Illinois 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Illinois Senate Bill SR1251 Introduced / Bill

Filed 11/06/2024

                    SR1251LRB103 43081 MST 76336 r   SR1251  LRB103 43081 MST 76336 r
  SR1251  LRB103 43081 MST 76336 r
1  SENATE RESOLUTION
2  WHEREAS, The members of the Illinois Senate are saddened
3  to learn of the death of Jann Alberta Mae Beauchamp, who passed
4  away on October 18, 2024; and
5  WHEREAS, Jann Beauchamp was born to Albert Alexander and
6  Cornelia Mae Cox in Chicago on December 7, 1931; she graduated
7  from Grant Elementary School in Chicago and her family moved
8  to Maywood in 1945; she graduated from Proviso Township High
9  School in 1949 and attended the University of Illinois at Navy
10  Pier; she married James A. Beauchamp on October 16, 1954; and
11  WHEREAS, Jann Beauchamp was devoted to her faith; she
12  joined Canaan AME Church in Maywood and was baptized in
13  December 1946; her family joined St. John Evangelical Lutheran
14  Church in Forest Park in 1969, where she was a member for 55
15  years and served in various roles; and
16  WHEREAS, Jann Beauchamp returned to college as a wife and
17  mother; she received her associate degree from Triton College
18  and her Bachelor of Arts from Rosary College, known today as
19  Dominican University; after earning her Master of Business
20  Administration from Rosary College, she used her training and
21  skill set to give back to the community; she worked at
22  Dominican University in River Forest as an administrative

 

  SR1251  LRB103 43081 MST 76336 r


SR1251- 2 -LRB103 43081 MST 76336 r   SR1251 - 2 - LRB103 43081 MST 76336 r
  SR1251 - 2 - LRB103 43081 MST 76336 r
1  assistant to its presidents, Sister Candida Lund and Sister
2  Jean Murray, from June 1972 to August 1983; she then served as
3  an adjunct faculty member at Triton College from 1985 until
4  2002; at the Triton Resource Center, she helped train students
5  as registered nurses and court reporters and in other
6  disciplines; and
7  WHEREAS, Jann Beauchamp was elected to the Proviso Family
8  Service and Mental Health Board in Melrose Park, where she
9  served from 1977 to 1998; she was appointed as an alternate
10  board member by St. John Lutheran Church, and she served on the
11  board of directors of Walther Lutheran High School in Melrose
12  Park from 1977 to 1981; she won her first general election as a
13  school board member of Proviso Township High School District
14  209 in 1991; that same year, she was elected as a trustee for
15  the Village of Bellwood, where she served from 1995 to 2003;
16  and
17  WHEREAS, Jann Beauchamp was a forerunner and a
18  trailblazer; she was charter member of the National Museum of
19  African American History and Culture in Washington, D.C. in
20  2012; and
21  WHEREAS, Jann Beauchamp was the recipient of numerous
22  accolades, acknowledgments, and awards, including receiving
23  the Marquis Who's Who in America Award as an educator and

 

 

  SR1251 - 2 - LRB103 43081 MST 76336 r


SR1251- 3 -LRB103 43081 MST 76336 r   SR1251 - 3 - LRB103 43081 MST 76336 r
  SR1251 - 3 - LRB103 43081 MST 76336 r
1  information scientist twice in her 90s; she was also
2  recognized and honored in many local and national newspapers,
3  journals, and books; and
4  WHEREAS, Jann Beauchamp was an avid golfer and reader, and
5  she was a patron of the fine arts and performing arts; she
6  retained her drive for knowledge in her later years through
7  taking community classes, attending performances, and
8  researching her family genealogy; and
9  WHEREAS, Jann Beauchamp was preceded in death by her
10  husband of 44 years, James; her parents; and her siblings,
11  Melville Carr, Laura Jackson, Charlotte Wheeler, Alice McNeal,
12  Elaine Sampson, and Albert Cox Jr.; and
13  WHEREAS, Jann Beauchamp is survived by her children, David
14  Beauchamp, Carol Beauchamp Randolph, and Elaine
15  Beauchamp-Prospers; her grandchildren, Calvin Randolph Jr.,
16  Cristen (Dirk) Blanchard, Alan Beauchamp, Mallory Beauchamp,
17  Corey Harris, Amador (Juliet) Porras, Courtney Harris,
18  Isabella Porras, and Zoe Porras; and her great-grandchildren,
19  Dexter Harris, Zepplin Porras, and Demi Harris; therefore, be
20  it
21  RESOLVED, BY THE SENATE OF THE ONE HUNDRED THIRD GENERAL
22  ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, that we mourn the passing of

 

 

  SR1251 - 3 - LRB103 43081 MST 76336 r


SR1251- 4 -LRB103 43081 MST 76336 r   SR1251 - 4 - LRB103 43081 MST 76336 r
  SR1251 - 4 - LRB103 43081 MST 76336 r
1  Jann Alberta Mae Beauchamp and extend our sincere condolences
2  to her family, friends, and all who knew and loved her; and be
3  it further

 

 

  SR1251 - 4 - LRB103 43081 MST 76336 r