owned or operated
20  by or for any of the following entities for the transportation
21  of persons regularly enrolled as students in grade 12 or below
22  in connection with any activity of such entities as defined in
23  Section 1-182.

 

103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 SB2154 Introduced 2/10/2023, by Sen. Cristina Castro SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:
625 ILCS 5/12-830 new 625 ILCS 5/12-830 new
625 ILCS 5/12-830 new
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that all school buses that are newly purchased, leased, or contracted after January 1, 2028, shall be an electric vehicle. Provides that all school buses that provide transportation for enrolled students operating primarily within an equity investment eligible community or primarily serving students living in an equity investment eligible community after January 1, 2030, shall be an electric vehicle. Provides that all school buses that provide transportation for enrolled students in the State after January 1, 2035, shall be an electric vehicle. Effective immediately.
LRB103 27715 MXP 54092 b     LRB103 27715 MXP 54092 b
    LRB103 27715 MXP 54092 b
A BILL FOR

 

 

625 ILCS 5/12-830 new



    LRB103 27715 MXP 54092 b

 

 



 

  SB2154  LRB103 27715 MXP 54092 b


SB2154- 2 -LRB103 27715 MXP 54092 b   SB2154 - 2 - LRB103 27715 MXP 54092 b
  SB2154 - 2 - LRB103 27715 MXP 54092 b
1  (b) All school buses shall be an electric vehicle if:
2  (1) it is newly purchased, leased, or contracted after
3  January 1, 2028;
4  (2) it provides transportation for enrolled students
5  operating primarily within an equity investment eligible
6  community or primarily serving students living in an
7  equity investment eligible community after January 1,
8  2030; and
9  (3) it provides transportation for enrolled students
10  in the State after January 1, 2035.
11  Section 99. Effective date. This Act takes effect upon
12  becoming law.

 

 

  SB2154 - 2 - LRB103 27715 MXP 54092 b