Illinois 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Illinois Senate Bill SR0606 Introduced / Bill

Filed 11/09/2023

                    SR0606LRB103 35321 ECR 65370 r   SR0606  LRB103 35321 ECR 65370 r
  SR0606  LRB103 35321 ECR 65370 r
1  SENATE RESOLUTION
2  WHEREAS, The members of the Illinois Senate are saddened
3  to learn of the death of Paula Hunn Phipps Denny of
4  Springfield, who passed away on October 22, 2023; and
5  WHEREAS, Paula Denny was born to Paul Joseph and Lily May
6  Hawkins Hunn on July 23, 1935; she graduated from Sacred Heart
7  Academy, where she was the senior class president and
8  homecoming and prom queen; she married Derward S.L. "Dodo"
9  Phipps Jr. on June 14, 1958; after his passing, she was married
10  to Raymond Phipps from 1970 to 1984; she later married Thomas
11  J. Denny in Springfield on November 30, 1994; and
12  WHEREAS, Paula Denny worked for the FBI and later in
13  advertising for the State-Journal Register newspaper, retiring
14  in 1998; and
15  WHEREAS, Paula Denny was a former Girl Scouts leader for
16  over 20 years; she was president of the St. Joseph's Home
17  Coterie, a sustainer in the Junior League of Springfield, a
18  benefactor and volunteer of the Springfield Art Association,
19  and a volunteer with the St. John's Samaritans for many years;
20  she was a longtime member of the Island Bay Yacht Club (IBYC),
21  a devoted parishioner at Blessed Sacrament Church, where she
22  served for years in the Altar and Rosary Guild, and a member of

 

  SR0606  LRB103 35321 ECR 65370 r


SR0606- 2 -LRB103 35321 ECR 65370 r   SR0606 - 2 - LRB103 35321 ECR 65370 r
  SR0606 - 2 - LRB103 35321 ECR 65370 r
1  St. Agnes in her later years; and
2  WHEREAS, Paula Denny loved arts and crafts, playing
3  bridge, entertaining her friends and her children's friends,
4  finding special gifts for her grandchildren, long walks, and
5  being involved in the planning and throwing of parties and
6  get-togethers, including the annual Nun's Picnic at the IBYC;
7  she loved being part of the Catholic community and had a warm
8  and loving view toward everyone; she leaves behind a legacy of
9  graciousness and kindness; and
10  WHEREAS, Paula Denny was preceded in death by her parents;
11  her sisters, Mary Louise "Mitzie" Smith Collins and Alice
12  Flaherty; her infant siblings, Paul Hunn and Lily Hunn; her
13  first husband; her second husband; and her step-grandson, John
14  Denny; and
15  WHEREAS, Paula Denny is survived by her husband of 29
16  years, Thomas Denny; her sister, Marjorie Hunn; her children,
17  Louise (William) Phipps Senft, Derward S.L. "Tripper" (Laura)
18  Phipps III, Elizabeth (William) Phipps Sanborn, William
19  (Kathleen) Phipps II, and Lillian (Benjamin) Phipps Johnston;
20  her grandchildren, Paula (Michael) Easton, Peter "Pete"
21  (Madeline) Senft, Derward "Dewey" (Margaret) Senft, Archer
22  Senft, William "Dutch" Senft, Elizabeth (Joe) Saraceno, Rosie
23  Phipps, Daniel Phipps, Lt. David Phipps USMC, Lily Sanborn,

 

 

  SR0606 - 2 - LRB103 35321 ECR 65370 r


SR0606- 3 -LRB103 35321 ECR 65370 r   SR0606 - 3 - LRB103 35321 ECR 65370 r
  SR0606 - 3 - LRB103 35321 ECR 65370 r
1  John "Jack" Sanborn, Ellery Berenger, Louise "Charlotte"
2  Phipps, Hawkins Phipps, Mabel Johnston, Alice Johnston, and
3  Dorothy Johnston; her great-grandchildren, Phipps Ann Easton,
4  Grace Saraceno, Joe Saraceno Jr., and Lucy Saraceno; her
5  step-children, Teresa Denny, Bobby Denny, and Maureen Denny;
6  and her step-grandchildren, Bridget Curren, Cecelia McAfee,
7  and Isabelle McAfee; therefore, be it
8  RESOLVED, BY THE SENATE OF THE ONE HUNDRED THIRD GENERAL
9  ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, that we mourn the passing of
10  Paula Hunn Phipps Denny and extend our sincere condolences to
11  her family, friends, and all who knew and loved her; and be it
12  further

 

 

  SR0606 - 3 - LRB103 35321 ECR 65370 r