Indiana 2022 2022 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1075 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 03/09/2022

                    LEGISLATIVE SERVICES AGENCY
OFFICE OF FISCAL AND MANAGEMENT ANALYSIS
200 W. Washington St., Suite 301
Indianapolis, IN 46204
(317) 233-0696
iga.in.gov
FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT
LS 6784	NOTE PREPARED: Mar 9, 2022
BILL NUMBER: HB 1075	BILL AMENDED: Mar 8, 2022
SUBJECT: Commissions and Committees.
FIRST AUTHOR: Rep. Pressel	BILL STATUS: Enrolled
FIRST SPONSOR: Sen. Garten
FUNDS AFFECTED:XGENERAL	IMPACT: State
DEDICATED
FEDERAL
Summary of Legislation: This bill has the following provisions:
(1) Repeals the following: (A) Indiana Advisory Commission on Intergovernmental Relations. (B) Public
Highway Private Enterprise Review Board. (C) Lake Michigan Marina and Shoreline Development
Commission. (D) Orange County Development Advisory Board. 
(2) Moves a definition from a statute being repealed. 
(3) Requires the Interim Study Committee on Government to biennially make recommendations to the
Legislative Council regarding: (a) repeal of inactive groups; and (b) continuation of membership in interstate
compacts. 
(4) Requires the salary matrices prescribed for certain officers of the Indiana State Police, Alcohol and
Tobacco Commission, Department of Natural Resources, and the Indiana Gaming Commission to be
reviewed and approved by the State Budget Agency biennially in even-numbered years. 
(5) Requires the Justice Reinvestment Advisory Council to report to the Legislative Council before
November 1, 2022, regarding how to reduce the membership of an advisory board, with recommendations
regarding membership of a community corrections advisory board, including how to reduce the membership
of an advisory board. 
(6) Changes the name of the Indiana Commission to Combat Drug Use to the Indiana Commission to Combat
Substance Use Disorder. 
(7) Requires the Services for Individuals with Intellectual and Other Developmental Disabilities Task Force
to make certain recommendations to the Legislative Council. 
(8) Adds one member representing the Indiana Association of Rehabilitation Facilities to the 211 Advisory
Committee.
HB 1075	1 Effective Date:  Upon passage; July 1, 2022.
Explanation of State Expenditures: Interim Study Committee on Government: The bill assigns topics to
the Interim Study Committee on Government that must be studied in even-numbered years. If the committee
were to hold additional meetings to address topics, there would be additional expenditures for legislator per
diem and travel reimbursement for the committee members. Any additional expenditures must be within the
committee’s budget, which is established by the Legislative Council.  
Commissions and Boards: The bill also repeals commissions and boards who have either disbanded or not
held a meeting in the past two years.
Salary Matrix Review: The bill specifies that the biennial salary matrix update is to affect law enforcement
officers employed by the Indiana State Police (including motor carrier inspectors and capitol police) as well
as the Indiana Gaming Commission, the Alcohol Tobacco Commission, the Department of Natural
Resources. Under the bill, the State Budget Agency shall review these salary matrices biennially on even
years. Specifying that this update must be performed biennially on even years going forward is expected to
have no impact on the State Budget Agency. 
Community Corrections Advisory Boards: The Justice Reinvestment Advisory Council receives technical
assistance from staff of the Indiana Supreme Court’s Office of Judicial Administration. The Office can
review the composition of community corrections advisory boards with existing resources.
Task Force Recommendations: The bill requires the Services for Individuals with Intellectual and Other
Developmental Disabilities Task Force to make certain recommendations to Legislative Council one time
before September 1, 2022. The bill’s impact on the Task Force’s workload is expected to be accomplished
within existing resource and funding levels. 
211 Advisory Committee: Committee members who are not state employees are entitled to per diem and
travel reimbursement. Committee expenses are provided from amounts appropriated to the Office of the
Secretary of the Family and Social Services Administration (FSSA). Increasing committee membership is
expected to increase FSSA expenditures. However, any impact is expected to be minimal and be provided
within existing resource and funding levels to the agency. 
Explanation of State Revenues: 
Explanation of Local Expenditures:
Explanation of Local Revenues:
State Agencies Affected: State Budget Agency, Justice Reinvestment Advisory Council; Services for
Individuals with Intellectual and Other Developmental Disabilities Task Force; FSSA.
Local Agencies Affected: 
Information Sources: Eric Wandersee, Indiana State Police. 
Fiscal Analyst: Bill Brumbach,  317-232-9559; Mark Goodpaster, 317-232-9852.
HB 1075	2