Illinois 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Illinois Senate Bill SB2190 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/07/2025

                    104TH GENERAL ASSEMBLY
 State of Illinois
 2025 and 2026 SB2190 Introduced 2/7/2025, by Sen. Lakesia Collins SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED: 305 ILCS 5/5-5e.1 Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to create an add-on payment for safety-net hospitals with a Level 1 Trauma designation, equal to at least $35,000,000 per hospital, per year. LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b   A BILL FOR 104TH GENERAL ASSEMBLY
 State of Illinois
 2025 and 2026 SB2190 Introduced 2/7/2025, by Sen. Lakesia Collins SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:  305 ILCS 5/5-5e.1 305 ILCS 5/5-5e.1  Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to create an add-on payment for safety-net hospitals with a Level 1 Trauma designation, equal to at least $35,000,000 per hospital, per year.  LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b     LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b   A BILL FOR
104TH GENERAL ASSEMBLY
 State of Illinois
 2025 and 2026 SB2190 Introduced 2/7/2025, by Sen. Lakesia Collins SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:
305 ILCS 5/5-5e.1 305 ILCS 5/5-5e.1
305 ILCS 5/5-5e.1
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to create an add-on payment for safety-net hospitals with a Level 1 Trauma designation, equal to at least $35,000,000 per hospital, per year.
LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b     LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b
    LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b
A BILL FOR
SB2190LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b   SB2190  LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b
  SB2190  LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b
1  AN ACT concerning public aid.
2  Be it enacted by the People of the State of Illinois,
3  represented in the General Assembly:
4  Section 5. The Illinois Public Aid Code is amended by
5  changing Section 5-5e.1 as follows:
6  (305 ILCS 5/5-5e.1)
7  Sec. 5-5e.1. Safety-Net Hospitals.
8  (a) A Safety-Net Hospital is an Illinois hospital that:
9  (1) is licensed by the Department of Public Health as
10  a general acute care or pediatric hospital; and
11  (2) is a disproportionate share hospital, as described
12  in Section 1923 of the federal Social Security Act, as
13  determined by the Department; and
14  (3) meets one of the following:
15  (A) has a MIUR of at least 40% and a charity
16  percent of at least 4%; or
17  (B) has a MIUR of at least 50%.
18  (b) Definitions. As used in this Section:
19  (1) "Charity percent" means the ratio of (i) the
20  hospital's charity charges for services provided to
21  individuals without health insurance or another source of
22  third party coverage to (ii) the Illinois total hospital
23  charges, each as reported on the hospital's OBRA form.

 

104TH GENERAL ASSEMBLY
 State of Illinois
 2025 and 2026 SB2190 Introduced 2/7/2025, by Sen. Lakesia Collins SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:
305 ILCS 5/5-5e.1 305 ILCS 5/5-5e.1
305 ILCS 5/5-5e.1
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to create an add-on payment for safety-net hospitals with a Level 1 Trauma designation, equal to at least $35,000,000 per hospital, per year.
LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b     LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b
    LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b
A BILL FOR

 

 

305 ILCS 5/5-5e.1



    LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b

 

 



 

  SB2190  LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b


SB2190- 2 -LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b   SB2190 - 2 - LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b
  SB2190 - 2 - LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b
1  (2) "MIUR" means Medicaid Inpatient Utilization Rate
2  and is defined as a fraction, the numerator of which is the
3  number of a hospital's inpatient days provided in the
4  hospital's fiscal year ending 3 years prior to the rate
5  year, to patients who, for such days, were eligible for
6  Medicaid under Title XIX of the federal Social Security
7  Act, 42 USC 1396a et seq., excluding those persons
8  eligible for medical assistance pursuant to 42 U.S.C.
9  1396a(a)(10)(A)(i)(VIII) as set forth in paragraph 18 of
10  Section 5-2 of this Article, and the denominator of which
11  is the total number of the hospital's inpatient days in
12  that same period, excluding those persons eligible for
13  medical assistance pursuant to 42 U.S.C.
14  1396a(a)(10)(A)(i)(VIII) as set forth in paragraph 18 of
15  Section 5-2 of this Article.
16  (3) "OBRA form" means form HFS-3834, OBRA '93 data
17  collection form, for the rate year.
18  (4) "Rate year" means the 12-month period beginning on
19  October 1.
20  (c) Beginning July 1, 2012 and ending on December 31,
21  2026, a hospital that would have qualified for the rate year
22  beginning October 1, 2011 or October 1, 2012 shall be a
23  Safety-Net Hospital.
24  (c-5) Beginning July 1, 2020 and ending on December 31,
25  2026, a hospital that would have qualified for the rate year
26  beginning October 1, 2020 and was designated a federal rural

 

 

  SB2190 - 2 - LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b


SB2190- 3 -LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b   SB2190 - 3 - LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b
  SB2190 - 3 - LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b

 

 

  SB2190 - 3 - LRB104 11279 KTG 21365 b