Illinois 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Illinois Senate Bill SB1366 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/29/2025

                    104TH GENERAL ASSEMBLY
 State of Illinois
 2025 and 2026 SB1366 Introduced 1/28/2025, by Sen. Sally J. Turner SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED: New Act Creates the State Government AI Act. Provides that, before January 1, 2028, the Department of Innovation and Technology shall adopt rules establishing policies and procedures concerning the development, procurement, deployment, use, and assessment of artificial intelligence by agencies of State government. Prohibits the deployment and use of artificial intelligence by agencies of State government, unless permitted by rules adopted by the Department. Requires certain impact assessment reports. Defines terms. Effective immediately. LRB104 06501 BDA 16537 b   A BILL FOR 104TH GENERAL ASSEMBLY
 State of Illinois
 2025 and 2026 SB1366 Introduced 1/28/2025, by Sen. Sally J. Turner SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:  New Act New Act  Creates the State Government AI Act. Provides that, before January 1, 2028, the Department of Innovation and Technology shall adopt rules establishing policies and procedures concerning the development, procurement, deployment, use, and assessment of artificial intelligence by agencies of State government. Prohibits the deployment and use of artificial intelligence by agencies of State government, unless permitted by rules adopted by the Department. Requires certain impact assessment reports. Defines terms. Effective immediately.  LRB104 06501 BDA 16537 b     LRB104 06501 BDA 16537 b   A BILL FOR
104TH GENERAL ASSEMBLY
 State of Illinois
 2025 and 2026 SB1366 Introduced 1/28/2025, by Sen. Sally J. Turner SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:
New Act New Act
New Act
Creates the State Government AI Act. Provides that, before January 1, 2028, the Department of Innovation and Technology shall adopt rules establishing policies and procedures concerning the development, procurement, deployment, use, and assessment of artificial intelligence by agencies of State government. Prohibits the deployment and use of artificial intelligence by agencies of State government, unless permitted by rules adopted by the Department. Requires certain impact assessment reports. Defines terms. Effective immediately.
LRB104 06501 BDA 16537 b     LRB104 06501 BDA 16537 b
    LRB104 06501 BDA 16537 b
A BILL FOR
SB1366LRB104 06501 BDA 16537 b   SB1366  LRB104 06501 BDA 16537 b
  SB1366  LRB104 06501 BDA 16537 b
1  AN ACT concerning State government.
2  Be it enacted by the People of the State of Illinois,
3  represented in the General Assembly:
4  Section 1. Short title. This Act may be cited as the State
5  Government AI Act.
6  Section 5. Definitions. In this Act:
7  "Agency of State government" means:
8  (1) any agency, department, or office in State
9  government or any part of State government created by the
10  Constitution of the State;
11  (2) any of the several agencies and departments of
12  State government as designated in Section 5-15 of the
13  Civil Administrative Code of Illinois; or
14  (3) any State agency, department, bureau, or office in
15  the executive branch or legislative branch created by
16  statute or executive order that does not exist as a
17  constituent part of an agency, department, or office
18  described under item (i) or item (ii) of this definition.
19  "Artificial intelligence" or "AI" means technology that
20  enables computers and machines to simulate human learning,
21  comprehension, problem solving, decision making, creativity,
22  and autonomy.

 

104TH GENERAL ASSEMBLY
 State of Illinois
 2025 and 2026 SB1366 Introduced 1/28/2025, by Sen. Sally J. Turner SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:
New Act New Act
New Act
Creates the State Government AI Act. Provides that, before January 1, 2028, the Department of Innovation and Technology shall adopt rules establishing policies and procedures concerning the development, procurement, deployment, use, and assessment of artificial intelligence by agencies of State government. Prohibits the deployment and use of artificial intelligence by agencies of State government, unless permitted by rules adopted by the Department. Requires certain impact assessment reports. Defines terms. Effective immediately.
LRB104 06501 BDA 16537 b     LRB104 06501 BDA 16537 b
    LRB104 06501 BDA 16537 b
A BILL FOR

 

 

New Act



    LRB104 06501 BDA 16537 b

 

 



 

  SB1366  LRB104 06501 BDA 16537 b


SB1366- 2 -LRB104 06501 BDA 16537 b   SB1366 - 2 - LRB104 06501 BDA 16537 b
  SB1366 - 2 - LRB104 06501 BDA 16537 b
1  Section 10. Policies and procedures. Before January 1,
2  2028, the Department of Innovation and Technology shall adopt
3  rules establishing policies and procedures concerning the
4  development, procurement, deployment, use, and assessment of
5  artificial intelligence by agencies of State government to
6  protect and enhance the health, welfare, and safety of the
7  people of the State of Illinois. In developing these rules,
8  the Department of Innovation and Technology may consult with
9  the Generative AI and Natural Language Processing Task Force
10  established under Section 1-80 of the Department of Innovation
11  and Technology Act.
12  Section 15. Prohibition. Beginning January 1, 2028, unless
13  permitted by rules adopted by the Department of Innovation and
14  Technology, no agency of State government may deploy or use
15  artificial intelligence.
16  Section 20. Impact assessment reports.
17  (a) On or before July 1, 2028, and on or before July 1 of
18  every succeeding calendar year, every agency of State
19  government shall submit an impact assessment report on the
20  impact of artificial intelligence on that agency of State
21  government to the Department of Innovation and Technology.
22  (b) On or before January 1, 2029, and on or before January
23  1 of every succeeding calendar year, the Department of
24  Innovation and Technology shall submit an impact assessment

 

 

  SB1366 - 2 - LRB104 06501 BDA 16537 b


SB1366- 3 -LRB104 06501 BDA 16537 b   SB1366 - 3 - LRB104 06501 BDA 16537 b
  SB1366 - 3 - LRB104 06501 BDA 16537 b
1  report on the impact of artificial intelligence on State
2  government to the General Assembly and the Governor.

 

 

  SB1366 - 3 - LRB104 06501 BDA 16537 b