Illinois 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Illinois Senate Bill SR0478 Introduced / Bill

Filed 10/18/2023

                    SR0478LRB103 34316 ECR 64145 r   SR0478  LRB103 34316 ECR 64145 r
  SR0478  LRB103 34316 ECR 64145 r
1  SENATE RESOLUTION
2  WHEREAS, The members of the Illinois Senate are saddened
3  to learn of the death of Gerald Leon Bolt of London Mills, who
4  passed away on September 11, 2023; and
5  WHEREAS, Gerald Bolt was born to Obed Leslie and Geraldine
6  Audrey (Finley) Bolt Jr. in Ramsey on March 3, 1941; he
7  attended Farmington High School; he married Cynthia Joyce
8  Norville in London Mills on June 25, 1961; and
9  WHEREAS, Gerald Bolt served in the U.S. Air Force for 20
10  years; during his service, he was stationed domestically in
11  Kansas, Idaho, Oklahoma, Nebraska, and North Dakota and
12  internationally in England, Guam, and Thailand; after he
13  retired on February 28, 1979, he and Cynthia moved to London
14  Mills; and
15  WHEREAS, Gerald Bolt worked as a foreman at Brigg's
16  Pottery in Abingdon; he later worked as a truck driver; and
17  WHEREAS, Gerald Bolt was a member of the Abingdon American
18  Legion Post 381; and
19  WHEREAS, Gerald Bolt enjoyed listening to country western
20  music, watching boxing, and, most importantly, spending time

 

  SR0478  LRB103 34316 ECR 64145 r


SR0478- 2 -LRB103 34316 ECR 64145 r   SR0478 - 2 - LRB103 34316 ECR 64145 r
  SR0478 - 2 - LRB103 34316 ECR 64145 r
1  with his family and friends; and
2  WHEREAS, Gerald Bolt was preceded in death by his parents;
3  his son, Todd Leon Bolt; and his brothers, Philip and Wayne
4  Bolt; and
5  WHEREAS, Gerald Bolt is survived by his wife of 62 years,
6  Cynthia; his daughters, Tamra Sue (Steve) Chipman, Tina Jo
7  (Randy) Smith, and Tylana Marie (Don) Coop; his grandchildren,
8  Trevor (Colleen) Edmonson, CeaAnne Brown, Amanda (Benjamin)
9  Rahn, Devin Chipman, and Darrin Chipman; his
10  great-grandchildren, Molly, Alana, William, and Audrey; and
11  his sisters, Alice (Frank) Curless and Margaret Wood;
12  therefore, be it
13  RESOLVED, BY THE SENATE OF THE ONE HUNDRED THIRD GENERAL
14  ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, that we mourn the passing of
15  Gerald Leon Bolt and extend our sincere condolences to his
16  family, friends, and all who knew and loved him; and be it
17  further

 

 

  SR0478 - 2 - LRB103 34316 ECR 64145 r